County of Alameda et al v. Richard S. Sackler et al
Plaintiff: City of Oxnard, County of Alameda, City of Costa Mesa, City of Encinitas, City of San Clemente, City of Santa Ana, City Of Anaheim, The People Of The State Of California, City of Placentia, -, City of La Mesa and City of La Habra
Defendant: BEVERLY SACKLER, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Richard S. Sackler, Allergan, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Does 1-100, inclusive,, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Mylan Institutional Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., THERESA SACKLER, Endo International PLC, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Cardinal Health, Inc., DAVID A. SACKLER, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER, CVS Health Corporation, Mylan Technologies, Inc., Thrifty Payless Inc., Mylan Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, KATHE A. SACKLER, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., SPECGX LLC, JONATHAN D. SACKLER, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. and H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Trustee: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Case Number: 8:2019cv02154
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #35 Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Walgreen Co.'s EX PARTE APPLICATION to consolidate hearings. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (twdb)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING JPML HEARING. The Court hereby STAYS the action and holds all pending motions in abeyance. Defendants are ORDERED to file a status report within 3 days of a decision by the JPML, and in any event, every 4 weeks while the stay is pending. All pending hearing dates are VACATED. (twdb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 43 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Collie F James, IV added to party Actavis LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Collie F James, IV added to party Actavis Pharma, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Collie F James, IV added to party Cephalon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Collie F James, IV added to party Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Collie F James, IV added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Collie F James, IV added to party Watson Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft))(James, Collie)
December 30, 2019 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Reply (Motion related), #40 served on December 30, 2019. (Spertus, James)
December 30, 2019 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Reply (Motion related), #40 served on December 30, 2019. (Spertus, James)
December 30, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Consolidation of Hearings Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Walgreen Co.'s Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Hearings and Ex. A #35 filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Spertus, James)
December 30, 2019 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs City Of Anaheim, City of Costa Mesa, City of Encinitas, City of La Habra, City of La Mesa, City of Oxnard, City of Placentia, City of San Clemente, City of Santa Ana, County of Alameda, The People Of The State Of California, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, #38 PROOF OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CVS PHARMACY, INC. AND WALGREEN CO.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE HEARINGS served on 12/27/2019. (Geibelson, Michael)
December 27, 2019 Filing 38 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CVS PHARMACY, INC. AND WALGREEN CO.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE HEARINGS; DECLARATION OF LUCAS MESSENGER OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Consolidation of Hearings Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Walgreen Co.'s Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Hearings and Ex. A #35 filed by Plaintiffs City Of Anaheim, City of Costa Mesa, City of Encinitas, City of La Habra, City of La Mesa, City of Oxnard, City of Placentia, City of San Clemente, City of Santa Ana, County of Alameda, The People Of The State Of California. (Messenger, Lucas)
December 26, 2019 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Consolidation of Hearings Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Walgreen Co.'s Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Hearings and Ex. A #35 (electronic service re Judge Carter's procedures regarding Ex Parte Applications) served on December 26, 2019. (Spertus, James)
December 26, 2019 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Consolidation of Hearings Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Walgreen Co.'s Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Hearings and Ex. A #35 served on December 26, 2019. (Spertus, James)
December 26, 2019 Filing 35 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Consolidation of Hearings Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Walgreen Co.'s Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Hearings and Ex. A filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Spertus, James)
December 23, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #22 filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Dick in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Dick Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Dick Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Dick Declaration, #5 Exhibit D - Dick Declaration, #6 Exhibit E - Dick Declaration)(Dick, Joshua)
December 23, 2019 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation #31 served on December 20, 2019. (Spertus, James)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #28 Non-Resident Attorney Conor B. O'Croinin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc Defendants, designating James W. Spertus as local counsel. (twdb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James W. Spertus, #2 Exhibit No. 1, #3 Exhibit No. 2, #4 Exhibit No. 3, #5 Exhibit No. 4, #6 Exhibit No. 5, #7 Proposed Order) (Spertus, James)
December 20, 2019 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #27 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #26 served on December 19, 2019. (Spertus, James)
December 20, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joshua David Dick counsel for Defendant Walgreen Co.. Adding Joshua D. Dick as counsel of record for Walgreen Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Attorney Joshua David Dick added to party Walgreen Co.(pty:dft))(Dick, Joshua)
December 20, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Conor B. O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24999335) filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Spertus, James)
December 19, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christa L Culver counsel for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Adding Christa L. Culver Wasserman as counsel of record for CVS Health Corporation and CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attorney Christa L Culver added to party CVS Health Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Christa L Culver added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft))(Culver, Christa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James W Spertus counsel for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Adding James W. Spertus as counsel of record for CVS Health Corporation and CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attorney James W Spertus added to party CVS Health Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney James W Spertus added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft))(Spertus, James)
December 18, 2019 Filing 48 Mail Returned addressed to Glenn Sabine re Order #20 . No such person here. (hr)
December 18, 2019 Filing 47 Mail Returned addressed to Glenn Sabine re Order #19 . No such person here. (hr)
December 18, 2019 Filing 25 Mail Returned addressed to Glenn Sabine re Transfer Pursuant to GO 19-03 DECLINED- (related case)(CV-34) #12 (shb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #22 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Messenger, Lucas)
December 17, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
December 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs City Of Anaheim, City of Costa Mesa, City of Encinitas, City of La Habra, City of La Mesa, City of Oxnard, City of Placentia, City of San Clemente, City of Santa Ana, County of Alameda, The People Of The State Of California. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Remand) (Messenger, Lucas)
December 2, 2019 Filing 46 Mail Returned addressed to Glenn Sabine re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) #6 . Return to sender. No such (illegible) here. (hr)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #15 . Defendants Thrifty Payless, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., and Walgreen Co., shall be granted an enlargement of time to respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint until sixty (60) days after this Court rules on any Motion to Remand, or after the JPML makes a final decision regarding transfer to the MDL Proceeding, whichever is later. (twdb)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #17 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #18 . Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals shall be granted an enlargement of time to respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint until sixty (60) days after this Court rules on any Motion to Remand, or after the JPML makes a final decision regarding transfer to the MDL Proceeding, whichever is later. (twdb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond)(Attorney Joseph John Ybarra added to party Kaiser Foundation Hospitals(pty:dft))(Ybarra, Joseph)
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Nathan Evans Shafroth added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft))(Shafroth, Nathan)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Benjamin Patrick Smith on behalf of Defendant Thrifty Payless Inc. (Smith, Benjamin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by defendant Thrifty Payless Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Benjamin Patrick Smith added to party Thrifty Payless Inc.(pty:dft))(Smith, Benjamin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Walgreen Co., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #13 served on 11/14/2019. (Stevens, Charles)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge John F. Walter, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:19-cv-03588 JFW(PLAx) (rn)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02154 DOC(ADSx). (rn)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs City Of Anaheim, City of Costa Mesa, City of Encinitas, City of La Habra, City of La Mesa, City of Oxnard, City of Placentia, City of San Clemente, City of Santa Ana, County of Alameda, The People Of The State Of California. -L.R. 813-1.3.1 Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-03588-JFW-PLA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proof of Service)(Messenger, Lucas)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Defendant Walgreen Co.'s Notice of Filing of Notice in State Court filed by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing of Removal of Action to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California)(Stevens, Charles)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Walgreen Co., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Errata #3 served on 11/08/2019. (Stevens, Charles)
November 7, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs City of La Habra, City of Costa Mesa, County of Alameda, The People Of The State Of California, City of Placentia, City of Encinitas, City Of Anaheim, City of Oxnard, City of La Mesa, City of Santa Ana, City of San Clemente in Orange County Superior Court on 10/4/2019, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walgreen Co., identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. and other potentially interested parties. (Stevens, Charles)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Walgreen Co.. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 Notice of Errata re Civil Cover Sheet (Dkt. No. 1-13) (Stevens, Charles)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Stevens, Charles)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01101802-CU-BT-CXC Receipt No: 0973-24749932 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles J. Stevens in Support of Defendant Walgreen Co.'s Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Related Case, #6 Exhibit E - Notice of Case Assignment, #7 Exhibit F - Motion for Disqualification & Declaration in Support, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Order of Reassignment, #9 Exhibit H - Civil Case Access Info (11/7/19), #10 Exhibit I - Order Staying Actions Pending JPML Action, #11 Exhibit J - JPML Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit K - Alameda Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Charles J Stevens added to party Walgreen Co.(pty:dft))(Stevens, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Alameda et al v. Richard S. Sackler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEVERLY SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Nathan Evans Shafroth
Represented By: Raymond Gin Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Collie F James, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Collie F James, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Collie F James, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Represented By: Grant B Gelberg
Represented By: Joseph John Ybarra, Ybarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID A. SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Collie F James, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Collie F James, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Charles J Stevens
Represented By: Joshua David Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Collie F James, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Christa L Culver
Represented By: James W Spertus
Represented By: Conor B O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHE A. SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN D. SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Christa L Culver
Represented By: James W Spertus
Represented By: Conor B O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Oxnard
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Leslie Devaney
Represented By: Robert Fabela
Represented By: Sonia R Carvalho
Represented By: Scott C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Alameda
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: John Matthew Funk
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Christian Lloyd Bettenhausen
Represented By: Richard D Jones
Represented By: Donna R Ziegler
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Leslie Devaney
Represented By: Robert Fabela
Represented By: Sonia R Carvalho
Represented By: Glenn Sabine
Represented By: Scott C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Costa Mesa
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Leslie Devaney
Represented By: Robert Fabela
Represented By: Sonia R Carvalho
Represented By: Scott C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Encinitas
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Leslie Devaney
Represented By: Robert Fabela
Represented By: Sonia R Carvalho
Represented By: Scott C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of San Clemente
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Leslie Devaney
Represented By: Robert Fabela
Represented By: Sonia R Carvalho
Represented By: Scott C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Santa Ana
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Leslie Devaney
Represented By: Robert Fabela
Represented By: Sonia R Carvalho
Represented By: Scott C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Anaheim
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Leslie Devaney
Represented By: Robert Fabela
Represented By: Sonia R Carvalho
Represented By: Scott C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People Of The State Of California
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Leslie Devaney
Represented By: Robert Fabela
Represented By: Sonia R Carvalho
Represented By: Scott C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Placentia, -
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Leslie Devaney
Represented By: Robert Fabela
Represented By: Sonia R Carvalho
Represented By: Scott C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of La Mesa
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Leslie Devaney
Represented By: Robert Fabela
Represented By: Sonia R Carvalho
Represented By: Scott C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of La Habra
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Leslie Devaney
Represented By: Robert Fabela
Represented By: Sonia R Carvalho
Represented By: Scott C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?