Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., et al. v. Blue Cross of California, et al.
Plaintiff: Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc, Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc. and Adeona Healthcare, Inc.
Defendant: Blue Cross of California, Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts HMO Blue, Inc., U.S. Renal Care, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Consolidated Graphics, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Randall S. Fudge P.C. Employee Benefits Plan, Community Health Systems Group Health Plan, Anthem Health Plans, Inc., ConAgra Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit WRAP Plan, Martin Marietta Medical Plan, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, University of Nebraska Foundation Welfare Benefits Plan, Ensco Health Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Inc, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., UFCW LOCAL 555 - EMPLOYERS HEALTH TRUST, Active Power, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Mueller Water Products, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, California Physicians Service, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Bayhealth Medical Center Employee Health and Dental Insurance Plan, The Milton S. Hershey Medical Center Health and Welfare Plan, Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Sacred Heart Universitys Group Health Insurance Benefit Plan, The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Ardent Health Services Welfare Benefit Plan, Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Rocket Software Group Insurance Benefits Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, University of Hawaii / Chaminade University Student Plan, Excellus Health Plan, Inc., Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Premera Blue Cross, H.E. Butt Grocery Company Welfare Benefit Plan, Community Insurance Company, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Associates Health & Welfare Plan, Xerox Business Services, LLC Funded Welfare Benefit Plan, SCANA Corporation Health & Welfare Plan, Jennings American Legion Hospital Employee Benefit Plan, The Southwest Shipyard, L.P. Cafeteria Plan, L Brands, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Portland Area UFCW Local 555-Employers Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, 3M Employees Welfare Benefits Association (Trust II), AWC Employee Benefit Trust, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc., Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan, Baxter International Inc. and Subsidiaries Welfare Benefit Plan, Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan, Independence Blue Cross, Inc., Fastrac Markets LLC Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, WebMD Health & Welfare Plan, Consolidated Graphics, Inc. Health Plan, Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, The Master Builders Association Health Insurance Trust, Dirt Free Flood Services Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Group Welfare Plan For Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, eHealthInsurance Services, Inc., Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, eHealth Welfare Plan, IESI Corporation Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, NECA/IBEW Family Medical Care Plan, Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan, Cargotec Holding, Inc. Group Health & Welfare Plan, USAble Mutual Insurance Company, J.R. Simplot Company Group Health & Welfare Plan, Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Huntington Bancshares Incorporated Health Care Plan, St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, Time Warner Cable Benefits Plan, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program, U.S. LBM Holdings, LLC Employee Benefit Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Peter Kiewit Sons, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc., Navy Federal Credit Union Welfare Benefits Plan, Wellmark, Inc., Verizon National PPO West, Frank Calandra, Inc. Medical Plan, Hawaii Medical Service Association, Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Simmons Welfare Benefit Plan, Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan, Sierra Nevada Brewing Co. Welfare Benefits Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., HL Financial Services, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, Pioneer Energy Services Corp. Group Health Plan, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., Highmark Blue Shield, Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, Green Tree Comprehensive Welfare Plan, USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan, Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan, Layne Christensen Company Health and Welfare Plan, TUV America, Inc. Insurance Benefits Plan, United Surgical Partners, Intl Welfare Benefit Plan, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan, Corrections Corporation of America SCA Employees Benefit Plan, Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan, NHS Human Services Welfare Plan, Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. Group Medical Plan, Henry Schein, Inc. Dependent and Medical Flexible Spending Account Plan, Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates, TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan, Medtronic, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan, Covance, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Alliant Insurance Services Welfare Benefits Plan, Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, GKN Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, Profit Insight Holdings, LLC Group Health Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Oregon Teamster Employers Trust, Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania, Publix Super Markets, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan, Integra Telecom, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, SAS Institute Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, Dycom Industries Health and Welfare Plan, Tenet Employee Benefit Plan, Elliott Electric Supply, L.P. Health Benefit Plan, Midwest Operating Engineers Welfare Fund Retiree Health and Welfare Plan, Asante Employee Benefits Plan, Mercy Health Services, Inc. and Subsidiaries Medical Plan, Globys, Inc. Group Health Plan, Rio Tinto America Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund, Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust, Does 1 to 10, inclusive, United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits, F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, Puget Sound Pilots Group Health Plan, BCBSM, Inc., ION Geophysical Corporation Group Health Plan, The Dog Lady, LLC Group Health Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, MediaNews Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan, Highmark, Inc., Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., WaferTech LLC Health & Welfare Plan, Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan, National Medical Care, Inc. Group Medical, Dental, Life and AD&D Plan, Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska, Line Construction Benefit Fund, Morris Bart Employee Benefits Plan, Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans, Limited Brands, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Ascension SmartHealth Medical Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Delta Kappa Gamma Society International Health Benefit Plan, Seabright Insurance Company Group Health Plan, Nordstrom, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, The Group Life and Health Benefits Plan for Employees of Participating AMR Corporation Subsidiaries, Orasure Technologies Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation, Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Yates Petroleum Corporation, et al. Flexible Benefits Cafeteria Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund, HDR, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc. d/b/a Empire BlueCross BlueShield and/or Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. d/b/a Florida Blue, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross of California d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, USAble Mutual Insurance Company doing business as Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield doing business as Blueadvantage Administrators of Arkansas, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Colorado and/or Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. d/b/a CareFirst BlueCross BlueShield, California Physicians Service d/b/a Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc. d/b/a Blue Cross of Idaho, Community Insurance Company d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company d/b/a BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois; BlueCross BlueShield of Montana; and/or BlueCross BlueShield of Texas, BCBSM, Inc. d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Minnesota, Highmark, Inc. d/b/a Highmark Blue Shield, Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. d/b/a Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield d/b/a BlueAdvantage Administrators of Arkansas, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation d/b/a Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon; Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah; and/or Regence BlueShield and Hawaii Medical Service Association d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Hawaii
Claimant: New York Unity Factor LLC and Charles Badder
Not Classified By Court: Delta-T Group Phoenix, Inc. and Last Chance Funding, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2015cv00736
Filed: May 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 1598 Mail Returned addressed to Amir Shlesinger re Order #1595 (twdb)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1597 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1596 . Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund, BCBSM, Inc. (d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Minnesota) and Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan terminated. (twdb)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1596 First STIPULATION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan, Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, BCBSM, Inc., St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund filed by DEFENDANT'S Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan, Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates, MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, BCBSM, Inc., St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order STIPULATION TO DISMISS)(Attorney William E von Behren added to party Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1595 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Party with Prejudice #1594 . Ernst & Young Medical Plan terminated. (twdb)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1594 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Ernst & Young Medical Plan filed by Defendant Ernst & Young Medical Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1593 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation RE Dismissal with Prejudice as to Anthem Defendants #1592 . (twdb)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1592 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1591 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant ACWA JPIA, Sued as ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program #1590 . (twdb)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1590 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program filed by Defendant ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1589 Notice of Electronic Filing re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1586 , Order #1588 , Order #1587 e-mailed to Linda Oliver bounced due to No longer with firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1588 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation re Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan for Active Employees #1586 . (twdb)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1587 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation RE Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Wells Fargo and Company Health Plan #1585 . (twdb)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1586 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1585 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1584 ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS HIGHMARK INC., erroneously sued herein as HIGHMARK BLUE SHIELD, HIGHMARK BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD and BLUE CROSS OF NORTHEASTERN PENNSYLVANIA, HIGHMARK BCBSD, INC., F.N.B. CORPORATION HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, GENERAL NUTRITION INCORPORATED GROUP INSURANCE PLAN, AND UNITED STATES STEEL PLAN FOR ACTIVE EMPLOYEE INSURANCE BENEFITS, WITH PREJUDICE by Judge David O. Carter, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1576 . (twdb)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1583 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1581 . Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan terminated. (twdb)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1582 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #1580 REQUEST for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel. (twdb)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1581 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1580 REQUEST to Withdraw REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL filed by Lien Claimant Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Attorney Jennifer Arin Smith added to party Last Chance Funding, Inc.(pty:cr), Attorney Jennifer Arin Smith added to party Last Chance Funding, Inc.(pty:cr)) (Smith, Jennifer)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1579 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, and Mueller Water Products, Inc. Flexible Benefit Plan #1574 (twdb)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1578 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan #1575 . (twdb)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1577 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter,Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Party with Prejudice #1574 . Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama and Mueller Water Products, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan terminated. (twdb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1576 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania, F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield, Highmark Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits filed by Defendants Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania, F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order On Stipulation for Dismissal)(von Behren, William)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1575 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order On Stipulation for Dismissal)(von Behren, William)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1574 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Mueller Water Products, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1573 ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NORTH CAROLINA, MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC., MEDICAL PLAN AND PEAK 10, INC. EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN, WITH PREJUDICE by Judge David O. Carter. Each party shall bear their own costs and fees. re #1570 , Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina and Martin Marietta Medical Plan terminated. (sbou)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1572 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant Trinet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan, with Prejudice #1569 . (twdb)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1571 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS REGENCE BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD OF OREGON, erroneously sued herein as REGENCE INSURANCE HOLDING CORPORATION; REGENCE BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD OF UTAH, erroneously sued herein as REGENCE INSURANCE HOLDING CORPORATION; REGENCE BLUESHIELD erroneously sued herein as REGENCE INSURANCE HOLDING CORPORATION and MACHINISTS HEALTH & WELFARE TRUST FUND PLAN, WITH PREJUDICE #1568 . (twdb)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1570 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Martin Marietta Medical Plan, Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Martin Marietta Medical Plan, Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order On Stipulation for Dismissal)(von Behren, William)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1569 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan filed by Defendant TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Stipulation to Dismiss TriNet)(von Behren, William)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1568 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant All Plaintiffs filed by Defendants Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulation to Dismiss)(von Behren, William)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1567 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Defendants #1566 . California Physicians Service (d/b/a Blue Shield of California) and Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan and Trinet Group, Inc terminated. (twdb)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1566 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants California Physicians Service, Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan, TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan filed by Defendants California Physicians Service, Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan, TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Dismissal with Prejudice)(von Behren, William)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1565 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendants Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. dba Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey and Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, with Prejudice #1564 . (twdb)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1564 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan filed by Defendants Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order On Stipulation for Dismissal)(Lee, Joann)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1563 ORDER RE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT XEROX CORPORATION WELFARE PLAN #1562 by Judge David O. Carter. The Court HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: Defendant Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan (Defendant) and the claims related to Patient 129 are hereby dismissed with prejudice from this action with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (lom)
February 3, 2020 Filing 1562 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1561 NOTICE of Lien Claimant Charles Badder's Full Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kantor, Lisa)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1560 ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE: The Court, having been notified by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled re Notices of Settlement #1553 , #1555 , #1556 , #1557 , #1558 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for forty-five (45) days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1559 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Hanassab counsel for Defendant Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program. Justin Hanassab is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program; Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan; Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan; and Mercy Health Services, Inc. and Subsidiaries Medical Plan. (Attorney Justin Hanassab added to party Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Hanassab added to party Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program(pty:dft))(Hanassab, Justin)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1558 NOTICE of Settlement Related to Claims Re: Anthem Defendants and Defendant Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Rozelle, Timothy)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1557 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania, California Physicians Service, Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan, Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., Excellus Health Plan, Inc., F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield, Highmark Blue Shield, Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust, Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Martin Marietta Medical Plan, Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan, Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska, Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation, Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan, St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund, United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits, Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Defendant's Extended Caption)(Lewis, Carol)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1556 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan. (Ernster, Shannon)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1555 NOTICE of Settlement of Claims Against Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan for Active Employees Re: Patient 51 filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (McMahan, Sean)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1554 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael A Naranjo counsel for Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. Michael A. Naranjo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants. (Naranjo, Michael)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1553 NOTICE of Settlement of Claims by Plaintiff Medical Concierge, Inc. Against Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama and Mueller Water Products, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan Re: Patient 166 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Barker, Neil)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1552 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Status Conference Report filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Kantor, Lisa)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1551 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Hearing on Motions For Summary Judgment and Deadlines for Related Filings #1550 . RE: #1539 , #1540 , #1543 . Opposition due 2/10/2020; Reply due 2/17/2020. ( Motion hearing continued to 3/9/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1550 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment, and Deadlines for Related Filings, from February 3, 2020 to March 2, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patients 33 and 43 #1543 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patient 53 and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #1539 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patient 195 and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #1540 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kantor, Lisa)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1549 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, re Sealed Document, #1547 served on January 3, 2020. (Ridley, Eileen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1547 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit B to Ridley Declaration re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patient 195 and Memorandum of Points and Authorities #1540 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #1545 filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan.(Ridley, Eileen)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1548 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court ORDERS all parties who remain in this litigation to attend a statusconference on this matter on January 23, 2020 at 7:30 AM. (see document for further details). (Status Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 7:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (hr)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1545 ORDER GRANTING THE BLOOMBERG PLANS UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT B TO THE DECLARATION OF EILEEN R. RIDLEY IN SUPPORT OF BLOOMBERG L.P. HEALTH AND WELFARE PLANS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge David O. Carter #1541 . (twdb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1544 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #1542 served on December 30, 2019. (Ridley, Eileen)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1543 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patients 33 and 43 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan. Motion set for hearing on 2/3/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Declaration of Ronald S. Kravitz, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Ronald S. Kravitz, #4 Proposed Order) (Kravitz, Ronald)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1542 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit B to Ridley Declaration in Support of Bloomberg LP Health and Welfare Plan's MSJ under seal #1541 filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Ridley, Eileen)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1541 APPLICATION to file document Exhibit B to Ridley Declaration in Support of Bloomberg LP Health and Welfare Plan's MSJ under seal filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document)(Ridley, Eileen)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1540 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patient 195 and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan. Motion set for hearing on 2/3/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Declaration Of Eileen R. Ridley, #3 Declaration Of Glen D'Souza, #4 Proposed Order) (Ridley, Eileen)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1539 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Patient 53 and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan. Motion set for hearing on 2/3/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Declaration Of Eileen R. Ridley, #3 Declaration Of David Cea, #4 Proposed Order) (Ridley, Eileen)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1538 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation RE Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan #1537 . The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan terminated. (twdb)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1537 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1536 NOTICE OF YELLOWSTONE CAPITAL WEST, LLC'S FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ENTERED DECEMBER 13, 2019 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Kantor, Lisa)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1546 Mail Returned addressed to Emily A Glunz re Order #1515 . Not at this address. (hr)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1535 STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND DEADLINE FOR HEARING ON A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONCERNING CLAIMS RELATED TO DEFENDANT ALLTECH INC. BENEFIT PLAN #1534 by Judge David O. Carter. The deadline to file and serve a Motion for Summary Judgment shall be continued to January 6, 2020, and the deadline for the Court to hear a Motion for Summary Judgment as to claims related to Alltech shall be continued to February 3, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. (es)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1534 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to file MSJ from December 13, 2019 to January 6, 2020 filed by Defendant Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stip to Extend Deadline to File MSJ)(Ernster, Shannon)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1533 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice #1532 . Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. (d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Colorado and/or Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield), The Anthem Companies, Inc., ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc. and Pepsico Employee Health Care Program terminated. (twdb)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1532 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., The Anthem Companies, Inc., ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., The Anthem Companies, Inc., ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1531 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Further Extend Deadline for Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to Regence Blueshield and the Machinist Health and Welfare Trust Fund #1528 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1530 Text Only Entry re Order STRIKING Order #1529 , Stipulation for Hearing, #1526 by Judge David O. Carter: Second Stipulation filed #1528 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1529 [STRICKEN 12/9/2019 SEE DKT. #1530] ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Further Extend Deadline for Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to Regence Blueshield and the Machinists Health and Welfare Trust Fund #1526 . (twdb) Modified on 12/9/2019 (dgo).
December 6, 2019 Filing 1528 Second STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Hearing on MSJ)(Lewis, Carol)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1527 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. correcting Stipulation for Hearing, #1526 re Stipulation to Extend Deadline for MSJ Hearing (Lewis, Carol)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1526 [STRICKEN 12/9/2019 SEE DKT. #1530] STIPULATION for Hearing re Extend Date for Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order to Extend MSJ Hearing)(Lewis, Carol) Modified on 12/9/2019 (dgo).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1525 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Further Extend Deadline to File a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to Defendant Alltech Inc. Benefit Plan #1523 . The deadline to file and serve a Motion for Summary Judgment shall be continued by two weeks to December 13, 2019. (twdb)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1524 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to the Wells Faro Plan and The Anthem Defendants #1522 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1523 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ernster, Shannon)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1522 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment Related to the Wells Fargo Plan and the Anthem Defendants filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1521 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Certain Employer Plan Defendants and Certain Claims Against Health Care Service Corporation #1520 . Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company (d/b/a BlueCross BlueShield of Illinois, BlueCross BlueShield of Montana, and/or BlueCross BlueShield of Texas) terminated. (twdb)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1520 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Delta Kappa Gamma Society International Health Benefit Plan, Dirt Free Flood Services Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Elliott Electric Supply, L.P. Health Benefit Plan, Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates, Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company, IESI Corporation Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, Pioneer Energy Services Corp. Group Health Plan, Randall S. Fudge P.C. Employee Benefits Plan, The Group Life and Health Benefits Plan for Employees of Participating AMR Corporation Subsidiaries, United Surgical Partners, Intl Welfare Benefit Plan, Xerox Business Services, LLC Funded Welfare Benefit Plan filed by Plaintiffs Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1519 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order, Add and Terminate Parties #1509 , Stipulation to Dismiss Case, #1507 , Stipulation to Continue, #1514 , Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #1508 , Order #1516 , Stipulation to Continue, #1517 , Stipulation to Continue, #1511 , Stipulation to Continue, #1513 , Order, #1518 , Order #1515 , Order, #1510 , Order #1512 e-mailed to Maynard Buck bounced due to 550 5.1.1 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipNotFound. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1518 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND DEADLINE TO HEAR A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONCERNING CLAIMS RELATED TO THE HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY EMPLOYEE MEDICAL AND DENTAL EXPENSE BENEFITS PLAN #1517 by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1517 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medicial and Dental Expense Benefits Plan from November 30, 2019 to January 13, 2020 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1516 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Further Extend Deadline to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to Defendant Alltech Inc. Benefit Plan #1513 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1515 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Further Extend Deadline to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to the Anthem Defendants #1514 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1514 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to the Anthem Defendants from November 27, 2019 to January 13, 2020 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1513 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to Defendant Alltech Inc. Benefit Plan from November 27, 2019 to January 13, 2020 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1512 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Further Extend Deadline to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to Wells Fargo and Co. Health Plan #1511 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1511 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan from November 27, 2019 to January 13, 2020 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1510 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Further Extend Deadline for Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to Regence Blueshield and the Machinists Health and Welfare Trust Fund #1508 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1508 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File MSJ for TAC filed by Defendant Regence BlueShield Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Extend Time to File MSJ)(Lewis, Carol)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1509 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Medianews Group Welfare Benefits Plan #1507 . MediaNews Group Welfare Benefits Plan terminated. (twdb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1507 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(A)(1) filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1506 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Keith J Wesley counsel for Defendant WebMD Health & Welfare Plan. Keith J. Wesley will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant WebMD Health & Welfare Plan. (Wesley, Keith)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1505 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric M George counsel for Defendant WebMD Health & Welfare Plan. Eric M. George will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant WebMD Health & Welfare Plan. (George, Eric)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1504 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER STRIKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #1492 AND VACATING THE 10/28/19 HEARING. Plaintiff may refile the Motion for a hearing on November 27, 2019 after (1) providing a strong showing of good cause for failing to timely meet and confer, and (2) a further meet and confer by the parties. The deadline to file the moving papers is 28 days before November 27, 2019. (twdb)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1503 REPLY in support of for Summary Judgment #1492 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa S. Kantor)(Kantor, Lisa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1502 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Lien Claimant Last Chance Funding, Inc., served on 10/11/19. (Rentto, David)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1501 DECLARATION of of David A. Rentto Regarding Filing of Certified Copy of Judgment filed by Creditor Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rentto, David)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1500 STATEMENT Statement of Date When the Notice of Lien was Filed filed by Creditor Last Chance Funding, Inc. (Rentto, David)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1499 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Lien Claimant Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Rentto, David)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1498 Notice of Electronic Filing re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #1495 e-mailed to Nancy Franco bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 10, 2019 Filing 1497 Notice of Electronic Filing re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #1495 e-mailed to Emily Gluntz bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 10, 2019 Filing 1496 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Lodging #1494 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #1495 e-mailed to William Brockman bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 7, 2019 Filing 1495 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: for Summary Judgment #1492 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neil J. Barker, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Neil J. Barker, #3 Statement of Genuine Issues, #4 Evidentiary Objections)(Barker, Neil)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1494 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re for Summary Judgment #1492 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1493 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion for Summary Judgment #1492 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motion for summary judgment. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): The Motion hearing should also be set during docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1492 NOTICE Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment Re: Patient 166 filed by Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment Re: Patient 166, #2 Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts And Conclusions Of Law In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment Re: Patient 166, #3 Declaration Of Lisa S. Kantor In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment Re: Patient 166, #4 Declaration Of Tonmoy Sharma In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment Re: Patient 166)(Kantor, Lisa) Modified on 10/1/2019 (twdb).
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1491 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to Defendant Alltech Inc. Benefit Plan #1488 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1490 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to Regence Blueshield and Machinists Health and Welfare Trust Fund Plan #1486 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1489 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to the Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan #1485 . The deadline for the last day to file and serve a Motion for Summary Judgmentshall be continued by 30 days from September 30, 2019 to October 30, 2019. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1488 STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1487 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to the Anthem Defendants #1484 . The deadline for the last day to file and serve a Motion for Summary Judgment shall be continued by 30 days from September 30, 2019 to October 30, 2019. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1486 STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party Medical Concierge, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party Medical Concierge, Inc.(pty:pla))(Rozelle, Timothy)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1485 STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kantor, Lisa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1484 STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kantor, Lisa)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1483 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Hear a Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Claims Related to Wells Fargo and Co. Health Plan #1482 . The deadline for the last day to file and serve a Motion for Summary Judgment shall be continued by 30 days from September 30, 2019 to October 30, 2019, and the deadline for the Court to hear a Motion for Summary Judgment as to the claims related to Defendant shall be continued by 30 days to December 9, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. (twdb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1482 STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kantor, Lisa)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1481 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO HEAR A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONCERNING CLAIMS RELATED TO HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION AND ITS RELATED EMPLOYER PLAN DEFENDANTS by Judge David O. Carter #1479 . The deadline for the Parties to have the Court hear a Motion for Summary Judgment as to the claims related to Defendants shall be continued by 30 days to November 27, 2019. (twdb)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1480 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO HEAR A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONCERNING CLAIMS RELATED TO HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION AND ITS RELATED EMPLOYER PLAN DEFENDANTS by Judge David O. Carter, #1478 . The Employer Plan Defendants and the claims against Health Care Service Corporation related to Patients 36, 54, 73, 103, 124, 128, 170, and 226 are hereby dismissed with prejudice from this action with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. (twdb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1479 STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gershon, Jonathan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1478 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company filed by Defendants Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company(pty:dft))(Gershon, Jonathan)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1477 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1476 . Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc. and Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan terminated. (twdb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1476 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc. filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Dismissal)(von Behren, William)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1475 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Defendants #1474 . All claims in the above-entitled action against Defendants are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1); and Each party shall bear their own costs and fees. Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust, Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Premera Blue Cross, Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan, Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan and F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan terminated. (twdb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 1474 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust, Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan filed by Defendant Premera Blue Cross Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH A of Defendants, #2 Proposed Order Order re Stipulation to Dismiss)(von Behren, William)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1473 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Party with Prejudice #1472 . Wellmark, Inc. terminated. (twdb)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1472 First STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Wellmark, Inc. filed by Defendant Wellmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Respresented by VBH, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(von Behren, William)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1471 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Commence Depositions #1470 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1470 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Extend Deadline to Commence Depositions filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1469 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING #1426 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the Motion for Leave. However, if desired, the parties may file a joint motion for a Fourth Amended Complaint that merely clarifies the current status of claims on or before May 6, 2019. (twdb)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1468 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1442 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company,. Attorney Matthew W Close and Kenneth R O'Rourke terminated (yl)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1467 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1449 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for Xerox Business Services, LLC Funded Welfare Benefit Plan,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1466 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1448 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for United Surgical Partners, Intl Welfare Benefit Plan,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1465 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1447 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for Tenet Employee Benefit Plan,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1464 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1446 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for The Southwest Shipyard, L.P. Cafeteria Plan,. Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Raymond Collins Kilgore terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1463 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1445 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for Randall S. Fudge P.C. Employee Benefits Plan,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1462 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1444 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for Pioneer Energy Services Corp. Group Health Plan,. Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke; Matthew W Close and Raymond Collins Kilgore terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1461 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1443 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for ION Geophysical Corporation Group Health Plan,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1460 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1441 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for H.E. Butt Grocery Company Welfare Benefit Plan,. Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Raymond Collins Kilgore terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1459 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1440 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for Elliott Electric Supply, L.P. Health Benefit Plan,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1458 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1439 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for Dirt Free Flood Services Inc. Health Benefit Plan,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1457 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #1438 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for Delta Kappa Gamma Society International Health Benefit Plan,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1456 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #1437 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for Consolidated Graphics, Inc. Group Benefits Plan,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore and Kenneth R O'Rourke terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1455 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #1436 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for Baxter International Inc. and Subsidiaries Welfare Benefit Plan,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1454 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #1435 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for The Group Life and Health Benefits Plan for Employees of Participating AMR Corporation Subsidiaries, Amir Shlesinger for The Group Life and Health Benefits Plan for Employees of Participating AMR Corporation Subsidiaries,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1453 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #1434 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for IESI Corporation Employee Welfare Benefits Plan,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1452 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #1433 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Amir Shlesinger for Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates,. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1451 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #1432 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore; Kenneth R O'Rourke; Brian David Boyle and Matthew W Close terminated (twdb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1450 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Claimant CHARLES BADDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment copy)(Werner, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1449 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant Xerox Business Services, LLC Funded Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1448 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant United Surgical Partners, Intl Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1447 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant Tenet Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1446 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant The Southwest Shipyard, L.P. Cafeteria Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1445 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant Randall S. Fudge P.C. Employee Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1444 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant Pioneer Energy Services Corp. Group Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1443 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant ION Geophysical Corporation Group Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1442 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1441 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant H.E. Butt Grocery Company Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1440 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant Elliott Electric Supply, L.P. Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1439 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant Dirt Free Flood Services Inc. Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1438 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant Delta Kappa Gamma Society International Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1437 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant Consolidated Graphics, Inc. Group Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1436 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant Baxter International Inc. and Subsidiaries Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1435 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant The Group Life and Health Benefits Plan for Employees of Participating AMR Corporation Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1434 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant IESI Corporation Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1433 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1432 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Amir Shlesinger in place of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke, Brian D. Boyle, Collins Kilgore & Matthew W. Close filed by Defendant Active Power, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1431 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Fourth Amended Complaint #1426 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 3/25/2019 is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 11, 2019 Filing 1430 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Fourth Amended Complaint #1426 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Medical Concierge, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Medical Concierge, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kassan, Alan)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1429 NOTICE of Decision: and Order Vacating Judgment Entered in Favor of New York Unity Factor, LLC and Against Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center and Tonmoy Sharma Dated July 12, 2018 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kantor, Lisa)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1428 DECLARATION of Carol B. Lewis, Esq. Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion to for Leave to file 4th Amended Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Fourth Amended Complaint #1426 Declaration of Carol B. Lewis filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan, Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust, Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Martin Marietta Medical Plan, BCBSM, Inc., Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Premera Blue Cross, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation, St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund, Wellmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party BCBSM, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party BCBSM, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund(pty:dft))(Lewis, Carol)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1427 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Fourth Amended Complaint #1426 filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alan R. Ouellette, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Ridley, Eileen)
January 31, 2019 Filing 1426 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2019 at 07:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 [Proposed] Fourth Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to [Proposed] Fourth Amended Complaint, #4 Declaration of Alan E. Kassan in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint, #5 Proposed Order) (Kantor, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1425 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1422 . J.R. Simplot Company Group Health & Welfare Plan, Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan and Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc. (d/b/a Blue Cross of Idaho) terminated. (twdb)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1424 SCHEDULING ORDER & ORDER RE: PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES by Judge David O. Carter: Fact Discovery cut-off 8/5/2019, Expert Discovery cut-off 1/15/2020, Motion cut-off 10/28/2019 @ 8:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter, Jury Trial set for 4/7/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1423 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held Off the Record before Judge David O. Carter. Motion to Amend to be filed by January 31, 2019; opposition due February 25, 2019; Motion Hearing to be set for March 25, 2019 at 7:30 a.m. The parties have already participated in mediation. Scheduling Order to be issued. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (twdb)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1422 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., J.R. Simplot Company Group Health & Welfare Plan, Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan filed by Defendants Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., J.R. Simplot Company Group Health & Welfare Plan, Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gershon, Jonathan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1421 JOINT REPORT of THE PARTIES FOR THE DECEMBER 13, 2018 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kantor, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1418 Non-Resident Attorney Sean K. McMahan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Owens Illinois, Inc., Salary Employees Welfare Benefit Plan, designating Justin Hanassab as local counsel. (twdb)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1419 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sean K. McMahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/8/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22716299) #1418 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1418 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sean K. McMahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/8/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22716299) filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hanassab, Justin)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1417 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Sean K. McMahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22716299) #1415 by Judge David O. Carter. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document. Please review the Notice of Deficiencies 1415 and refile. (twdb)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1416 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Sean K. McMahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22716299) #1415 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1415 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ENTRY #1417] - REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Sean K. McMahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22716299) filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hanassab, Justin) Modified on 11/14/2018 (twdb).
November 1, 2018 Filing 1414 NOTICE of Settlement (Supplemental Joint Notice of Settlement; Request to Extend Dates to File Dismissal) filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Kassan, Alan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1413 NOTICE of Settlement (Supplemental Joint Notice of Settlement; Request to Extend Dates to File Dismissal) filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Kassan, Alan)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1412 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter. The parties select Ed Oster of Judicate West as mediator. Mediation to take place in October, 2018. Scheduling Conference continued to 12/13/2018 at 07:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (twdb)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1411 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-10 days, filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc... (Kassan, Alan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1410 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by CREDITOR NEW YORK UNITY FACTOR LLC, re Notice of Lien #1409 served on 8/28/18. (Wright, Kimberly)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1409 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by CREDITOR NEW YORK UNITY FACTOR LLC. (Wright, Kimberly)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1407 Joint MOTION to Vacate Deadlines due to Settlement in Principle. All pending deadlines applicable to the Limited Parties, including the August 27, 2018 deadline for Owens-Illinois to respond to the Third Amended Complaint, are vacated. (twdb)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1407 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate All Deadlines; Joint Notice of Settlement in Principle filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Vacate Deadlines Due to Settlement in Principle) (Havermann, Donald)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1406 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #1405 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Correct specific event to add or terminate appearance of counsel is: Notices/Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123). Note: Wrong event does not provide relief or changes sought.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lt)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1405 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL filed by Defendant U.S. LBM Holdings, LLC Employee Benefit Plan (Sandner, Michael)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1404 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Lien Creditor Delta-T Group Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Amended Notice of Lien)(Selth, James)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1403 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, and USUI International Group Health and Welfare Plan #1401 . USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company and TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan terminated. (twdb)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1402 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Lien Creditor Delta-T Group Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Selth, James)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1401 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cote, Alexander)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1400 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William E von Behren counsel for Defendant Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. Adding William E. von Behren as counsel of record for Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attorney William E von Behren added to party Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1399 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William E von Behren counsel for Defendant St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan. Adding William E. von Behren as counsel of record for St. Luke's Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant St. Luke's Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan. (Attorney William E von Behren added to party St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1398 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William E von Behren counsel for Defendant Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. Adding William E. von Behren as counsel of record for Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attorney William E von Behren added to party Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1397 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William E von Behren counsel for Defendant MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program. Adding William E. von Behren as counsel of record for MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program. (Attorney William E von Behren added to party MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1396 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William E von Behren counsel for Defendant Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc.. Adding William E. von Behren as counsel of record for Employees' Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc.. (Attorney William E von Behren added to party Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc.(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1395 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William E von Behren counsel for Defendant Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan. Adding William E. von Behren as counsel of record for Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cargill, Incorporated& Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan. (Attorney William E von Behren added to party Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1394 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William E von Behren counsel for Defendant BCBSM, Inc.. Adding William E. von Behren as counsel of record for BCBSM, Inc. dba Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BCBSM, Inc. dba Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota. (Attorney William E von Behren added to party BCBSM, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party BCBSM, Inc.(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1393 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William E von Behren counsel for Defendant Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund. Adding William E. von Behren as counsel of record for Twin Cities Bakery Drivers' Health and Welfare Fund for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Twin Cities Bakery Drivers' Health and Welfare Fund. (Attorney William E von Behren added to party Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1392 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer Marks Ghozland counsel for Defendant Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan. Jennifer L. Ghozland is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Alltech Inc. Benefit Plan. (Ghozland, Jennifer)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1391 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hanna Chandoo counsel for Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Hanna Chandoo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by former counsel for plaintiffs Stris & Maher LLP. (Chandoo, Hanna)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1390 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rachana A Pathak counsel for Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Rachana A. Pathak is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by former counsel for plaintiffs Stris & Maher LLP. (Pathak, Rachana)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1389 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brendan Stephen Maher counsel for Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Brendan S. Maher is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by former counsel for plaintiffs Stris & Maher LLP. (Maher, Brendan)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1388 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Peter K Stris counsel for Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Peter K. Stris is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by former counsel for plaintiffs Stris & Maher LLP. (Stris, Peter)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1387 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Victor A O'Connell counsel for Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Victor A. O'Connell is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by former counsel for plaintiffs Stris & Maher LLP. (O'Connell, Victor)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1386 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Exchange of Initial Disclosures and Filing of Joint Report of Counsel #1385 . IT IS SO ORDERED: 1. The deadline to exchange initial disclosures shall be extended from August 7, 2018 to August 13, 2018; and 2. The deadline to file the joint report shall be fourteen (14) days before the Scheduling Conference, or September 10, 2018. (twdb)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1385 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Report of Counsel and Exchange Initial Disclosures filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kantor, Lisa)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1384 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY KANTOR & KANTOR, LLP in place of attorney STRIS & MAHER LLP #1378 . (twdb)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1383 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Party with Prejudice of Defendant Huntington Bancshares Incorporated Health Case Plan #1377 . (twdb)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1382 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #1379 . Defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan for Active Employee shall have until August 27, 2018 to Respond to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint. (twdb)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1381 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Hearing re #1241 , #1250 and #1347 previously scheduled for 7/23/2018 @ 8:30 AM has been CANCELLED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1380 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of attorney Lisa S Kantor for Plaintiff Medical Concierge, Inc., in place and stead of Peter Stris, Brendan Maher, Rachna Pathak, Victor O'Connell, and Hanna Chandoo of STRIS and MAHER LLP #1378 . (jp)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1379 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 27, 2018 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Further Extend Time for Defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan for Active Employees to Answer Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint)(Havermann, Donald)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1378 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY KANTOR & KANTOR, LLP in place of attorney STRIS & MAHER LLP filed by Plaintiff Medical Concierge, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Connell, Victor)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1377 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Huntington Bancshares Incorporated Health Care Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1376 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: Defendants need NOT appear at the hearing re: #1241 , #1250 and #1347 scheduled for 7/23/2018 at 8:30 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 16, 2018 Filing 1375 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #1374 . The following error(s) was/were found: This form is for per attorney use. There is no signature by other attorney. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1374 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lauren A Daming counsel for Defendant Ascension SmartHealth Medical Plan. Lauren A. Daming; Amy L. Blaisdell will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Lauren A. Daming; Amy L. Blaisdell is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ASCENSION SMART HEALTH MEDICAL PLAN. (Daming, Lauren)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1373 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Huntington Bancshares Incorporated and as to Huntington Bancshares Incorporated Health Care Plan. (O'Connell, Victor)
July 10, 2018 Filing 1372 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Timothy J. Rozelle on behalf of Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. (Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party Adeona Healthcare, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party Adeona Healthcare, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party Satya Health of California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party Satya Health of California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(pty:pla))(Rozelle, Timothy)
July 10, 2018 Filing 1371 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Timothy J. Rozelle on behalf of Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. (Kassan, Alan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 1370 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Alan E. Kassan on behalf of Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. (Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Adeona Healthcare, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Adeona Healthcare, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Satya Health of California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Satya Health of California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Alan E Kassan added to party Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kassan, Alan)
July 9, 2018 Filing 1369 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Kantor, Lisa)
July 9, 2018 Filing 1368 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Lisa S. Kantor on behalf of Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. (Attorney Lisa S Kantor added to party Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S Kantor added to party Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S Kantor added to party Adeona Healthcare, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S Kantor added to party Adeona Healthcare, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S Kantor added to party Satya Health of California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S Kantor added to party Satya Health of California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S Kantor added to party Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S Kantor added to party Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S Kantor added to party Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S Kantor added to party Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kantor, Lisa)
June 29, 2018 Filing 1367 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan.(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 29, 2018 Filing 1366 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon and also as to Asante Employee Benefits Plan. (O'Connell, Victor)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for Albertson's LLC Health & Welfare Plan to Answer Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #1364 . The Court, having considered the accompanying Stipulation, and for good cause shown, HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS. Defendant Albertson's LLC Health & Welfare Plan shall have until June 29, 2018 to respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. (dro)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1364 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1363 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund.(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1362 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan.(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1361 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan.(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1360 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant J.R. Simplot Company Group Health & Welfare Plan.(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1359 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan.(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1358 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program.(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1357 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc..(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1356 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan.(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1355 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc..(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1354 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant BCBSM, Inc..(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1353 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 (Amended Answer) filed by Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1352 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 (Amended Answer) filed by Defendant Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1351 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 (Amended Answer) filed by Defendant Blue Cross of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1350 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan.(Cote, Alexander)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1349 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, GRANTING STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. HOURLY EMPLOYEES WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN FOR ACTIVE EMPLOYEES TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT #1348 (es)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1348 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 26, 2018 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan for Active Employees to Answer Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint)(Havermann, Donald)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1347 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, The Scheduling Conference currently set for July 23, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. [Dkt. # 1222], is continued by sixty (60) days to September 24, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (see order for further details.) (es)
June 12, 2018 Filing 1346 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Victor A O'Connell counsel for Plaintiff Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc.. Kristina Kourasis will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Kristina Kourasis is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc.. (O'Connell, Victor)
June 12, 2018 Filing 1345 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Hanassab counsel for Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program, Mercy Health Services, Inc. and Subsidiaries Medical Plan, Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. Anna Kim is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program; Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan; Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan; and Mercy Health Services, Inc. and Subsidiaries Medical Plan. (Hanassab, Justin)
June 11, 2018 Filing 1344 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick P De Gravelles counsel for Defendants CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. Robert Glaze will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Robert Glaze is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. and Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. (De Gravelles, Patrick)
June 11, 2018 Filing 1343 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick P De Gravelles counsel for Defendants CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. Patrick de Gravelles will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Patrick de Gravelles is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. and Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. (De Gravelles, Patrick)
June 11, 2018 Filing 1342 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Victor A O'Connell counsel for Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Kristina Kourasis is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Center, Inc., et al.. (O'Connell, Victor)
June 11, 2018 Filing 1341 DECLARATION of Victor O'Connell re Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #1250 filed by Plaintiff Medical Concierge, Inc.. (O'Connell, Victor)
June 8, 2018 Filing 1340 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Zajac, Seth)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1339 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company.(O'Rourke, Kenneth)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1338 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendants Baxter International Inc. and Subsidiaries Welfare Benefit Plan, Consolidated Graphics, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Delta Kappa Gamma Society International Health Benefit Plan, Dirt Free Flood Services Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Elliott Electric Supply, L.P. Health Benefit Plan, Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates, H.E. Butt Grocery Company Welfare Benefit Plan, IESI Corporation Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, ION Geophysical Corporation Group Health Plan, Active Power, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Pioneer Energy Services Corp. Group Health Plan, Randall S. Fudge P.C. Employee Benefits Plan, Tenet Employee Benefit Plan, The Group Life and Health Benefits Plan for Employees of Participating AMR Corporation Subsidiaries, The Southwest Shipyard, L.P. Cafeteria Plan, United Surgical Partners, Intl Welfare Benefit Plan, Xerox Business Services, LLC Funded Welfare Benefit Plan.(O'Rourke, Kenneth)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1337 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1336 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan.(Kravitz, Ronald)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1335 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by DEFENDANT The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan.(Oliver, Linda)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1334 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John M LeBlanc counsel for Defendants Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan. John M. LeBlanc will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.; Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan; Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan. (LeBlanc, John)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1333 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gary Scott Pancer counsel for Defendant Frank Calandra, Inc. Medical Plan. Gary S. Pancer will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Gary S. Pancer is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FRANK CALANDRA. (Pancer, Gary)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1332 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gary Scott Pancer counsel for Defendant NHS Human Services Welfare Plan. Gary S. Pancer will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Gary S. Pancer is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gary S. Pancer. (Pancer, Gary)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1331 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin erroneously sued as The Anthem Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1330 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1329 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gary Scott Pancer counsel for Defendant Sierra Nevada Brewing Co. Welfare Benefits Plan. Gary S. Pancer will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Gary S. Pancer is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Sierra Nevada Brewing Co. Welfare Benefits Plan. (Pancer, Gary)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1328 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Huntington Bancshares Incorporated Health Care Plan.(Kravitz, Ronald)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1327 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1326 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1325 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Community Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1324 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Blue Cross of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1323 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1322 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1321 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Anthem Health Plans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1320 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1319 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1318 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Highmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1317 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Highmark BCBSD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1316 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1315 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1314 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1313 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Excellus Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1312 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1311 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant California Physicians Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1310 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1309 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1308 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1307 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Asante Employee Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1306 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Mader, Cindy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1305 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant MediaNews Group Welfare Benefits Plan.(Franco, Nancy)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1304 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1303 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1302 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Further Extend Time for Defendant Owens Illinois, Inc. Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan for Active Employees to Answer Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #1295 . The Court HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS. Defendant Owens-Illinois, Inc. Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan for Active Employee shall have until June 26, 2018 to Respond to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint. (twdb)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1301 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan.(Ernster, Shannon)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1300 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Martin Marietta Medical Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1299 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1298 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Wellmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1297 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1296 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1295 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan, Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., J.R. Simplot Company Group Health & Welfare Plan, MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan, BCBSM, Inc., St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party J.R. Simplot Company Group Health & Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party J.R. Simplot Company Group Health & Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party BCBSM, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party BCBSM, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Daniel Gershon added to party Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund(pty:dft))(Gershon, Jonathan)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1294 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Mueller Water Products, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan.(Barker, Neil)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1293 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama.(Barker, Neil)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1292 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1291 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Regence Blueshield, erroneously sued herein as Regence Insurance Holding Corporation filed by Defendant Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1290 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Regence Bluecross Blueshield of Oregon, erroneously sued herein as Regence Insurance Holding Corporation filed by Defendant Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1289 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1288 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1287 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1286 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1285 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1284 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1283 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 26, 2018 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Havermann, Donald)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1282 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Wellmark, Inc.. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Wellmark, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Wellmark, Inc.. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Wellmark, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Wellmark, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1281 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1280 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1279 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1278 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Regence BlueShield, erroneously sued herein as Regence Insurance Holding Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Regence BlueShield, erroneously sued herein as Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. (Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1277 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, erroneously sued herein as Regence Insurance Holding Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, erroneously sued herein as Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Regence Insurance Holding Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Regence Insurance Holding Corporation(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1276 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1275 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1274 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Premera Blue Cross. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Premera Blue Cross for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Premera Blue Cross. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Premera Blue Cross(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Premera Blue Cross(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1273 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1272 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1271 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Northern California Sheet Metal Workers for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Northern California Sheet Metal Workers. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1270 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1269 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Martin Marietta Medical Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Martin Marietta Medical Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Martin Marietta Medical Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Martin Marietta Medical Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Martin Marietta Medical Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1268 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1267 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1266 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Inlandboatmen's Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Inlandboatmen's Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1265 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc.. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. dba Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. dba Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1264 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Highmark, Inc.. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Highmark, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Highmark, Inc.. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Highmark, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Highmark, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1263 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Highmark BCBSD, Inc.. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Highmark BCBSD, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Highmark BCBSD, Inc.. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Highmark BCBSD, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Highmark BCBSD, Inc. (pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1262 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1261 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1260 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1259 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Excellus Health Plan, Inc.. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Excellus Health Plan, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Excellus Health Plan, Inc.. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Excellus Health Plan, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Excellus Health Plan, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1258 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Defendant for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1257 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant California Physicians Service. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant California Physicians' Service dba Blue Shield of California. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party California Physicians Service(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party California Physicians Service(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1256 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1255 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. dba Florida Blue for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. dba Florida Blue. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1254 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc.. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc.. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1253 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Asante Employee Benefits Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Asante Employee Benefits Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Asante Employee Benefits Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Asante Employee Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Asante Employee Benefits Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1252 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader counsel for Defendant Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. Adding Cindy N. Mader as counsel of record for Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Cindy Nguyen Mader added to party Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Mader, Cindy)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1251 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Stipulated Request to Extend Time for All Parties to Exchange Initial Disclosures #1249 . Plaintiffs and Defendants shall exchange initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than June 19, 2018. (mt)
May 31, 2018 Filing 1250 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Order Granting in part and Conditionally Granting in Part MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney #1241 (see document for details.) (mt)
May 30, 2018 Filing 1249 STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26(f) Initial Disclosures Deadline from May 31, 2018 to June 19, 2018 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stris, Peter)
May 30, 2018 Filing 1248 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #1247 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 30, 2018 Filing 1247 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Janet P Jakubowicz counsel for Defendant HL Financial Services, LLC Employee Benefits Plan. Janet P. Jakubowicz will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant HL Financial Services. (Jakubowicz, Janet)
May 29, 2018 Filing 1246 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Stris & Maher LLP to Withdraw as Attorney #1241 in Response to Order #1244 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Brannen)(Stris, Peter)
May 25, 2018 Filing 1245 NOTICE of Change of address by Ronald S Kravitz attorney for Defendants Huntington Bancshares Incorporated Health Care Plan, Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan. Changing attorneys address to 201 Filbert Street, Suite 201, San Francisco, CA 94133. Filed by Defendants Huntington Bancshares Incorporated Health Care Plan, Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan. (Kravitz, Ronald)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: RE MOTION of Stris & Maher LLP to Withdraw as Attorney #1241 . Based on the briefing, the Court ORDERS Stris & Maher LLP to file supplemental briefing by May 29, 2018, explaining the following: See document for further information. (twdb)
May 22, 2018 Filing 1243 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hilary Erin Feybush counsel for Defendant Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan. Hilary E. Feybush will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Hilary E. Feybush is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alltech, Inc., Benefit Plan. (Feybush, Hilary)
May 21, 2018 Filing 1242 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Keith J Wesley counsel for Defendant WebMD Health & Welfare Plan. Filed by defendant WebMD Health & Welfare Plan. (Wesley, Keith)
May 18, 2018 Filing 1241 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Stris & Maher LLP to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Peter K. Stris, #3 Proposed Order) (Stris, Peter)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1240 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan answer now due 6/5/2018, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint)(Hanassab, Justin)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1239 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1238 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1237 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1236 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1235 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1234 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Pepsico Employee Health Care Program. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1233 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1232 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1231 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1230 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1229 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Ernst & Young Medical Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1228 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1227 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1226 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1225 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendant ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1224 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting Stipulated Request for Certain Defendants to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint #1223 . The Court, having considered the accompanying Stipulation, and for good cause shown, HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS. 1. Defendants1 shall have until June 5, 2018 to respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint; (dro)
May 10, 2018 Filing 1223 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania, California Physicians Service, Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Excellus Health Plan, Inc., F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, GKN Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield, Highmark Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust, Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Martin Marietta Medical Plan, Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan, Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Asante Employee Benefits Plan, Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska, Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation, Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan, TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan, U.S. Renal Care, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits, Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(von Behren, William)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1222 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1221 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1198 Omnibus MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint. For the foregoing reasons, the Court DISMISSES Plaintiffs' UCL claim WITH PREJUDICE. In addition, the Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE the following forty Defendants, who have no remaining claims against them. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 6, 2018 Filing 1220 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Layne Christensen Company Health and Welfare Plan. (O'Connell, Victor)
March 2, 2018 Filing 1219 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, HDR, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, University of Nebraska Foundation Welfare Benefits Plan. (Kourasis, Kristina)
March 2, 2018 Filing 1218 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts HMO Blue, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan, TUV America, Inc. Insurance Benefits Plan. (Kourasis, Kristina)
February 2, 2018 Filing 1217 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Hanassab counsel for Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. Adding Justin Hanasaab as counsel of record for Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Anna Kim is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit. (Hanassab, Justin)
February 2, 2018 Filing 1216 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Hanassab counsel for Defendant Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan. Adding Justin Hanasaab as counsel of record for Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Anna Kim is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan. (Hanassab, Justin)
February 1, 2018 Filing 1215 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin Hanassab on behalf of Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan (Attorney Justin Hanassab added to party Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Hanassab added to party Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Hanassab, Justin)
February 1, 2018 Filing 1214 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin Hanassab on behalf of Defendant Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan (Attorney Justin Hanassab added to party Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Hanassab added to party Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(Hanassab, Justin)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1213 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Molly K Madden counsel for Defendant Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan. Molly K. Madden will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Molly K. Madden is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Vertical Search Works, Inc.. (Madden, Molly)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1212 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hong-An Vu counsel for Defendant Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan. Hong An-Vu will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Hong-An Vu is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Vertical Search Works, Inc.. (Vu, Hong-An)
January 25, 2018 Filing 1211 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1198 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 1/29/2018 is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 22, 2018 Filing 1210 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Inc. (Kourasis, Kristina)
January 12, 2018 Filing 1209 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1198 filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Joining Reply Brief)(Ridley, Eileen)
January 8, 2018 Filing 1208 OPPOSITION re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1198 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (O'Connell, Victor)
January 5, 2018 Filing 1207 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Maynard A Buck counsel for Defendant Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees. Christopher J. Lalak is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Counsel for Defendant Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees. (Buck, Maynard)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1206 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #1205 REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Neil J Barker terminated. (lwag)
January 4, 2018 Filing 1205 REQUEST of Neil J. Barker to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cote, Alexander)
January 4, 2018 Filing 1204 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Neil J. Barker as counsel of record #1202 by Judge David O. Carter. The document is stricken. Please refer to the error(s) found in the Notice of Deficiency (Dkt. #1203) and refile. (lwag)
January 4, 2018 Filing 1203 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Neil J. Barker as counsel of record #1202 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lwag)
January 3, 2018 Filing 1202 **STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY #1204** REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Neil J. Barker as counsel of record filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan. (Attorney Alexander H Cote added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company (pty:dft), Attorney Alexander H Cote added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company (pty:dft), Attorney Alexander H Cote added to party TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander H Cote added to party TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander H Cote added to party USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander H Cote added to party USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan(pty:dft)) (Cote, Alexander) Modified on 1/4/2018 (lwag).
December 13, 2017 Filing 1201 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan. (Kourasis, Kristina)
November 17, 2017 Filing 1200 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amir Shlesinger counsel for Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Peter Kiewit Sons, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan. Monica J. Zi is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming and Peter Kiewit Sons, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan. (Shlesinger, Amir)
November 16, 2017 Filing 1199 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anna Kim counsel for Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program, Mercy Health Services, Inc. and Subsidiaries Medical Plan, Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. Nicole A. Diller is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan; Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program;Mercy Health Services, Inc. and Subsidiaries Medical Plan; and Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (Kim, Anna)
November 15, 2017 Filing 1198 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. Motion set for hearing on 1/29/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Joining Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Defendants In This Action Against Whom No Operative Claims Remain, #4 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #5 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #6 Exhibit B - Defendants Joining Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit C Defendants In This Action Against Whom No Operative Claims Remain, #8 Declaration of Eileen R. Ridley, #9 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #10 Proposed Order) (Ridley, Eileen)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #1195 Non-Resident Attorney Joel A. Mintzer APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant BCBSM, Inc., d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, designating Amir Shlesinger as local counsel. (lwag)
November 14, 2017 Filing 1196 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher M Rogers counsel for Defendant Ascension SmartHealth Medical Plan. Christopher M. Rogers will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ascension Smarthealth Medical Plan. (Rogers, Christopher)
November 10, 2017 Filing 1195 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joel A. Mintzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant BCBSM, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20810020) filed by Defendant BCBSM, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shl esinger, Amir)
November 9, 2017 Filing 1194 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Rocket Software Group Insurance Benefits Plan. (Kourasis, Kristina)
November 6, 2017 Filing 1193 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. Group Medical Plan, SCANA Corporation Health & Welfare Plan. (Kourasis, Kristina)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1192 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO EXCHANGE INITIAL DISCLOSURES #1190 by Judge David O. Carter: Defendants shall have until November 15, 2017 to respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall exchange initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(f) within thirty (30) days of the Court's ruling on Defendants' forthcoming Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint. See document for further information. (dv)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1191 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. correcting Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 (Kourasis, Kristina)
October 25, 2017 Filing 1190 STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulated Request to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint and to Exchange Initial Disclosures filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Joining Stipulation, #3 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen)
October 20, 2017 Filing 1189 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to eHealthInsurance Services, Inc.. (Kourasis, Kristina)
October 20, 2017 Filing 1188 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/12/2017 Hearing re Transcript #1187 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gale, Debbie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 20, 2017 Filing 1187 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/12/2017 Hrg on Mot to Dismiss. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL:DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). ****Transcript may onlybe viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline forRelease of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter orthrough PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any timethrough the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.**** Redaction Request due 11/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2018. (Gale, Debbie)
October 20, 2017 Filing 1186 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, incorrect phone number for reporter listed. Request deletion of private 949-xxx-xxxx number listed and replace with (714) 558-8141 in text of entry at Docket #1184 . (lwag)
October 19, 2017 Filing 1185 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/13/2017 Hearing re Transcript #1184 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gale, Debbie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 19, 2017 Filing 1184 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/13/2017 Hearing. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL:DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). ****Transcript may onlybe viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline forRelease of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter orthrough PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any timethrough the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 11/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2018. (Gale, Debbie) Modified on 10/20/2017 . See Notice of Clerical Error, Docket Number #1186 . (lwag).
October 18, 2017 Filing 1183 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc., re Sealed Document,, #1182 served on 10/18/2017. (O'Connell, Victor)
October 18, 2017 Filing 1182 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit C re Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1177 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #1181 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D re Amended Complaint/Petition #1177 )(O'Connell, Victor)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: On Plaintiffs' APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal #1178 (mt)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #1179 served on 10/16/2017. (O'Connell, Victor)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1179 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits C and D to Third Amended Complaint under seal #1178 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit C to Third Amended Complaint, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit D to Third Amended Complaint)(O'Connell, Victor)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1178 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits C and D to Third Amended Complaint under seal filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document [1177-3] Exhibit C to Third Amended Complaint, #3 Redacted Document [1177-4] Exhibit D to Third Amended Complaint)(Attorney Victor A O'Connell added to party Medical Concierge, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Victor A O'Connell added to party Medical Concierge, Inc.(pty:pla))(O'Connell, Victor)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1177 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Baxter International Inc. and Subsidiaries Welfare Benefit Plan, Bayhealth Medical Center Employee Health and Dental Insurance Plan, Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts HMO Blue, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross of California, Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund, C.R. Bard, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, California Physicians Service, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan, Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Community Health Systems Group Health Plan, Community Insurance Company, Consolidated Graphics, Inc. Health Plan, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Covance, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Delta Kappa Gamma Society International Health Benefit Plan, Dirt Free Flood Services Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Dycom Industries Health and Welfare Plan, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Elliott Electric Supply, L.P. Health Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., Ensco Health Plan, Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Excellus Health Plan, Inc., F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Fastrac Markets LLC Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan, GKN Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Globys, Inc. Group Health Plan, Green Tree Comprehensive Welfare Plan, Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates, Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., H.E. Butt Grocery Company Welfare Benefit Plan, HDR, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, HL Financial Services, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield, Highmark Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Huntington Bancshares Incorporated Health Care Plan, IESI Corporation Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, ION Geophysical Corporation Group Health Plan, Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, J.R. Simplot Company Group Health & Welfare Plan, Jennings American Legion Hospital Employee Benefit Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, Layne Christensen Company Health and Welfare Plan, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Martin Marietta Medical Plan, MediaNews Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Medtronic, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Morris Bart Employee Benefits Plan, Mueller Water Products, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, 3M Employees Welfare Benefits Association (Trust II), ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Active Power, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan, Alliant Insurance Services Welfare Benefits Plan, Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Ardent Health Services Welfare Benefit Plan, Asante Employee Benefits Plan, BCBSM, Inc., Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. Group Medical Plan, Orasure Technologies Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan, Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Pioneer Energy Services Corp. Group Health Plan, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska, Profit Insight Holdings, LLC Group Health Plan, Publix Super Markets, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan, Puget Sound Pilots Group Health Plan, Randall S. Fudge P.C. Employee Benefits Plan, Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., SAS Institute Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, SCANA Corporation Health & Welfare Plan, Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Seabright Insurance Company Group Health Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund, Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan, St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, TUV America, Inc. Insurance Benefits Plan, Tenet Employee Benefit Plan, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Group Life and Health Benefits Plan for Employees of Participating AMR Corporation Subsidiaries, The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan, The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Master Builders Association Health Insurance Trust, The Southwest Shipyard, L.P. Cafeteria Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund, UFCW LOCAL 555 - EMPLOYERS HEALTH TRUST, USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan, United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits, United Surgical Partners, Intl Welfare Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, WebMD Health & Welfare Plan, Wellmark, Inc., Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan, Xerox Business Services, LLC Funded Welfare Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan, eHealthInsurance Services, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1071 , filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Medical Concierge, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (Redacted), #4 Exhibit D (Redacted))(Attorney Peter K Stris added to party Medical Concierge, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter K Stris added to party Medical Concierge, Inc.(pty:pla))(Stris, Peter)
October 13, 2017 Filing 1176 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan. (Kourasis, Kristina)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 ORDER GRANTING IN PART OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #1085 by Judge David O. Carter: If Plaintiffs choose to amend their complaint in compliance with this Order, they may do so on or before October 16, 2017. The Court will not entertain future requests to incorporate plan documents by reference in order to enforce anti-assignment provisions. *See Order for details.* (es)
September 22, 2017 Filing 1174 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Monica Jar-Kay Zi counsel for Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., Green Tree Comprehensive Welfare Plan, HDR, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, J.R. Simplot Company Group Health & Welfare Plan, Layne Christensen Company Health and Welfare Plan, MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Medtronic, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, 3M Employees Welfare Benefits Association (Trust II), Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan, BCBSM, Inc., St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund, University of Nebraska Foundation Welfare Benefits Plan. Monica J. Zi is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants BCBSM, Inc. d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Walter Investment Management Corp. Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan (formerly known as Green Tree Comprehensive Welfare Plan), 3M Employees Welfare Benefits Association (Trust II) Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund, Cargill Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan, MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, Medtronic, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attorney Monica Jar-Kay Zi added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Monica Jar-Kay Zi added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zi, Monica)
July 6, 2017 Filing 1173 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program. (Kourasis, Kristina)
June 13, 2017 Filing 1172 MINUTES OF Joint Motion to Dismiss Case #1085 Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter. Hearing held. Court to issue an order. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (dro)
June 12, 2017 Filing 1171 MINUTES OF Joint Motion to dismiss case #1085 Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter. Hearing held and continued to June 13, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (dro)
June 9, 2017 Filing 1170 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Corbin Knight Barthold counsel for Defendant WebMD Health & Welfare Plan. Adding Corbin K. Barthold as counsel of record for Defendant WebMD Health & Welfare Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant WebMD Health & Welfare Plan. (Attorney Corbin Knight Barthold added to party WebMD Health & Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Corbin Knight Barthold added to party WebMD Health & Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(Barthold, Corbin)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: re: Hearing on Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 . The hearing scheduled for June 12, 2017, will not be mandatory for defense counsel. See minute order for more information. (twdb)
June 1, 2017 Filing 1168 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert B Humphreys counsel for Defendants Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund, Independence Blue Cross, Inc., Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, USAble Mutual Insurance Company, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Associates Health & Welfare Plan. Katherine M. Katchen will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Katherine M. Katchen is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund, USAble Mutual Insurance Company (dba Arkansas Blue Cross & Blue Shield), Independence Blue Cross, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Associates Health & Welfare Plan. (Humphreys, Robert)
June 1, 2017 Filing 1167 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert B Humphreys counsel for Defendants Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund, Independence Blue Cross, Inc., Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, USAble Mutual Insurance Company, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Associates Health & Welfare Plan. Robert B. Humphreys will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Robert B. Humphreys is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund, USAble Mutual Insurance Company (dba Arkansas Blue Cross & Blue Shield), Independence Blue Cross, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Associates Health & Welfare Plan. (Humphreys, Robert)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1166 NOTICE of Filing of Tables in Response to Order Calling for Supplemental Information filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(O'Connell, Victor)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1165 REPLY in Support Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 / Addendum #1098 filed by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company. (O'Rourke, Kenneth)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1164 REPLY in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 /Addendum #1093 filed by Defendant Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program. (Diller, Nicole)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1163 REPLY In Support Of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant HL Financial Services, LLC Employee Benefits Plan. (Jaffe, Jill)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1162 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 /Addendum #1094 re: Patient 117 filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Ridley, Eileen)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1161 REPLY In Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan. (Ernster, Shannon)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1160 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 /Addendum #1092 filed by Defendant ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program. (Ridley, Eileen)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1159 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1158 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 /Addendum #1091 filed by Defendant Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust. (Ridley, Eileen)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1157 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendants Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1156 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1155 REPLY In Support Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Joining Reply)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1154 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1153 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to GKN Employee Welfare Benefit Plan. (Kourasis, Kristina)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1152 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to Ascension SmartHealth Medical Plan. (Kourasis, Kristina)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1151 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke on behalf of Defendants Baxter International Inc. and Subsidiaries Welfare Benefit Plan, Consolidated Graphics, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Delta Kappa Gamma Society International Health Benefit Plan, Dirt Free Flood Services Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Elliott Electric Supply, L.P. Health Benefit Plan, Ensco Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates, H.E. Butt Grocery Company Welfare Benefit Plan, Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company, IESI Corporation Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, ION Geophysical Corporation Group Health Plan, Active Power, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Ardent Health Services Welfare Benefit Plan, Pioneer Energy Services Corp. Group Health Plan, Randall S. Fudge P.C. Employee Benefits Plan, Tenet Employee Benefit Plan, The Group Life and Health Benefits Plan for Employees of Participating AMR Corporation Subsidiaries, The Southwest Shipyard, L.P. Cafeteria Plan, United Surgical Partners, Intl Welfare Benefit Plan, Xerox Business Services, LLC Funded Welfare Benefit Plan (Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Baxter International Inc. and Subsidiaries Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Baxter International Inc. and Subsidiaries Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Consolidated Graphics, Inc. Group Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Consolidated Graphics, Inc. Group Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Delta Kappa Gamma Society International Health Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Delta Kappa Gamma Society International Health Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Dirt Free Flood Services Inc. Health Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Dirt Free Flood Services Inc. Health Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Elliott Electric Supply, L.P. Health Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Elliott Electric Supply, L.P. Health Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Ensco Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Ensco Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party H.E. Butt Grocery Company Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party H.E. Butt Grocery Company Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party IESI Corporation Employee Welfare Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party IESI Corporation Employee Welfare Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party ION Geophysical Corporation Group Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party ION Geophysical Corporation Group Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Active Power, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Active Power, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Ardent Health Services Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Ardent Health Services Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Pioneer Energy Services Corp. Group Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Pioneer Energy Services Corp. Group Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Randall S. Fudge P.C. Employee Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Randall S. Fudge P.C. Employee Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Tenet Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Tenet Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party The Group Life and Health Benefits Plan for Employees of Participating AMR Corporation Subsidiaries(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party The Group Life and Health Benefits Plan for Employees of Participating AMR Corporation Subsidiaries(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party The Southwest Shipyard, L.P. Cafeteria Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party The Southwest Shipyard, L.P. Cafeteria Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party United Surgical Partners, Intl Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party United Surgical Partners, Intl Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Xerox Business Services, LLC Funded Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke added to party Xerox Business Services, LLC Funded Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(O'Rourke, Kenneth)
May 25, 2017 Filing 1150 REPLY Yes Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 in Support of Addendum to Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #1109 filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan. (Barker, Neil)
May 23, 2017 Filing 1149 NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Brendan S. Maher, Kristina Kourasis, Victor A. O'Connell, and Seth D. Zajac to Peter K. Stris and Brendan S. Maher. filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc., (O'Connell, Victor)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Calling for Supplemental Information by Judge David O. Carter. In order to assist the Court in ruling on the pending motion to dismiss (Dkt. #1085 ), Plaintiffs are ordered to update the tables they previously created for the Court (Dkt. 1009). Plaintiffs may include additional tables or categories that they believe will assist the Court in understanding what claims are alleged against which Defendants. Plaintiffs are further ordered to provide (1) a table listing the amount they are currently owed for the services they provided on per patient basis, and (2) a table listing the name of the provider entity that was on each assignment alleged in the Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall comply with this order on or before May 30, 2017. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (dro)
May 17, 2017 Filing 1147 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hanna Chandoo counsel for Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Thomas Edward Logan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., et al.. (Chandoo, Hanna)
May 17, 2017 Filing 1146 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hanna Chandoo on behalf of Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. (Attorney Hanna Chandoo added to party Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Hanna Chandoo added to party Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Hanna Chandoo added to party Adeona Healthcare, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Hanna Chandoo added to party Adeona Healthcare, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Hanna Chandoo added to party Satya Health of California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Hanna Chandoo added to party Satya Health of California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Hanna Chandoo added to party Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Hanna Chandoo added to party Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Hanna Chandoo added to party Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Hanna Chandoo added to party Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Hanna Chandoo added to party Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Hanna Chandoo added to party Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(pty:pla))(Chandoo, Hanna)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1145 Notice of Withdrawal of Objection/Opposition (Motion related),,, #1144 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (O'Connell, Victor)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1144 DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN Opposition to Addendum #1087 re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Addendum #1091 , #2 Opposition to Addendum #1092 , #3 Opposition to Addendum #1093 , #4 Opposition to Addendum #1094 , #5 Opposition to Addendum #1096 , #6 Opposition to Addendum #1097 , #7 Opposition to Addendum #1098 , #8 Opposition to Addendum #1099 , #9 Opposition to Addendum #1100 , #10 Opposition to Addendum #1101 , #11 Opposition to Addendum #1103 , #12 Opposition to Addendum #1105 , #13 Opposition to Addendum #1108 , #14 Opposition to Addendum #1109 )(O'Connell, Victor) Modified on 5/11/2017 (twdb).
May 8, 2017 Filing 1143 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Stris, Peter)
April 27, 2017 Filing 1142 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (A)(i) as to Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund, Independence Blue Cross, Inc.. (Kourasis, Kristina)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. The Court, having considered the parties' requests #1135 stemming from their joint notifications that Plaintiffs DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., et al. ("Plaintiffs") and named Defendants INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, INC ("Independence) and BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 1 PA/DE HEALTH & WELFARE FUND ("Bricklayers Fund") have reached settlement in principle, HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. Independence and the Bricklayers Fund shall be granted an additional fourteen (14) days, through April 27, 2017, in which to file their respective answer, motion or other response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; and 2. If a Dismissal with Prejudice as to Independence and Bricklayers Fund is filed on or before April 27, 2017, compliance with this deadline for that party shall be excused and not reset. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
April 12, 2017 Filing 1140 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #1138 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 12, 2017 Filing 1139 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel J Woods counsel for Defendant Alliant Insurance Services Welfare Benefits Plan. Dan Woods will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Dan Woods is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alliant Insurance Services Welfare Benefits Plan. (Woods, Daniel)
April 12, 2017 Filing 1138 NOTICE filed by Defendant Alliant Insurance Services, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan Alliant Insurance Services Welfare Benefits Plan. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Diedrich, Peter)
April 11, 2017 Filing 1137 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Monica A Novak counsel for Defendant Time Warner Cable Benefits Plan. David R. Levin will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Time Warner Cable Benefits Plan. (Novak, Monica)
April 11, 2017 Filing 1136 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Monica A Novak counsel for Defendant Time Warner Cable Benefits Plan. Monica A. Novak will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Time Warner Cable Benefits Plan. (Novak, Monica)
April 11, 2017 Filing 1135 NOTICE of Settlement AND STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ACCOMPANYING [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Defendants Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund, Independence Blue Cross, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Robert)
April 6, 2017 Filing 1134 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shelley Tolman counsel for Defendants Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan. Shelley Tolman will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.; BCBS of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan; Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan. (Tolman, Shelley)
April 6, 2017 Filing 1133 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Keith Beauchamp counsel for Defendants Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan. Keith Beauchamp will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.; BCBS of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan; Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan. (Beauchamp, Keith)
April 6, 2017 Filing 1132 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Molly K Madden counsel for Defendant Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan. Changing e-mail to MMadden@goodwinlaw.com. Filed by defendant NTENT, Inc. formerly known as Vertical Search Works, Inc.. (Madden, Molly)
April 6, 2017 Filing 1131 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Hong-An Vu counsel for Defendant Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan. Changing e-mail to HVu@goodwinlaw.com. Filed by defendant NTENT, Inc. formerly known as Vertical Search Works, Inc.. (Vu, Hong-An)
April 6, 2017 Filing 1130 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Y Jung counsel for Defendant Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund. Michael Y. Jung will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund. (Jung, Michael)
April 6, 2017 Filing 1129 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Susan Graham Lovelace counsel for Defendant Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund. Susan Graham Lovelace will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund. (Lovelace, Susan)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. The Court, having considered the parties requests #1125 stemming from their joint notifications that Plaintiffs DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., et al. ("Plaintiffs") and named Defendants INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, INC (Independence) and BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 1 PA/DE HEALTH & WELFARE FUND ("Bricklayers Fund") have reached settlement in principle, HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. Independence and the Bricklayers Fund shall be granted an additional fourteen (14) days, through April 13, 2017, in which to file their respective answer, motion or other response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; and 2. If a Dismissal with Prejudice as to Independence and Bricklayers Fund is filed on or before April 13, 2017, compliance with this deadline for that party shall be excused and not reset. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1127 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Alliant Insurance Services Welfare Benefits Plan. (Logan, Thomas)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1126 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Time Warner Cable Benefits Plan. (Logan, Thomas)
March 30, 2017 Filing 1125 NOTICE of Settlement AND STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ACCOMPANYING [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Defendants Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund, Independence Blue Cross, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Robert)
March 28, 2017 Filing 1124 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority In Support of Defendants Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Joining Notice of Supplemental Authority, #3 Exhibit 1 - DB HEALTHCARE, LLC (2017 WL 1075050))(Ridley, Eileen)
March 27, 2017 Filing 1123 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to Yates Petroleum Corporation, et al. Flexible Benefits Cafeteria Plan. (Kourasis, Kristina)
March 23, 2017 Filing 1122 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund. (Kourasis, Kristina)
March 23, 2017 Filing 1121 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan. (Kourasis, Kristina)
March 23, 2017 Filing 1120 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan. (Kourasis, Kristina)
March 23, 2017 Filing 1119 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.. (Kourasis, Kristina)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #1117 Non-Resident Attorney Glunz, Emily A. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Owens-Illinois Salary Employees Welfare Benefit, GEICO Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program and Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, designating Kim, Anna as local counsel. (dv)
March 21, 2017 Filing 1117 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily A. Glunz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program, Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 3/20/2017, Receipt No. 19540611) filed by Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program, Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kim, Anna)
March 20, 2017 Filing 1116 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily A. Glunz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program, Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Pla #1115 . The following error(s) was/were found: Superseded version of Form G-64 used. (lt)
March 20, 2017 Filing 1115 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily A. Glunz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program, Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19540611) filed by Defendant Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program, Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attach ments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kim, Anna)
March 14, 2017 Filing 1114 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #1113 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 13, 2017 Filing 1113 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hilary Erin Feybush counsel for Defendants Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan, eHealthInsurance Services, Inc.. Hilary E. Feybush is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants EHealthInsurance Services, Inc. and Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan. (Feybush, Hilary)
March 9, 2017 Filing 1112 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Maynard A Buck counsel for Defendant Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees. Katrina O. Tesner is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees. (Buck, Maynard)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS AND EXTEND TIME TO EXCHANGE INITIAL DISCLOSURES #1110 by Judge David O. Carter: Plaintiffs shall have until May 8, 2017 to file their Opposition to Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint and supporting Addenda (the "Motion"); Defendants shall have until May 30, 2017 to file their Reply Brief in support of the Motion; and Plaintiffs and Defendants shall exchange initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(f) within 30 days of the Court's ruling on the Motion. (dv)
March 7, 2017 Filing 1110 Joint STIPULATION for Order To Set A Briefing Schedule On Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss and Extend Time to Exchange Initial Disclosures filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Joining Stipulation, #3 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1109 ADDENDUM BY DEFENDANTS TAC MANUFACTURING, INC. EMPLOYEE WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN AND USUI INTERNATIONAL GROUP HEALTH & WELFARE PLAN TO DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [WITH CONCURRENTLY-FILED DECLARATIONS BY VICTORIA L. BURNETT] re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victoria Burnett in Support of Addendum by Defendant TAC Manufacturing, Inc. etc., #2 Exhibit 1 to Burnett Declaration (TAC Plan), #3 Exhibit 2 to Burnett Declaration (TAC Plan), #4 Exhibit 3 to Burnett Declaration (TAC Plan), #5 Exhibit 4 to Burnett Declaration (TAC Plan), #6 Exhibit 5 to Burnett Declaration (TAC Plan), #7 Declaration of Victoria Burnett in Support of Addendum by Defendant USUI International Group, etc., #8 Exhibit 1 to Burnett Declaration (USUI Plan))(Barker, Neil)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1108 JOINDER in Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Bayhealth Medical Center Employee Health and Dental Insurance Plan. (Wozniak, Todd)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1107 DECLARATION of MEGAN SMITH IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendants Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1)(von Behren, William)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. The Court, having considered the parties' requests stemming from their joint notifications that Plaintiffs DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., et al. ("Plaintiffs") and named Defendants INDEPENDENCE BLUE CROSS, INC ("Independence") and BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS LOCAL 1 PA/DE HEALTH & WELFARE FUND ("Bricklayers Fund") have reached settlement #1082 in principle, HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. Independence and the Bricklayers Fund shall be granted an additional thirty (30) days, through March 31, 2017, in which to file their respective answer, motion or other response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint; and 2. If a Dismissal with Prejudice as to Independence and Bricklayers Fund is filed within 30 days, compliance with this deadline for that party shall be excused and not reset. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1105 ADDENDUM TO OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendants Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1104 DECLARATION of DANIELLE CONWAY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1)(von Behren, William)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1103 ADDENDUM TO OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1102 DECLARATION of STEVE K. CRIST IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(von Behren, William)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1101 ADDENDUM TO OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1100 MEMORANDUM in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant UFCW LOCAL 555 - EMPLOYERS HEALTH TRUST. (Klein, Elise)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1099 ADDENDUM TO OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 Corrected Exhibit A attached filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1098 ADDENDUM TO OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company. (Boyle, Brian)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1097 DEFENDANT HL FINANCIAL'S ADDENDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant HL Financial Services, LLC Employee Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin J. Evans in Support of Defendant's Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)(Jaffe, Jill)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1096 DEFENDANT ALLTECH INC. BENEFIT PLAN'S ADDENDUM TO DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 (Ernster, Shannon)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1095 DECLARATION of Shree Vaid In Support of Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan's Joinder In Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1094 THE ANTHEM DEFENDANTS' ADDENDUM IN SUPPORT OF OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO PATIENT 117 re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1093 GEICO CORPORATION CONSOLIDATED WELFARE BENEFITS PROGRAM'S ADDENDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program. (Diller, Nicole)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1092 ADDENDUM TO OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1091 ADDENDUM TO OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1090 DECLARATION of Gregory Armknecht In Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1089 ADDENDUM TO OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1088 DECLARATION of Patient 257's Spouse in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lovelace, Susan)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1087 ADDENDUM TO OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA IBEW-NECA HEALTH TRUST FUND re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund. (Lovelace, Susan)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1086 DECLARATION of of Matthew Jones in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #1085 filed by Defendant Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan. (Madden, Molly)
March 1, 2017 Filing 1085 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. Motion set for hearing on 6/12/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Joining Motion, #3 Exhibit C - Twenty-Six Defendants, #4 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #5 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #6 Exhibit B - Defendants Joining Motion, #7 Exhibit C - Twenty-Six Defendants, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Exhibit A to [Proposed] Order) (Ridley, Eileen)
February 28, 2017 Filing 1084 NOTICE of Settlement in Principle as to Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan, and Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kourasis, Kristina)
February 28, 2017 Filing 1083 NOTICE of Settlement in Principle as to Alliant Insurance Services Welfare Benefits Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Kourasis, Kristina)
February 28, 2017 Filing 1082 NOTICE of Settlement in Principle as to Independence Blue Cross, Inc. and Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
February 24, 2017 Filing 1081 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster counsel for Defendants Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan, eHealthInsurance Services, Inc.. Adding Shannon Lissa Ernster as counsel of record for EHealthInsurance Services, Inc. and Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants EHealthInsurance Services, Inc. and Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan. (Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party eHealthInsurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party eHealthInsurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ernster, Shannon)
February 15, 2017 Filing 1080 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher J Rillo counsel for Defendant The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan. Christopher J. Rillo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan. (Rillo, Christopher)
February 15, 2017 Filing 1079 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Christopher J Rillo counsel for Defendant The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan. Changing Jenner & Block LLP to 633 West 5th Street, Suite 3600, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Changing email to crillo@jenner.com. Filed by Defendant The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan. (Rillo, Christopher)
February 9, 2017 Filing 1078 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #1077 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak)
February 8, 2017 Filing 1077 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Linda B Oliver counsel for Defendant The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan. Christopher J. Rillo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan. (Oliver, Linda)
February 8, 2017 Filing 1076 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Linda B Oliver counsel for Defendant The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan. Adding Linda B. Oliver as counsel of record for The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan. (Attorney Linda B Oliver added to party The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Linda B Oliver added to party The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan(pty:dft))(Oliver, Linda)
January 27, 2017 Filing 1075 NOTICE of Change of address by Ronald S Kravitz attorney for Defendants Huntington Bancshares Incorporated Health Care Plan, Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan. Changing attorneys address to 44 Montgomery Street, Suite 650, San Francisco, CA 94104. Filed by Defendants Huntington Bancshares Incorporated Health Care Plan, Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan. (Kravitz, Ronald)
January 9, 2017 Filing 1074 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney J Thomas Gilbert counsel for Defendant Yates Petroleum Corporation, et al. Flexible Benefits Cafeteria Plan. John Thomas Gilbert is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Yates Petroleum Corporation, et al. Flexible Benefits Cafeteria Plan. (Gilbert, J)
January 5, 2017 Filing 1073 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. correcting Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)), #1070 (Attachments: #1 Corrected Notice of Dismissal)(Logan, Thomas)
January 3, 2017 Filing 1072 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bruce J Zabarauskas on behalf of Defendant Yates Petroleum Corporation, et al. Flexible Benefits Cafeteria Plan (Attorney Bruce J Zabarauskas added to party Yates Petroleum Corporation, et al. Flexible Benefits Cafeteria Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce J Zabarauskas added to party Yates Petroleum Corporation, et al. Flexible Benefits Cafeteria Plan(pty:dft))(Zabarauskas, Bruce)
December 23, 2016 Filing 1071 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Baxter International Inc. and Subsidiaries Welfare Benefit Plan, Bayhealth Medical Center Employee Health and Dental Insurance Plan, Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts HMO Blue, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross of California, Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund, C.R. Bard, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, California Physicians Service, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan, Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Community Health Systems Group Health Plan, Community Insurance Company, Consolidated Graphics, Inc. Health Plan, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Covance, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Delta Kappa Gamma Society International Health Benefit Plan, Dirt Free Flood Services Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Does, Dycom Industries Health and Welfare Plan, Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Elliott Electric Supply, L.P. Health Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., Ensco Health Plan, Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Excellus Health Plan, Inc., F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Fastrac Markets LLC Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan, GKN Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program, General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Globys, Inc. Group Health Plan, Green Tree Comprehensive Welfare Plan, Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates, Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Group Welfare Plan For Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, H.E. Butt Grocery Company Welfare Benefit Plan, HDR, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, HL Financial Services, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, Hawaii Medical Service Association, Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield, Highmark Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Huntington Bancshares Incorporated Health Care Plan, IESI Corporation Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, ION Geophysical Corporation Group Health Plan, Independence Blue Cross, Inc., Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, J.R. Simplot Company Group Health & Welfare Plan, Jennings American Legion Hospital Employee Benefit Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, L Brands, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Layne Christensen Company Health and Welfare Plan, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Line Construction Benefit Fund, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Martin Marietta Medical Plan, MediaNews Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Medtronic, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Morris Bart Employee Benefits Plan, Mueller Water Products, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, 3M Employees Welfare Benefits Association (Trust II), ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Active Power, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan, Alliant Insurance Services Welfare Benefits Plan, Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Ardent Health Services Welfare Benefit Plan, Asante Employee Benefits Plan, Ascension SmartHealth Medical Plan, BCBSM, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. Group Medical Plan, Orasure Technologies Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan, Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Pioneer Energy Services Corp. Group Health Plan, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska, Profit Insight Holdings, LLC Group Health Plan, Publix Super Markets, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan, Puget Sound Pilots Group Health Plan, Randall S. Fudge P.C. Employee Benefits Plan, Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation, Rocket Software Group Insurance Benefits Plan, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., SAS Institute Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, SCANA Corporation Health & Welfare Plan, Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Seabright Insurance Company Group Health Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund, Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan, St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, TUV America, Inc. Insurance Benefits Plan, Tenet Employee Benefit Plan, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Group Life and Health Benefits Plan for Employees of Participating AMR Corporation Subsidiaries, The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan, The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Master Builders Association Health Insurance Trust, The Southwest Shipyard, L.P. Cafeteria Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Time Warner Cable Benefits Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan, Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund, U.S. Renal Care, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, UFCW LOCAL 555 - EMPLOYERS HEALTH TRUST, USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan, United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits, United Surgical Partners, Intl Welfare Benefit Plan, University of Nebraska Foundation Welfare Benefits Plan, Verizon National PPO West, Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, WebMD Health & Welfare Plan, Wellmark, Inc., Wells Fargo & Co. Health Plan, Xerox Business Services, LLC Funded Welfare Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan, Yates Petroleum Corporation, et al. Flexible Benefits Cafeteria Plan, eHealthInsurance Services, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #298 , filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stris, Peter)
December 22, 2016 Filing 1070 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Mercy Health Services, Inc. and Subsidiaries Medical Plan. (Logan, Thomas)
December 9, 2016 Filing 1069 DECLARATION of DANIELLE CONWAY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION REGARDING PATIENT 87 filed by Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 2-A)(von Behren, William)
December 9, 2016 Filing 1068 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT: Document No. #1067 filed on 12/07/16 is stricken for failure to comply with L.R. 5-4.3.1 - which requires that the PDF image for a document filed with the Court must be created by using word processing software and published to PDF so that they are text-searchable. PDF images created by scanning paper documents are prohibited. Defendants were specifically ordered to familiarize themselves with this local rule in the Court's ruling on their motion to dismiss. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 7, 2016 Filing 1067 **DOCUMENT STRICKEN SEE DOCKET NO. 1068**DECLARATION of DANIELLE CONWAY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION REGARDING PATIENT 87 filed by Defendant Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 2-A)(von Behren, William) Modified on 12/9/2016 (dgo).
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Granting Stipulation Request to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File Second Amended Complaint, Defendants to File a Response to the Second Amended Complaint, and the Exchange of Initial Disclosure #1065 . The Court, having considered the accompanying Stipulated Request To Extend Time For Plaintiffs To File Second Amended Complaint, Defendants To File A Response To The Second Amended Complaint, And The Exchange Of Initial Disclosures, and for good cause shown, HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: (see document for details). (dro)
November 30, 2016 Filing 1065 STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulated Request To Extend Time For Plaintiffs To File Second Amended Complaint, Defendants To File A Response To The Second Amended Complaint, And The Exchange Of Initial Disclosures filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell in support of Stipulated Request, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Connell, Victor)
November 29, 2016 Filing 1064 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory K Lee counsel for Defendants Frank Calandra, Inc. Medical Plan, NHS Human Services Welfare Plan, Sierra Nevada Brewing Co. Welfare Benefits Plan. Gregory K Lee will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Frank Calandra, Inc.; NHS Human Services Welfare Plan; Sierra Nevada Brewing Co. Welfare Benefits Plan. (Lee, Gregory)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting in part #637 Omnibus MOTION to Dismiss Case. (see document for details). (dro)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #1059 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney John M Moscarino terminated. (lwag)
September 30, 2016 Filing 1061 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alan R Ouellette on behalf of Defendant Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees (Attorney Alan R Ouellette added to party Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees(pty:dft), Attorney Alan R Ouellette added to party Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees(pty:dft))(Ouellette, Alan)
September 30, 2016 Filing 1060 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael A Naranjo on behalf of Defendant Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees (Attorney Michael A Naranjo added to party Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Naranjo added to party Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees(pty:dft))(Naranjo, Michael)
September 30, 2016 Filing 1059 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Eileen R. Ridley in place of attorney John M. Moscarino filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Eileen R Ridley added to party Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees(pty:dft), Attorney Eileen R Ridley added to party Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees(pty:dft)) (Ridley, Eileen)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (see document for details). (dro)
September 21, 2016 Filing 1057 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as SACV 15-00736 DOC (DFMx). (dv)
September 21, 2016 Filing 1056 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to The Milton S. Hershey Medical Center Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kourasis, Kristina)
September 21, 2016 Filing 1055 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Joining in Filing of Stipulated Protective Order)(Ridley, Eileen)
September 19, 2016 Filing 1054 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial TBD, filed by Defendant Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan.. (Diller, Nicole)
September 13, 2016 Filing 1053 NOTICE of Settlement in Principle as to the Milton S. Hershey Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Stris, Peter)
September 13, 2016 Filing 1052 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial TBD, filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc... (Stris, Peter)
August 17, 2016 Filing 1051 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to U.S. LBM Holdings, LLC Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kourasis, Kristina)
August 11, 2016 Filing 1050 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Molly K Madden on behalf of Defendant Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan (Attorney Molly K Madden added to party Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Molly K Madden added to party Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan(pty:dft))(Madden, Molly)
August 4, 2016 Filing 1049 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Frank Calandra, Inc. Medical Plan. (Logan, Thomas)
August 1, 2016 Filing 1048 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Order Denying EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File a Response #1045 (mt)
August 1, 2016 Filing 1047 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Planto Notice (Other), #909 Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 28, 2016 Filing 1046 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Response to Plaintiffs Objections and Disputes to Documents Filed Pursuant to the Courts June 24, 2016 Order #1045 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Stris, Peter)
July 28, 2016 Filing 1045 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Response to Plaintiffs Objections and Disputes to Documents Filed Pursuant to the Courts June 24, 2016 Order filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #2 Declaration of Eileen R. Ridley, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eileen R. Ridley, #4 Proposed Order) (Ridley, Eileen)
July 27, 2016 Filing 1044 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. correcting Response, #1041 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell)(O'Connell, Victor)
July 26, 2016 Filing 1043 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Sierra Nevada Brewing Co. Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kourasis, Kristina)
July 26, 2016 Filing 1042 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to NHS Human Services Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kourasis, Kristina)
July 25, 2016 Filing 1041 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #904 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #2 Exhibit A)(Stris, Peter)
July 25, 2016 Filing 1040 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jill Nicole Jaffe counsel for Defendant HL Financial Services, LLC Employee Benefits Plan. Eric Brin is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant H.L. Financial Services. (Jaffe, Jill)
July 15, 2016 Filing 1039 SECOND ADDENDUM TO OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts HMO Blue, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania, C.R. Bard, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, California Physicians Service, Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Covance, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Dycom Industries Health and Welfare Plan, Excellus Health Plan, Inc., F.N.B. Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Fastrac Markets LLC Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan, GKN Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, General Nutrition Group Insurance Plan, Globys, Inc. Group Health Plan, Henry Schein, Inc. Dependent and Medical Flexible Spending Account Plan, Highmark BCBSD, Inc., Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield, Highmark Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Inlandboatmens Union of the Pacific National Health Benefit Trust, Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Jennings American Legion Hospital Employee Benefit Plan, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Martin Marietta Medical Plan, Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan, Novartis Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Asante Employee Benefits Plan, Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. Group Medical Plan, Orasure Technologies Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Peak 10, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska, Profit Insight Holdings, LLC Group Health Plan, Publix Super Markets, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan, Puget Sound Pilots Group Health Plan, Rayonier, Inc. Welfare Plans, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation, SAS Institute Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, SCANA Corporation Health & Welfare Plan, Seabright Insurance Company Group Health Plan, Simmons Welfare Benefit Plan, Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan, TUV America, Inc. Insurance Benefits Plan, The Master Builders Association Health Insurance Trust, TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan, U.S. Renal Care, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits, Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Addendum)(Attorney William E von Behren added to party Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Interrail Signals, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Northern California Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Profit Insight Holdings, LLC Group Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Profit Insight Holdings, LLC Group Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party U.S. Renal Care, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party U.S. Renal Care, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
July 15, 2016 Filing 1038 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. correcting Declaration (Motion related), #992 of Etta Strong in Support of Addendum to the Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Diller, Nicole)
July 15, 2016 Filing 1037 NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendant The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan. (Regarding Declaration of Sharon K. Clark [Dkt. No. 942]) (Ridley, Eileen)
July 15, 2016 Filing 1036 DECLARATION of Greg Armknecht (Second Supplemental) In Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Berry Plastics ASA Agreement and Amendments, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wellfount ASA Agreement and Amendments)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 14, 2016 Filing 1035 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Monica A Novak counsel for Defendant Time Warner Cable Benefits Plan. Joseph Charles Faucher is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Time Warner Cable Benefits Plan. (Novak, Monica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1034 DECLARATION of Tammy Krajca in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Xerox Business Services, LLC Funded Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1033 DECLARATION of Cindy English in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant United Surgical Partners, Intl Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1032 DECLARATION of Michelle J. Jones in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Tenet Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1031 DECLARATION of Martin Decamp in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant The Southwest Shipyard, L.P. Cafeteria Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1030 DECLARATION of Greg L. Lakey in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Pioneer Energy Services Corp. Group Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1029 DECLARATION of Lawrence Burke in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant ION Geophysical Corporation Group Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1028 DECLARATION of Rebecca C. Muriedas in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant H.E. Butt Grocery Company Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1027 DECLARATION of Robin Webb in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation, a Mutual Legal Reserve Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1026 DECLARATION of Randall S. Fudge in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Randall S. Fudge P.C. Employee Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1025 DECLARATION of Dana Dumas in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Group Health & Welfare Benefits Plan of American Eagle Airlines, Inc. & Its Affiliates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1024 DECLARATION of CAROL BURNEY LEWIS IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Chicos FAS, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Martin Marietta Medical Plan, Alaska Air Group, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1 - BCBST - Patient 30, #3 Exhibit 2 - BCBSFL - Patient 38, #4 Exhibit 3 - BCBSNC - Patient 48, #5 Exhibit 4 - Horizon - Patient 60, #6 Exhibit 5 - BCBST - Patient 76, #7 Exhibit 6 - Horizon - Patient 107, #8 Exhibit 7 - BCBST - Patient 121, #9 Exhibit 8 - Regence - Patient 139, #10 Exhibit 9 - Premera - Patient 155, #11 Exhibit 10 - Horizon - Patient 168, #12 Exhibit 11 - BCBSNC - Patient 212, #13 Exhibit 12 - BCBSFL - Patient 220, #14 Exhibit 13 - BCBSFL - Patient 223, #15 Exhibit 14 - BCBSFL - Patient 227, #16 Exhibit 15 - BCBST - Patient 241)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1023 DECLARATION of Melissa Hutchinson in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 3, #2 Exhibit Attachment 4, #3 Exhibit Attachment 5, #4 Exhibit Attachment 6 (Part 1 of 3), #5 Exhibit Attachment 6 (Part 2 of 3), #6 Exhibit Attachment 6 (Part 3 of 3))(Diller, Nicole)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1022 DECLARATION of Lisa Gutierrez in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Ensco Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1021 DECLARATION of William M. Elliott, Sr. in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Elliott Electric Supply, L.P. Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration 3)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1020 DECLARATION of Phyllis A. Hickey in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Delta Kappa Gamma Society International Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1019 DECLARATION of Katherine M. Ege in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Consolidated Graphics, Inc. Group Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1018 DECLARATION of Sandra Lahera in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Baxter International Inc. and Subsidiaries Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1017 DECLARATION of Greg Armknecht in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Target Medical Pharma Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ameriflight LLC Group Benefit Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3- ADP TotalSource Benefit Booklet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Rauh Polymers Certificate of Coverage, #5 Exhibit 5- Rauh Polymers Master Contract, #6 Exhibit 6 - Wyman-Gordon Certificate of Coverage, #7 Exhibit 7- Wyman-Gordon Group Healthcare Benefits Contract, #8 Exhibit 8 - Globecast America Group Benefits Agreement, #9 Exhibit 9- The Catholic Diocese of Youngstown Group Health Benefit Booklet, #10 Exhibit 10 - The Catholic Diocese of Youngstown Administrative Services Agreement, #11 Exhibit 11 - Eureka Realty Partners Group Benefit Agreement, #12 Exhibit 12 - US Battery Corp. Group Benefit Agreement, #13 Exhibit 13 - The Active Network Benefit Booklet, #14 Exhibit 14 - The Active Network Administrative Services Agreement, #15 Exhibit 15 - Amendments to the Active Network Administrative Services Agreement, #16 Exhibit 16 - Berry Plastics Medical Benefit Booklet Premier Gold PPO Plan, #17 Exhibit 17 - TOPA Equities Benefits Booklet, #18 Exhibit 18 - TOPA Equities Group Policy, #19 Exhibit 19 - The Laundry List.com Benefit Booklet, #20 Exhibit 20 - The Laundry List.com Group Benefit Agreement and Amendments, #21 Exhibit 21 - Prince William County Government and School Enhanced Medical Plan Member Booklet, #22 Exhibit 22 - Prince William County Administrative Services Agreement, #23 Exhibit 23 - Prince William County Amendments to Administrative Services Agreement, #24 Exhibit 24 - CA Assn Golf and Private Clubs Combined Evidence of Coverage, #25 Exhibit 25 - CA Assn Golf and Private Clubs Group Benefit Agreement, #26 Exhibit 26 - Experian Benefits Summary Plan Description, #27 Exhibit 27 - Steak n Shake Health Benefits Booklet, #28 Exhibit 28 - Steak n Shake Administrative Services Agreement and Amendments, #29 Exhibit 29 - Cooperative Education Certificate of Coverage, #30 Exhibit 30 - Wellfount Health Certificate, #31 Exhibit 31 - Intevac Group Benefit Agreement, #32 Exhibit 32 - The Boucher Group Health Certificate, #33 Exhibit 33 - The Boucher Group Master Contract, #34 Exhibit 34 - Emulex Evidence of Coverage, #35 Exhibit 35 - Emulex Group Benefit Agreement)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1016 DECLARATION of Adrienne Schneider in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant The Group Life and Health Benefits Plan for Employees of Participating AMR Corporation Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1015 DECLARATION of ROBERT BEGG IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Asante Employee Benefits Plan, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1 - Wrap Plan Document, #3 Exhibit 2 - Summary Plan Description)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1014 DECLARATION of JOEL A. DANIEL IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. Group Medical Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1 - Ogletree Plan 2014, #3 Exhibit 2 - Summary Plan Description)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1013 DECLARATION of MEGAN SMITH IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants F5 Networks, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Natures Path Foods, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Premera Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska, Seabright Insurance Company Group Health Plan, Spokane Teachers Credit Union Employee Medical & Dental Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1-A - Seabright Group Contract, #3 Exhibit 2-A - Petersburg Group Contract 2014, #4 Exhibit 2-B - Petersburg Group Contract 2015, #5 Exhibit 6-A - Nature's Path Group Contract)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1012 DECLARATION of DEBORAH BURGER IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield, Highmark Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 4-A - Summary Plan Description - FNB Plan, #3 Exhibit 4-B - Benefits Booklet, #4 Exhibit 8-A - Summary Plan Description - GNC Plan)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1011 DECLARATION of Neil Hemphill in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Ardent Health Services Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1010 DECLARATION of Dawn Cheyten in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Active Power, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kilgore, Raymond)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1009 SUPPLEMENT in Response to the Court's Orders of June 24, 2016 #904 and June 30, 2016 #908 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stris, Peter)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1008 DECLARATION of RICHARD EKMAN IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1 - Trust Agreement and Amendment, #3 Exhibit 2 - Summary Plan Description)(Attorney William E von Behren added to party Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Machinists Health & Welfare Trust Fund(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1007 DECLARATION of STEVEN COVINO IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts HMO Blue, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 3 - Wrap Document)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1006 DECLARATION of Nancy G. Ross In Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ross, Nancy)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1005 DECLARATION of Heidi Palencia in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PPO Explanation of Coverage)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1004 DECLARATION of Karen North in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant J.R. Simplot Company Group Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Zi, Monica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1003 DECLARATION of Tammy L. Janus in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Mercy Health Services, Inc. and Subsidiaries Medical Plan. (Diller, Nicole)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1002 DECLARATION of Denise Hoskinson in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant HL Financial Services, LLC Employee Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jaffe, Jill)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1001 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Verizon National PPO West. correcting Declaration (Motion related),, #994 Of Eric Kane (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8A - ASA and Amendments, #2 Exhibit 8B - ASA and Amendments)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1000 DECLARATION of Karen Horne in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tolman, Shelley)
July 13, 2016 Filing 999 DECLARATION of Christine Epper in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Tolman, Shelley)
July 13, 2016 Filing 998 DECLARATION of Michael Hodge in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Attorney Monica Jar-Kay Zi added to party Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Monica Jar-Kay Zi added to party Albertsons LLC Health & Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(Zi, Monica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 997 DECLARATION of KIEHL C. CAUTHORN IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund, Independence Blue Cross, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to K. Cauthorn Declaration)(Humphreys, Robert)
July 13, 2016 Filing 996 DECLARATION of DANIELLE HANNINGS IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 PA/DE Health & Welfare Fund, Independence Blue Cross, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to D. Hannings Declaration)(Humphreys, Robert)
July 13, 2016 Filing 995 DECLARATION of Tina Amelung in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Zi, Monica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 994 DECLARATION of Eric Kane in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Verizon National PPO West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Summary Plan Description, #2 Exhibit 2 - Choices Plan, #3 Exhibit 3 - GTE Bargained Group Insurance Plan, #4 Exhibit 4 - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2014 Summary of Material Modifications, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2015 Summary of Material Modifications, #7 Exhibit 7 - Plan for Group Insurance, #8 Exhibit 8 - ASA and Amendments)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 993 DECLARATION of Joanne M. Keller in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - E)(Lovelace, Susan)
July 13, 2016 Filing 992 DECLARATION of Etta Strong in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 5)(Diller, Nicole)
July 13, 2016 Filing 991 DECLARATION of Carmen Glasser in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zi, Monica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 990 DECLARATION of DEBORAH BURGER IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania, Highmark, Inc., Simmons Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 989 DECLARATION of DANIELLE CONWAY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Jennings American Legion Hospital Employee Benefit Plan, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Attorney William E von Behren added to party Jennings American Legion Hospital Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Jennings American Legion Hospital Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 988 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 Plan Instruments Submitted in Response to Court's Order of June 24, 2016 filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, TAC Manufacturing, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, USUI International Group Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USUI Intl Plan Documents, #2 Exhibit B - TAC Mfgr Plan Documents)(Barker, Neil)
July 13, 2016 Filing 987 DECLARATION of DANA SCHEELE IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Regence Insurance Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 986 DECLARATION of Margaret Bandt in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan. (Zi, Monica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 985 DECLARATION of Patti Jones in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Huntington Bancshares Incorporated Health Care Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kravitz, Ronald)
July 13, 2016 Filing 984 DECLARATION of KIMBERLY DICKENS IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Dycom Industries Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plan Instrument, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2014 Benefits Guide)(Attorney William E von Behren added to party Dycom Industries Health and Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Dycom Industries Health and Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 983 DECLARATION of Keith D. Bilezerian in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Medtronic, Inc. Group Insurance Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zi, Monica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 982 DECLARATION of Karen Howard re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #904 filed by Defendant The Hartford Fire Insurance Company Employee Medical and Dental Expense Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2013 Hartford PPO Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2015 Hartford PPO Plan, #3 Exhibit 3 - ASA)(Rillo, Christopher)
July 13, 2016 Filing 981 DECLARATION of E. Michael Castle, II In Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan. (Feybush, Hilary)
July 13, 2016 Filing 980 DECLARATION of Connie Esquibel in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Yates Petroleum Corporation, et al. Flexible Benefits Cafeteria Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Administrative Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Benefit Booklet, #3 Exhibit C - Summary of Benefits and Coverages, #4 Exhibit D - Benefit Program Application)(Gilbert, J)
July 13, 2016 Filing 979 DECLARATION of Tammy Sue Krajca in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2013 Enrollment Guide, #3 Exhibit 3 - Medical Summary Plan Description)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 978 DECLARATION of Sean B O'Connor in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exhibits A and B, #3 Exhibit 3 - Group Contract, #4 Exhibit 4 - Rider, #5 Exhibit 5 - Plan Summary, #6 Exhibit 6 - Enrollment Booklet)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 977 DECLARATION of Rachel Jobin in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Administrative Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amendment 1, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amendment 2, #4 Exhibit 4 - Benefit Booklet)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 976 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 in Response to Court's Order of June 24, 2016 filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Mueller Water Products, Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Keith Black)(Barker, Neil)
July 13, 2016 Filing 975 SUPPLEMENT to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 (Supplemental Memorandum in support of its joinder) filed by Defendant UFCW LOCAL 555 - EMPLOYERS HEALTH TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pati Piro-Bosley in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Klein, Elise)
July 13, 2016 Filing 974 DECLARATION of Reyna Herrera in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2013 Benefit Booklet, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2014 Benefit Booklet)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 973 DECLARATION of Adrienne Pyle in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan, #2 Exhibit 2- Summary Plan Description, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2012 Summary of Material Modifications, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2013 Summary of Material Modifications)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 972 DECLARATION of Nancy Bellmore in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Rocket Software Group Insurance Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Rocket Software Group Insurance Benefits Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Subscriber Certificate)(McClellan, Nathan)
July 13, 2016 Filing 971 DECLARATION of Robert K. Hertel in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Summary Plan Description, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2003-2009 Summary of Material Modifications, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2010-2013 Summary of Material Modifications, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2014-2016 Summary of Material Modifications)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 970 DECLARATION of Thomas A. Jackson in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan, Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., Green Tree Comprehensive Welfare Plan, MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Medtronic, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, 3M Employees Welfare Benefits Association (Trust II), BCBSM, Inc., St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zi, Monica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 969 DECLARATION of Mark Chaump in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amendment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Second Amendment, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2012 Summary Plan Description, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2014 Plan, #6 Exhibit 6 - Third Amendment, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2014 Summary Plan Description)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 968 DECLARATION of Megan Broderick in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Pepsico Employee Health Care Program. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 967 DECLARATION of Timothy Zellmer in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan, Employees Benefit Plan of General Mills, Inc., Green Tree Comprehensive Welfare Plan, MDU Resources Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Program, Medtronic, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Metal-Matic, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, 3M Employees Welfare Benefits Association (Trust II), BCBSM, Inc., St. Lukes Lutheran Care Center Employee Health Care Plan, Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Twin Cities Bakery Drivers Health & Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zi, Monica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 966 DECLARATION of Ikeda Drew in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2015 Benefits Guide, #2 Exhibit 2 - Benefits Booklet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summary of Benefits and Coverage)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 965 DECLARATION of John P. Scharf in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Welfare Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Health Plan)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 964 DECLARATION of Sara Freitag in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Medical Benefits Booklet)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 963 DECLARATION of Mark Lamberth in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Kentucky Construction Industry Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Trust, #2 Exhibit 2- Insurance Policy and Service Contract, #3 Exhibit 3 - Kentucky Health Plan)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 962 DECLARATION of Julee Weller in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- 2014 Handbook, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2015 Handbook)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 961 DECLARATION of JENNIFER GARRISON IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross of California, California Physicians Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Attorney William E von Behren added to party Blue Cross of California(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Blue Cross of California(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 960 DECLARATION of Supplemental Declaration of Don Buben in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan and Amendments)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 959 DECLARATION of KAREN NIXON IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. Group Medical Plan, SCANA Corporation Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 958 DECLARATION of Tony Robertson in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Layne Christensen Company Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Shlesinger, Amir)
July 13, 2016 Filing 957 DECLARATION of Richard A Ellspermann in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amendment, #3 Exhibit 3- Benefit Booklet)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 956 DECLARATION of SHERI DEEN IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 955 DECLARATION of Jane Mannon in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 to be considered with Declaration of Lisa M. Abbott and Exhibits thereto #680 filed by Defendant The Milton S. Hershey Medical Center Health and Welfare Plan. (Kojima, Keiko)
July 13, 2016 Filing 954 DECLARATION of Carl Refsal in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summary Plan Description)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 953 DECLARATION of Holly Graves in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Zi, Monica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 952 DECLARATION of THERESA MCINERNEY IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts HMO Blue, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 5 - Premium Account Agreement)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 951 DECLARATION of Michael Spicci in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Ernst & Young Medical Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2014 Medical Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2013 Medical Plan)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 950 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Denying Stipulation to Continue Deadline to Comply with the Court's June 24, 2016 Order re: Stipulation #921 . On July 12, 2016, Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Mercy Health Services, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan filed a Stipulation to Continue (Dkt. 921). The Court denied that request on July 12, 2016 (Dkt. 925), however the wrong Proposed Order was actually stamped denied. For Clarification, the Court intended to deny the Stipulation to Continue. Therefore, the Stipulation to Continue filed at Docket 921 is DENIED. The Order contained at Docket 932 concerning Defendants NHS Plan, Sierra Nevada Plan, and JENNMAR Plan still stands. (mba)
July 13, 2016 Filing 949 DECLARATION of Monica Lanzi in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Plan, #2 Exhibit 2- Summary Plan Description, #3 Exhibit 3 - Benefits Guide, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summary of Benefits and Coverage)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 948 DECLARATION of STEVE K. CRIST IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 5 - Group Contract-TriNet Plan)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 947 DECLARATION of Nicholas Ashley in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Benefit Booklet)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 946 DECLARATION of Supplemental Declaration of Shree Vaid Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan. (Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 945 DECLARATION of Sandra Smith in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Classic Plan, #2 Exhibit 2- Summary of Benefits, #3 Exhibit 3- ASA and Amendments)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 944 DECLARATION of Mark Anderson in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Wrap Plan, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2- Health Component Plan, #3 Exhibit 3- PPO Summary Plan Description)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 943 DECLARATION of Stacy Lezaja in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Alliant Insurance Services Welfare Benefits Plan. (Diedrich, Peter)
July 13, 2016 Filing 942 DECLARATION of Sharon K. Clark In Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Summary Plan Description, #2 Exhibit 2- Benefit Booklet)(Ridley, Eileen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 941 DECLARATION of Benjamin Garrison In Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant L Brands, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Young, Alexandrea)
July 13, 2016 Filing 940 DECLARATION of Mark Dolsky in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, HDR, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, University of Nebraska Foundation Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Zi, Monica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 939 DECLARATION of Kathleen Maaliki Court's June 24, 2016 Order Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant MediaNews Group Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit)(Franco, Nancy)
July 13, 2016 Filing 938 DECLARATION of Kathy Currey in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shlesinger, Amir)
July 13, 2016 Filing 937 DECLARATION of Stacey Rice in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Cargill, Incorporated & Participating Affiliates Group Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shlesinger, Amir)
July 13, 2016 Filing 936 DECLARATION of NANCY WEBSTER IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Covance, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1 - Covance Plan Instrument, #3 Exhibit 2 - Covance Summary Plan Description)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 935 DECLARATION of Suzanne West In Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Transport Corporation of America, Inc. Employee Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Shlesinger, Amir)
July 13, 2016 Filing 934 DECLARATION of CAROL BURNEY LEWIS IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc., Corrections Corporation of America SCA Employees Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(Attorney William E von Behren added to party Corrections Corporation of America SCA Employees Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Corrections Corporation of America SCA Employees Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 933 DECLARATION of Valerie Lester In Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant eHealthInsurance Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 in Support of EHealthInsurance Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 in Support of EHealthInsurance Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 in Support of EHealthInsurance Declaration)(Feybush, Hilary)
July 13, 2016 Filing 931 DECLARATION of DEBBIE DOUGLAS IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Wellmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 930 DECLARATION of DANA SCHEELE IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Globys, Inc. Group Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 929 DECLARATION of SHEA KOLAR IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Excellus Health Plan, Inc., Fastrac Markets LLC Employee Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 4 - WrapAround Summary Plan Description)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 928 DECLARATION of ROSEANN FRANCO IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 with EXHIBIT A filed by Defendant Henry Schein, Inc. Dependent and Medical Flexible Spending Account Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 927 DECLARATION of ROSEANN FRANCO IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Henry Schein, Inc. Dependent and Medical Flexible Spending Account Plan. (Attorney William E von Behren added to party Henry Schein, Inc. Dependent and Medical Flexible Spending Account Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Henry Schein, Inc. Dependent and Medical Flexible Spending Account Plan(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
July 13, 2016 Filing 926 DECLARATION of Wanda Lessner In Support Of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. (De Gravelles, Patrick)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 932 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Continuing Deadlines for Settling Parties re #915 , #922 , #923 . The NHS Plan, Sierra Nevada Plan, and JENNMAR Plan shall be granted an additional month to comply with the Court's previously ordereddeadline to submit additional documentation (see ECF No. 908). The new deadlineto submit the additional documentation is Friday August 12, 2016; If a Request for Dismissal as to an above party is filed within 30 days, compliance with this deadline for that party shall be excused and not reset. (mba)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 925 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, *DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT* re Stipulation to Continue, #921 (mba)
July 12, 2016 Filing 924 DECLARATION of Matthew Jones in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 and NTENT, Inc.'s, Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.'s and Carefirst of Maryland, Inc.'s Joinder in Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Vertical Search Works, Inc. Medical Plan. (Vu, Hong-An)
July 12, 2016 Filing 923 Joint STIPULATION for Settlement in Principle as to the Frank Calandra, Inc. Medical Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stris, Peter)
July 12, 2016 Filing 922 Joint STIPULATION for Settlement in Principle as to Sierra Nevada Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stris, Peter)
July 12, 2016 Filing 921 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to Comply with the Court's June 24, 2016 Order as Amended filed by Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, Mercy Health Services, Inc. and Subsidiaries Medical Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Diller, Nicole)
July 12, 2016 Filing 920 DECLARATION of JOHN PUCCIO IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Publix Super Markets, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2014 Member Handbook, #3 Exhibit 2 - Summary Plan Description, #4 Exhibit 3 - Summaries of Material Modification to SPD)(Attorney William E von Behren added to party Publix Super Markets, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Publix Super Markets, Inc. Group Health Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
July 12, 2016 Filing 919 DECLARATION of J. MICHAEL WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant United States Steel Plan for Active Employee Insurance Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
July 12, 2016 Filing 918 DECLARATION of PHILIP LEGAN IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant TUV America, Inc. Insurance Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants)(von Behren, William)
July 12, 2016 Filing 917 DECLARATION of DAVID SIMMONS IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant SCANA Corporation Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plan Instrument, #3 Exhibit 2 - Summary Plan Description)(von Behren, William)
July 12, 2016 Filing 916 DECLARATION of KRISTI PAYNE BENITEZ IN SUPPORT OF Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant C.R. Bard, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VBH Defendants, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summary Plan Description, #3 Exhibit 3 - Administrative Services Agreement)(von Behren, William)
July 12, 2016 Filing 915 Joint STIPULATION for Settlement in Principle as to the NHS Plan filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stris, Peter)
July 12, 2016 Filing 914 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to University of Hawaii / Chaminade University Student Plan. (Logan, Thomas)
July 12, 2016 Filing 913 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Hawaii Medical Service Association. (Logan, Thomas)
July 11, 2016 Filing 912 JOINT STIPULATION AS TO CERTAIN PATIENT CLAIMS filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #904 (Stris, Peter)
July 11, 2016 Filing 911 DECLARATION of Karen Charielle in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant U.S. LBM Holdings, LLC Employee Benefit Plan. (Shakouri, Jennifer)
July 8, 2016 Filing 910 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Cargotec Holding, Inc. Group Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kourasis, Kristina)
July 1, 2016 Filing 909 NOTICE Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stris, Peter)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 908 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Stipulated Request to Continue the Deadline to Comply with the Court's June 24th Minute Order and the Deadline to Confer Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(F)(1) re Stipulation #907 .(see document for details) (mba)
June 30, 2016 Filing 907 Joint STIPULATION to Continue (1)The Deadline To Comply with the Courts June 24th Minute Order and (2) The Deadline To Confer Pursuant To Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f)(1) filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Joining Stipulation, #3 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen)
June 28, 2016 Filing 906 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/31/2016 at 6:17 p.m. re Transcript #905 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dhs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 28, 2016 Filing 905 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/31/2016 at 6:17 p.m.****Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE HINO-SPAAN at: WEBSITE www.debbiehinospaan.com; E-mail, dhinospaan@yahoo.com before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Additional formats of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available to be purchased at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.** Redaction Request due 7/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2016. (dhs)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 904 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: Order re: Supplemental Briefing, re: Joint Motion to Dismiss Case #637 . (dgo)
June 23, 2016 Filing 903 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Sarah Herbert at sherbert@maynardcooper.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Rillo, Christopher)
June 21, 2016 Filing 902 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Frank Calandra, Inc. Medical Plan, NHS Human Services Welfare Plan, Sierra Nevada Brewing Co. Welfare Benefits Plan for Court Reporter. Court will contact Cora Hernandez at cora.hernandez@wilsonelser.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Lee, Gregory)
June 16, 2016 Filing 901 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan for Court Reporter. Court will contact Laura Hammargren at LHammargren@mayerbrown.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Ross, Nancy)
June 2, 2016 Filing 900 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Thomas Edward Logan at tom.logan@strismaher.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Logan, Thomas)
May 31, 2016 Filing 899 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing on Joint Motions to Dismiss Case #246 , #637 held before Judge David O. Carter: Motion hearing held. Oral argument heard. The Court takes the matter under submission. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
May 29, 2016 Filing 898 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rachana A Pathak counsel for Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs Adeona Healthcare, Inc.; Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.; Satya Health of California, Inc.; Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.; Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc.; and Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attorney Rachana A Pathak added to party Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rachana A Pathak added to party Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rachana A Pathak added to party Adeona Healthcare, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rachana A Pathak added to party Adeona Healthcare, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rachana A Pathak added to party Satya Health of California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rachana A Pathak added to party Satya Health of California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rachana A Pathak added to party Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rachana A Pathak added to party Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rachana A Pathak added to party Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rachana A Pathak added to party Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rachana A Pathak added to party Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rachana A Pathak added to party Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.(pty:pla))(Pathak, Rachana)
May 27, 2016 Filing 897 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge David O. Carter. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 5/31/16. Counsel shall consult the error(s) noted in the Notice of Deficiency #891 and re-file. (lwag)
May 27, 2016 Filing 896 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant eHealthInsurance Services, Inc., identifying eHealthInsurance Services, Inc. - Defendant; Blue Cross of California dba Anthem Blue Cross - Defendant/Medical Claims Administrator; Chubb & Son, a division of Federal Insurance Company - Insurance Carrier. (Attorney Hilary Erin Feybush added to party eHealthInsurance Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Feybush, Hilary)
May 27, 2016 Filing 895 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Alltech, Inc. Benefit Plan, identifying eHealthInsurance Services, Inc. - Defendant; Blue Cross of California dba Anthem Blue Cross - Defendant/Medical Claims Administrator; Chubb & Son, a division of Federal Insurance Company - Insurance Carrier. (Feybush, Hilary)
May 27, 2016 Filing 894 SUPPLEMENT to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 Defendants' (1) Notice of Supplemental Authority, and (2) Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendants' (1) Notice of Supplemental Authority and (2) Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority, #2 Exhibit 1 to Defendants' (1) Notice of Supplemental Authority and (2) Response to Plaintiffs' Noticeof Supplemental Authority)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 26, 2016 Filing 893 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Rocket Software Group Insurance Benefits Plan, identifying Rocket Software. (McClellan, Nathan)
May 26, 2016 Filing 892 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nathan M McClellan on behalf of Defendant Rocket Software Group Insurance Benefits Plan (Attorney Nathan M McClellan added to party Rocket Software Group Insurance Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan M McClellan added to party Rocket Software Group Insurance Benefits Plan(pty:dft))(McClellan, Nathan)
May 26, 2016 Filing 891 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert E. Glaze to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17882564) #889 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: No signature on Application. Local counsel failed to sign the application. Staff signed. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64); Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. See LR 83-2.1.3.4. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
May 25, 2016 Filing 890 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anna Kim counsel for Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan, Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program, Mercy Health Services, Inc. and Subsidiaries Medical Plan, Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. Andrew G. Sakallaris is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Anna Kim. (Kim, Anna)
May 25, 2016 Filing 889 **STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY #897** APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert E. Glaze to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17882564) filed by Defendants CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (De Gravelles, Patrick) Modified on 5/27/2016 (lwag).
May 23, 2016 Filing 888 NOTICE Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Stris, Peter)
May 18, 2016 Filing 887 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Corrections Corporation of America SCA Employees Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Logan, Thomas)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 886 ORDER Granting Stipulated Request to Continue the Deadline to Confer Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(F)(1) #885 by Judge David O. Carter: The Court, having considered the Plaintiffs and Defendants Stipulated RequestTo Continue The Deadline To Confer Pursuant To Rule 26(f)(1), and good causeappearing, hereby orders as follows: The current deadline to finish conferring as set forth in Rule 26(f)(1) shall be continued to June 30, 2016; Based on the agreement of the parties, Plaintiffs and Defendants shall not begin conducting party discovery until after the parties finish conferring pursuant to Rule26(f)(1); and Notwithstanding the foregoing, Plaintiffs may subpoena records from Med Pro Billing, Inc. and Availity, LLC and Defendants may subpoena records from Medical Concierge, Inc. at this time. (lwag)
May 17, 2016 Filing 885 Joint STIPULATION to Continue the Deadline to Confer Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(F)(1) from May 13, 2016 to June 30, 2016 filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Foley Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Joining Stipulation, #3 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen)
May 17, 2016 Filing 884 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to USAble Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kourasis, Kristina)
May 4, 2016 Filing 883 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Associates Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kourasis, Kristina)
May 3, 2016 Filing 882 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Liberty Mutual Medical Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kourasis, Kristina)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 881 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge David O. Carter: granting #880 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Keith Beauchamp on behalf of Defendants Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., and Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan, designating John M. LeBlanc as local counsel. (lt)
April 26, 2016 Filing 880 APPLICATION for attorney Keith Beauchamp to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17714560 paid.) filed by Defendants Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney John M LeBlanc added to party Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney John M LeBlanc added to party Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan(pty:dft), Attorney John M LeBlanc added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John M LeBlanc added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John M LeBlanc added to party Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan(pty:dft), Attorney John M LeBlanc added to party Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan(pty:dft)) (LeBlanc, John)
April 26, 2016 Filing 879 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #246 , Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 . The Motion Hearing previously scheduled for 5/3/2016 @ 5:30 PM has been rescheduled. Motion Hearing RESCHEDULED to 5/31/2016 @ 5:30 PM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 19, 2016 Filing 878 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan, identifying UNS Energy Corporation; Fortis, Inc.. (Tolman, Shelley)
April 5, 2016 Filing 877 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jill Nicole Jaffe counsel for Defendant HL Financial Services, LLC Employee Benefits Plan. Kate B. Ward (Pro Hac Vice) is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant HL Financial, LLC. (Jaffe, Jill)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Stipulated Request for Leave for Defendant Tenet Employee Benefit Plan to File Joinder in Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Establish Related Deadlines re Stipulation #867 .(see document for deatails) (mba)
April 5, 2016 Filing 875 REPLY in support of omnibus motion to dismiss Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Yates Petroleum Corporation, et al. Flexible Benefits Cafeteria Plan. (Gilbert, J)
April 4, 2016 Filing 874 REPLY in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 [Reply Addendum in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint] filed by Defendant Geico Corporation Consolidated Welfare Benefits Program. (Diller, Nicole)
April 4, 2016 Filing 873 REPLY in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 [Reply Addendum in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint] filed by Defendant Mercy Health Services, Inc. and Subsidiaries Medical Plan. (Diller, Nicole)
April 4, 2016 Filing 872 REPLY in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 [Reply Addendum in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint] filed by Defendant Owens-Illinois Hourly Employees Welfare Benefit Plan. (Diller, Nicole)
April 4, 2016 Filing 871 REPLY in Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Bimbo Bakeries USA Health and Welfare Plan. (Diller, Nicole)
April 4, 2016 Filing 870 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Tenet Employee Benefit Plan identifying Tenet Healthcare Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Kilgore, Raymond)
April 4, 2016 Filing 869 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tenet Employee Benefit Plan, (Kilgore, Raymond)
April 4, 2016 Filing 868 JOINDER in Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Tenet Employee Benefit Plan. (Attorney Brian David Boyle added to party Tenet Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Brian David Boyle added to party Tenet Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Boyle, Brian)
April 4, 2016 Filing 867 STIPULATION for Leave to File Joinder in Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Establish Related Deadlines filed by Defendant Tenet Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore added to party Tenet Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Raymond Collins Kilgore added to party Tenet Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Kilgore, Raymond)
April 4, 2016 Filing 866 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew W Close on behalf of Defendant Tenet Employee Benefit Plan (Attorney Matthew W Close added to party Tenet Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W Close added to party Tenet Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Close, Matthew)
April 4, 2016 Filing 865 REPLY in Support of Joinder in Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 and Omnibus Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss at ECF Dkt. # 856 filed by Defendant Bayhealth Medical Center Employee Health and Dental Insurance Plan. (Birenbaum, Charles)
April 4, 2016 Filing 864 REPLY in support DEFENDANT EATON CORPORATION MEDICAL PLAN FOR U.S. EMPLOYEES' REPLY ADDENDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation Medical Plan for U.S. Employees. (Buck, Maynard)
April 4, 2016 Filing 863 JOINDER filed by Defendants Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc. Employee Health Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona, Inc., Tucson Electric Power Company Employee Group Insurance Plan joining in Reply (Motion related),,,,,,, #856 . (Tolman, Shelley)
April 4, 2016 Filing 862 REPLY in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant U.S. LBM Holdings, LLC Employee Benefit Plan. (Shakouri, Jennifer)
April 4, 2016 Filing 861 REPLY Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant UFCW LOCAL 555 - EMPLOYERS HEALTH TRUST. (Klein, Elise)
April 4, 2016 Filing 860 Reply BRIEF filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. In Support of Anthem Defendants' Addendum to Omnibus Motion to Dismiss regarding Joinder (Motion Related),,,,,,, #652 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Anthem Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
April 4, 2016 Filing 859 REPLY In Support of Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Time Warner Cable Benefits Plan. (Novak, Monica)
April 4, 2016 Filing 858 OBJECTIONS to Motion Related Document,,, #835 Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Victor O'Connell filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants, #3 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 857 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion to Dismiss by Judge David O. Carter. The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #637 ) and related filings is currently set for Monday, April 18, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing is hereby CONTINUED until Tuesday, May 3, 2016 at 5:30 p.m. The hearing is scheduled at 5:30 p.m. to avoid conflicts with other court appearances. All counsel are required to be present. As per the Initial Standing Order (Dkt. 218), the Court does not permit telephonic appearances. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (dro)
April 4, 2016 Filing 856 REPLY In Support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendants Bloomberg L.P. Health and Welfare Plan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, CNS Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Community Insurance Company, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Ernst & Young Medical Plan, Ferguson Enterprises Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, LeCroy Health and Disability Benefit Plan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. Group Benefits Plan, Northrop Grumman Corporation Group Benefits Plan, ACWA/JPIA Employee Benefits Program, Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, Peak Finance Company Group Health Plan, Pepsico Employee Health Care Program, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Sage Software Inc. and Co-Sponsoring Affiliates Health and Welfare Plan, Sallie Mae Employees Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Local No. 40 Health Fund, The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, The Anthem Companies, Inc., The Kroger Co. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, The Steak N Shake Employee Benefit Plan, Verizon National PPO West, ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Xerox Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthem Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants)(Ridley, Eileen)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting #852 Request to Substitute Joann V. Lee, retained counsel, as attorney of record for defendant Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan, instead of Mark. Re. Phillips. (dro)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting #851 Request to Substitute Attorney William E. VonBehren, retained counsel, as attorney of record for defendant Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan, instead of Mark R. Phillips. (dro)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 853 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting #850 Request to Substitute Attorney Carol Burney Lewis, Retained Counsel, as attorney of record for defendant Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan, instead of Mark R. Phillips. (dro)
April 1, 2016 Filing 852 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Mark R. Phillips as counsel of record filed by defendant Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Joann V Lee added to party Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Joann V Lee added to party Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan(pty:dft)) (Lee, Joann)
April 1, 2016 Filing 851 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Mark R. Phillips as counsel of record filed by defendant Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney William E von Behren added to party Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan(pty:dft), Attorney William E von Behren added to party Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan(pty:dft)) (von Behren, William)
April 1, 2016 Filing 850 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Mark R. Phillips as counsel of record filed by defendant Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party Fresenius Medical Care North America Medical Plan(pty:dft)) (Lewis, Carol)
March 25, 2016 Filing 849 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to WaferTech LLC Health & Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kourasis, Kristina)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 848 ORDER Granting Stipulated Request for Leave to File Joinder #841 by Judge David O. Carter: The Court HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: Defendant shall file and serve joinder as of January 26, 2016; Plaintiffs shall file and serve their opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before March 21, 2016; Defendant shall file and serve its reply to the motion to dismiss on or before April 4, 2016; and The deadline to confer set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f)(1) is HEREBY CONTINUED to May 13, 2016. See document for further information. (lwag)
March 25, 2016 Filing 847 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Y Jung counsel for Defendant Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund. Adding Michael Y. Jung as counsel of record for Defendant, Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund. (Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Y Jung added to party Southern California IBEW-NECA Health Trust Fund(pty:dft))(Jung, Michael)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 846 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Stipulated Request for Leave for Defendant Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan's Joinder in Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint to File Joinder in Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Establish Related Deadlines #837 (mt)
March 24, 2016 Filing 845 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Group Welfare Plan For Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kourasis, Kristina)
March 23, 2016 Filing 844 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alan R Ouellette on behalf of Defendant Intevac Life and Welfare Plan (Attorney Alan R Ouellette added to party Intevac Life and Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Alan R Ouellette added to party Intevac Life and Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(Ouellette, Alan)
March 23, 2016 Filing 843 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael A Naranjo on behalf of Defendant Intevac Life and Welfare Plan (Attorney Michael A Naranjo added to party Intevac Life and Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Naranjo added to party Intevac Life and Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(Naranjo, Michael)
March 23, 2016 Filing 842 JOINDER in Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Intevac Life and Welfare Plan. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 23, 2016 Filing 841 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to File Joinder In Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Establish Related Deadlines filed by Defendant Intevac Life and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Eileen R Ridley added to party Intevac Life and Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Eileen R Ridley added to party Intevac Life and Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(Ridley, Eileen)
March 23, 2016 Filing 840 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alan R Ouellette on behalf of Defendant Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan (Attorney Alan R Ouellette added to party Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Alan R Ouellette added to party Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan(pty:dft))(Ouellette, Alan)
March 23, 2016 Filing 839 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael A Naranjo on behalf of Defendant Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan (Attorney Michael A Naranjo added to party Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Naranjo added to party Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan(pty:dft))(Naranjo, Michael)
March 23, 2016 Filing 838 JOINDER in Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 23, 2016 Filing 837 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to to File Joinder In Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Establish Related Deadlines filed by Defendant Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Eileen R Ridley added to party Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Eileen R Ridley added to party Ameriflight, LLC Group Life & Health Insurance Plan(pty:dft))(Ridley, Eileen)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 836 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulated Request for Further Extension of Briefing Deadlines Regarding Addendum of Liberty Mutual Medical Plan to Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint re Stipulation #833 .(see document for details) (mba)
March 21, 2016 Filing 835 Opposition Addendum re #647 re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Opposition Addendum re #652 , #2 Opposition Addendum re #657 , #3 Opposition Addendum re #670 , #4 Opposition Addendum re #683 , #5 Opposition Addendum re #693 , #6 Opposition Addendum re #704 , #7 Opposition Addendum re #707 , #8 Opposition Addendum re #710 , #9 Opposition Addendum re #712 , #10 Opposition Addendum re #727 , #11 Declaration of Melody Yen, #12 Certificate of Service)(O'Connell, Victor)
March 21, 2016 Filing 834 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victor O'Connell, #2 Chart 1, #3 Chart 2, #4 Chart 3)(Stris, Peter)
March 21, 2016 Filing 833 STIPULATION for Order Further Extension of Briefing Deadlines Regarding Addendum of Liberty Mutual Medical Plan to Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kourasis, Kristina)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 832 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulated Request for Leave for Defendant Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan to File Joinder in Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Establish Related Deadlines re #822 .(see document for details) (mba)
March 18, 2016 Filing 831 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Intel Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, identifying Intel Corporation. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 18, 2016 Filing 830 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Lincoln Electric Company Welfare Benefits Plan, identifying The Lincoln Electric Company and Lincoln Electric Holdings, Inc.. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 18, 2016 Filing 829 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Lilly Employee Welfare Plan, identifying Eli Lilly and Company. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 18, 2016 Filing 828 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Aerospace Corporation Group Hospital-Medical Plan, identifying The Aerospace Corporation. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 18, 2016 Filing 827 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Gentiva Health Services Health & Welfare Plan, identifying Gentiva Health Services, Inc. and Kindred Healthcare, Inc.. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 18, 2016 Filing 826 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Follett Corporation Employees Benefit Trust, identifying Follett Corporation. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 18, 2016 Filing 825 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alan R Ouellette on behalf of Defendant Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan (Attorney Alan R Ouellette added to party Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Alan R Ouellette added to party Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan(pty:dft))(Ouellette, Alan)
March 18, 2016 Filing 824 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael A Naranjo on behalf of Defendant Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan (Attorney Michael A Naranjo added to party Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Michael A Naranjo added to party Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan(pty:dft))(Naranjo, Michael)
March 18, 2016 Filing 823 JOINDER in Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 18, 2016 Filing 822 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to File Joinder In Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Establish Related Deadlines filed by Defendant Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Eileen R Ridley added to party Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Eileen R Ridley added to party Globecast Health and Welfare Benefits Plan(pty:dft))(Ridley, Eileen)
March 15, 2016 Filing 821 JOINDER in Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Simmons Welfare Benefit Plan. (Lewis, Carol)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 820 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter; Granting Leave for Defendant Simmons Welfare Benefit Plan to File Joinder in Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Establish Related Deadlines, re Stipulation #819 .(see document for details) (mba)
March 14, 2016 Filing 819 STIPULATION for Joinder in Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 , STIPULATION for Leave to File Joinder in Omnibus Motion to Dismiss filed by defendant Simmons Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Simmons Welfare Benefit Plan to File Joinder in Omnibus Motion to Dismiss FAC)(Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party Simmons Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party Simmons Welfare Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Lewis, Carol)
March 14, 2016 Filing 818 JOINDER in Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant TriNet Employee Benefit Insurance Plan. (Lewis, Carol)
March 14, 2016 Filing 817 JOINDER in Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #637 filed by Defendant Puget Sound Pilots Group Health Plan. (Lewis, Carol)
March 10, 2016 Filing 816 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kentucky Construction Industry Trust, identifying Kentucky Construction Industry Trust. (Ridley, Eileen)
March 10, 2016 Filing 815 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bank of the West Employee Benefit Plan, identifying Bank of the West, BancWest Corporation and BNP Paribas. (Ridley, Eileen)