City of Dublin et al v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Dublin, City of Murrieta and The People of the State of California
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Does 1-100, Inclusive, Allergan, Inc., Thrifty Payless Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, Mylan Institutional Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Endo International PLC, SPECGX LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. and H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01202
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING JPML HEARING. All pending hearing dates are VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
August 12, 2020 Filing 26 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court finds the Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #17 is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 8/31/2020 is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. No appearances are necessary on this date and time. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 10, 2020 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from August 31, 2020 to the Later of the Court's Ruling on either (1) Motion to Stay (Docket No. #16 ) or (2) Motion to Remand (Docket No. #17 ) Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #19 filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Continuance of August 31, 2020 Scheduling Conference)(Spertus, James)
August 10, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #17 filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James W. Spertus, #2 Exhibit 1)(Spertus, James)
August 10, 2020 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Finalization of Its Conditional Transfer Order Transferring This Case #16 filed by Plaintiffs City of Dublin, City of Murrieta, The People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Boucher, Raymond)
August 10, 2020 Filing 22 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Finalization of Its Conditional Transfer Order Transferring This Case #16 filed by Plaintiffs City of Dublin, City of Murrieta, The People of the State of California. (Boucher, Raymond)
August 4, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: G-11 prepared in error. The proposed order is attached to the request for judicial notice at [18-7], RE #20 . (twdb)
August 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (rrp)
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #17 filed by Plaintiffs City of Dublin, City of Murrieta, The People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - El Monte Statement of Decision, #2 Exhibit B - Moratorium Order, #3 Exhibit C - Arlington Remand Order, #4 Exhibit D - Boston, #5 Exhibit E - WV Order, #6 Exhibit F - Order Withdrawing Remand Order, #7 Proposed Order)(Boucher, Raymond)
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs City of Dublin, City of Murrieta, The People of the State of California. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Boucher, Raymond)
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Finalization of Its Conditional Transfer Order Transferring This Case filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James W. Spertus in Support of Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1 - Order, In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL No. 2804, dated July 15, 2020, #3 Exhibit 2 - Order, Lac Courte Oreilles Band of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians v. McKesson Corporation, et al., No. 3:18-cv-00286, dated May 25, 2018, #4 Exhibit 3 - Order, Robinson Rancheria v. McKesson Corporation, et al., No. 18-cv-02525-VC, dated July 16, 2018, #5 Exhibit 4 - Order, Commonwealth of Kentucky v. McKesson Corporation, No. 3:18-cv-00010, dated Apr. 12, 2018, #6 Exhibit 5 - List of over 110 cases removed on federal question grounds and transferred to the Opiate MDL, #7 Exhibit 6 - List of over 80 cases removed on Class Action Fairness Act grounds and stayed or transferred to the Opiate MDL, #8 Exhibit 7 - Order, City of Orlando, Florida v. CVS Health Corporation, et al., No. 6:20-cv-00736-RBD-EJK, dated June 15, 2020, #9 Exhibit 8 - Order, Takoma Regional Hospital, et al. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., et al., No. 2:19-cv-00157-HSM-CHS, dated Oct. 4, 2019, #10 Exhibit 9 - Orders, City of Henderson, Kentucky, et al. v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al., No. 3:19-cv-00067-GFVT, and Hardin County Fiscal Court, et al., v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al., No. 3:19-cv-00068, dated Jan. 27, 2020, #11 Exhibit 10 - Order, Dallas County Hospital District Parkland Memorial Hospital, et al. v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al., 4:19-cv-04834, dated Jan. 28, 2020, #12 Proposed Order Granting Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Motion to Stay) (Spertus, James)
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #12 , Notice (Other) #14 , Order #13 served on July 16, 2020. (Spertus, James)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Spertus, James)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #12 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Spertus, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 , Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #8 via USPS served on July 13, 2020. (Spertus, James)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Notice (Other) #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on July 9, 2020. (Spertus, James)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02154-DOC-ADS. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott and Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01202-DOC-ADS. Signed by Judge David O. Carter. (rrp)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Notice in State Court filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Notice of Filing of Removal)(Spertus, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
July 7, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs City of Murrieta, City of Dublin, and The People of the State of California in Orange County Superior Court on 5/26/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on July 7, 2020. (Spertus, James)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT CVS Pharmacy, Inc., identifying Parent CVS Health Corporation and other potentially interested parties. (Spertus, James)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Spertus, James)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California for the County of Orange, case number 30-2020-01140064-CU-FR-CXC Receipt No: ACACDC-27108521 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James W. Spertus, #2 Exhibit A - Superior Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Superior Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit C - Superior Court Summons, #5 Exhibit D - Superior Court Case Assignment, #6 Exhibit E - Superior Court Order dated June 23, 2020, #7 Exhibit F - Superior Court Clerk's Certificate of Service, #8 Exhibit G - Superior Court Docket as of July 7, 2020) (Attorney James W Spertus added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft))(Spertus, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Dublin et al v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: James W Spertus
Represented By: Christa L Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Dublin
Represented By: Maria L Weitz
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Shehnaz M Bhujwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Murrieta
Represented By: Maria L Weitz
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Shehnaz M Bhujwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of California
Represented By: Maria L Weitz
Represented By: Raymond Paul Boucher
Represented By: Shehnaz M Bhujwala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?