State Farm General Insurance Company v. Flybar Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State Farm General Insurance Company
Defendant: Target Corporation, Pacific Cycle Inc., Flybar Inc. and Does 1-20
Case Number: 8:2023cv02239
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Plaintiff State Farm General Insurance Company.. (Lambre, Michelle)
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Flybar Inc..(Attorney Jeffrey E. Zinder added to party Flybar Inc.(pty:dft))(Zinder, Jeffrey E.)
December 29, 2023 Filing 12 Defendant Pacific Cycle Inc.'s Notice of Association of Counsel filed by Defendant Pacific Cycle Inc. (Kohn, Andrew)
December 29, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Pacific Cycle Inc..(Attorney Andrew Nicholas Kohn added to party Pacific Cycle Inc.(pty:dft))(Kohn, Andrew)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 02/05/2024 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 01/26/2024. (eva)
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Target Corporation.(Hahn, Adrienne)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
November 29, 2023 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Flybar Inc., Pacific Cycle Inc., Target Corporation., filed by Plaintiff State Farm General Insurance Company. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/03/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 Notice Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendant Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation. (Hahn, Adrienne)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation, (Hahn, Adrienne)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation. (Hahn, Adrienne)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023-01355261-CU-NP-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-36488583 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Service of Process Transmittal Summary, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Adrienne R. Hahn, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Attorney Adrienne R Hahn added to party Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation(pty:dft))(Hahn, Adrienne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm General Insurance Company v. Flybar Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Michelle Monica Lambre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Adrienne R Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Cycle Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Nicholas Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flybar Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Zinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?