January 10, 2013 |
Filing
228
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration (ECF No. 224 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/10/2013. (Fahrney, E)
|
February 13, 2012 |
Filing
221
ORDER DENYING 220 Motion for Transcripts, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/13/2012. (Marrujo, C)
|
November 3, 2011 |
Filing
214
ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel as MOOT 213 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/3/11. (Hellings, J)
|
November 1, 2011 |
Filing
211
ORDER Following Order to Show Cause Hearing, Imposing Sanctions, and Dismissing Action, with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/31/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
|
October 27, 2011 |
Filing
210
ORDER VACATING NOVEMBER 1, 2011 Trial Date and ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM 177 , 178 , 179 , 180 , 181 , 182 , 183 , 184 , 185 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/27/2011. (Courtesy copy mailed and faxed to CDCR Transportation, Out-to-Court and Litigation at Pleasant Valley State Prison, R. J. Donovan Correctional Facility and Wasco State Prison)(Martin-Gill, S)
|
October 19, 2011 |
Filing
207
NOTICE and ORDER that Witness Jose Umanzor, CDC #J-80196, is no Longer Needed in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/19/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
October 5, 2011 |
Filing
197
ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Witnesss Jose Umanzor, CDC J-80196, for trial on October 19, 2011 at 8:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/5/2011. (Marrujo, C)
|
September 28, 2011 |
Filing
195
ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT JASON REEDER, CDC #H-73687, WITNESS for Order to Show Cause Hearing on October 19, 2011 at 8:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 09/28/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
September 27, 2011 |
Filing
191
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE;ORDERED that Transportation Writs shall be issued for Plaintiff and Inmates: Jason Reeder, CDC:H-73687; Andres Serrano, CDC:J-27946 and Manual Vaifanua, CDC: J-22618, to be transported for the hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge D ennis L. Beck on 09/27/2011. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/19/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Brief on Order to Show Cause due (10-Day Deadline) (Copy of this order faxed to: Pleasant Valley State Prison - Litigation Coordinator at 559-935-4904.(Martin-Gill, S)
|
September 7, 2011 |
Filing
185
ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Witness Eric Villiers, CDC #D-96687, for Trial on November 1, 2011 at 8:00a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/6/11. (Gonzalez, R)
|
September 1, 2011 |
Filing
175
ORDER ADVANCING Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Copies 168 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/1/11. Telephonic Trial Confirmation set for 10/19/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Gonzalez, R)
|
August 9, 2011 |
Filing
162
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 139 Motion for Reconsideration and Granting in Part and Denying Part Plaintiff's Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses 148 , 158 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/8/2011. Fifteen Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
|
July 15, 2011 |
Filing
146
ORDER After Hearing, Response Due July 20, 2011, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/14/2011. (Responses due by 7/20/2011)(Fahrney, E)
|
July 13, 2011 |
Filing
144
ORDER Requiring Parties To Respond Within Five Days (ECF No. 139 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/12/2011. (Opposition Deadline: 7/20/2011)(Fahrney, E)
|
July 7, 2011 |
Filing
140
ORDER Continuing Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing to August 8, 2011, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/7/11. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 8/8/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Gonzalez, R)
|
June 24, 2011 |
Filing
135
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 122 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/24/11. (Gonzalez, R)
|
June 13, 2011 |
Filing
133
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 129 Motion for the Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/13/11. Fifteen Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
|
June 9, 2011 |
Filing
132
ORDER GRANTING 128 Motion for Extension; ORDER Notifying Plaintiff of Witness Fees and Costs due to Subpoena Unincarcerated Witnesses Who Refuse to Testify Voluntarily 129 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 06/08/2011. (Fourteen (14) day deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
|
May 9, 2011 |
Filing
126
ORDER Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel 125 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/9/11. (Gonzalez, R)
|
March 30, 2011 |
Filing
123
ORDER Adopting 120 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and PARTIALLY GRANTING Defendants' 102 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/29/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
February 15, 2011 |
Filing
120
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' 102 Motion for Summary Judgment be Partially Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/15/2011. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 3/21/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 7, 2010 |
Filing
105
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's First 104 Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; 30-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/7/2010. Opposition due by 11/9/2010.(Bradley, A)
|
May 7, 2010 |
Filing
94
ORDER denying 93 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/7/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
|
November 30, 2009 |
Filing
86
ORDER ADOPTING 85 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Defendant Watts From Action Without Prejudice signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/30/2009. (Jessen, A)
|
October 21, 2009 |
Filing
85
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/20/2009, Recommending the Dismissal of Defendant Watts for Failure to Provide Information Sufficient to Effect Service of Process. Matter referred to Judge O'Neill. (Objections to F&R due by 11/13/2009) (Figueroa, O)
|
July 16, 2009 |
Filing
81
ORDER ADOPTING 74 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and Dismissing Certain Defendants and Claims from Action signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/15/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
|
July 7, 2009 |
Filing
79
ORDER DENYING 62 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/6/09. (Sondheim, M)
|
April 17, 2009 |
Filing
77
ORDER GRANTING FIRST 76 Motion to Extend Time to File Objections to 74 Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/17/2009. ( Objections to F&R due by 5/20/2009) (Figueroa, O)
|
April 1, 2009 |
Filing
75
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS, And Dismissing Defendant Brummel From Action Without Prejudice 66 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/31/2009. (Scrivner, E)
|
February 3, 2009 |
Filing
66
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Defendant Brummel From Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/3/2009. Motion referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 3/9/2009. (Sondheim, M)
|
January 21, 2009 |
Filing
61
ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Within Thirty Days Why Defendant Watts Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Provide Information Sufficient to Effect Service re 57 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/21/2009. Show Cause Response due by 2/25/2009. (Jessen, A)
|
July 20, 2007 |
Filing
10
FIRST INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Judge Dennis L. Beck on 07/20/2007. (Esteves, C)
|
July 19, 2007 |
Filing
7
ORDER DENYING 3 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL signed by Judge Dennis L. Beck on 07/19/2007. (Esteves, C)
|