Pobursky, et al. v. Madera County, et al.
Plaintiff: James S Pobursky and Wanda Pobursky
Defendant: James Sheriff Lt. Bernardi, J. Adkins, Chris Swanson, Warren Anderson, Jacob Tallmon, Karl Hancock, County of Madera - Risk Management Division, Madera County, Sheriff's Department of Madera County, Madera County District Attorney's Office, Madera County Department of Corrections, Madera County Adult Probation Department, Madera County Department of Social Services, Brian Bangerter, Doc's Towing and Transport, Clifton Ginn, John Anderson, Brian Dee Cunnings, Madera County Child Protective Services, Davis, Ackerman, John Johnson, Ernest J Licalsi, Jennifer Blackburn, Cliff Kemper, Regina Bradshaw, Shawn P.K. Huston, Judson Gross, Two Unknown Jail Nurses, Naomi Wyatt, David Allen, Two Unknown Probation Department Staff, Fern Mills and Lynn Annete Hunt
Case Number: 1:2007cv00611
Filed: April 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Court to review Defendant's Cost Bill signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/9/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER ADOPTING in FULL the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 243 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/6/11: Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed IFP on Appeal 241 is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 243 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiffs' application to proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal be DENIED; re 241 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by James S Pobursky, Wanda Pobursky ;referred to Judge Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/16/2011. Objections to F&R due by 4/21/2011 (Martin, S)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER denying 237 Motion for Transcripts at Government expense without prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/17/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER DENYING 231 Plaintiffs to provide additional information in support of their Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/17/2011. (A copy of the form "Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal in Forma Pauperis" mailed to James Poburksy and Wanda Pobursky)(Hernandez, M)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 224 Ex Parte Application for an Order Modifying the Order Amending Scheduling Order IN PART signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/7/2010. Dates set in Current Scheduling Order are VACATED. (Sant Agata, S)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Ex Parte Application for Order Modifying Amended Scheduling Order; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/28/2010. Non-Expert Discovery 12/3/2010; Expert Witness Disclosure 12/17/2010; Expert Discovery 1/14/2011; Non-Dispositive Motion filing 1/21/2011; Dispositive Motion filing 1/28/2011. (Verduzco, M)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 219 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion For Involuntary Dismissal (Documents 206 and 207 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/1/2010. The Court RECOMMENDS that Defendants' Motion For Involuntary Dismissal Be GRANTED And That This Action BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 11/8/2010. (Scrivner, E)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Ex parte Application to Modify Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/30/2010. (Kusamura, W)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER ; denying 204 Motion for Protective Orderwithout prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/27/2010. (Kusamura, W)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER DENYING 208 Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue Hearing and ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/1/2010. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Jessen, A)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING 201 Motion to Re-set the Depositions of Plaintiffs: Christiana Pobursky, Elisha Pobursky and Joshua Pobursky; James Pobursky to be held 07/27/2010 at 9:00 a.m., Wanda Pobursky on 07/27/2010 at 1:30 p.m., Christiana Pobursky on 07/28/2010 at 9:00 a.m., Elisha Pobursky on 07/28/2010 at 10:30 a.m., Joshua Pobursky on 07/28/2010 at 11:30 a.m. ALL TO BE HELD IN COURTROOM 9, 6th FLOOR, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 07/14/2010. (Martin, S)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER DENYING plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration, document 196 ; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/11/2010. (Rooney, M)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Granting Notice of Taking Depositions of Plaintiffs, Christiana Pobursky, Elisha Pobursky and Joshua Poburskyv signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 06/15/2010. Depositions Scheduled for July 6 and 7, 2010 in Courtroom 7. (Flores, E)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES to Schedule Depositions signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/27/2010. The Court ORDERS Defendants to communicate eight (8) proposed dates for the depositions to Plaintiffs by May 31, 2010. Plaintiffs shall chose one of those dates, or propose other dates, by June 10, 2010. (Jessen, A)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Adopting 178 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/10/2010. (Esteves, C)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Staying Discovery; ORDER Amending 149 Scheduling Conference Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/28/2010. Expert Witness Disclosure Deadline 10/1/2010; Non-expert Discovery Deadline 10/29/2010; Expert Discovery Deadline 11/19/2010; Non-Dispositive Motions Filing Deadline 11/24/2010; Dispositive Motions Filing Deadline 12/31/2010; Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 5/4/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.(Verduzco, M)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Order Commanding Attendance at Hearing 181 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/27/2010. (Verduzco, M)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion for Involuntary Dismissal be DENIED; re 1 Complaintand 164 MOTION to DISMISS ; referred to Judge Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 04/5/2010. (If Plaintiffs wish to file a Motion to Stay this action, they must do so within (30 days) of the date of service of this order)(Objections to F&R due by 4/19/2010)(Martin, S)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 174 Ex Parte Motion for Order Commanding Attendance at Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/29/2010. (Flores, E)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 171 Ex Parte Motion for Order Commanding Hearing Attendance; ORDER Moving Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/10/2010. Change of Address for Plaintiff James S. Pobursky only; Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck; Plaintiff's Opposition due by 3/12/2010; Defendants' Reply due by 3/19/2010. (Flores, E)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 163 Request to Certify Interlocutory Appeal; ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 02/04/2010. Opposition due by 2/26/2010; Reply due by 3/05/2010. (Flores, E)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Granting Defendants' 148 Motion to Compel and Request For Sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/23/2009. (Esteves, C)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 140 Ex Parte Application for Further Scheduling Conference; ORDER Setting Further Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/7/2009. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Sondheim, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pobursky, et al. v. Madera County, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sheriff Lt. Bernardi
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Adkins
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Swanson
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Anderson
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Tallmon
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Hancock
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Madera - Risk Management Division
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera County
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff's Department of Madera County
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera County District Attorney's Office
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera County Department of Corrections
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera County Adult Probation Department
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera County Department of Social Services
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bangerter
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc's Towing and Transport
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifton Ginn
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Anderson
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Dee Cunnings
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera County Child Protective Services
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ackerman
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey Richard Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest J Licalsi
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Blackburn
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Kemper
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Bradshaw
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn P.K. Huston
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judson Gross
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Unknown Jail Nurses
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Wyatt
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Allen
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Unknown Probation Department Staff
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fern Mills
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Annete Hunt
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S Pobursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Pobursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?