Carter v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Mildred Carter
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2007cv00045
Filed: January 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS RECOMMENDING THE COURT GRANT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 23, 2010. (Lira, I)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the Court Grant Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees Under 42 U.S.C. 406(b) 48 . Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 12/23/2010, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/19/2010. (Herman, H)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Application for Award of Attorney's Fees and Cost under EAJA and ORDER - signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/8/2009. (Herman, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Carter
Represented By: Charles D. Oren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Peter Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?