Kassem v. Chertoff et al
Plaintiff: Nageeb Kassem and Nora Kassem
Defendant: Michael Chertoff, Julie Myers, Nancy Alcantar, Ronald LeFevre, Michael B. Mukasey, David Neal and Polly Webber
Case Number: 1:2008cv00010
Filed: December 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING Action without Prejudice signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/11/2011. CASE CLOSED.(Sant Agata, S)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue October 26, 2010 Scheduling Conference, Signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/14/2010. The Initial Scheduling Conference is continued to January, 19 2011 at 09:15 AM in Ctrm. 7 before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. (Arellano, S.)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION to Continue July 20, 2010 Telephonic Scheduling Conference and ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is continued from 7/20/2010 to set for 10/26/2010 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/16/2010. (Herman, H)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION to Continue May 10, 2010 Scheduling Conference and ORDER: Initial TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference is continued from 5/10/2010 to Tuesday, July 20, 2010 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/4/2010. (Herman, H)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting Individual and Official Capacity Defendants' 65 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Through Ninth Claims for Relief for Failure to State a Claim without Leave to Amend signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/29/2010. (Flores, E)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER on Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply 80 , 81 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/1/09. (Hellings, J)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER On Plaintiffs' Objections To Court's July 29, 2009 Order Vacating Oral Argument (Document # 77 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/31/2009. (Filing Deadline: 8/17/2009) (Scrivner, E)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER vacating hearing date of August 3, 2009 and taking matter under submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/29/09. (Nazaroff, H)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Modifying Court's March 26, 2009 58 Order Granting Defendant's 43 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim with Leave to Amend signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/21/2009. ( Amended Complaint due by 5/1/2009) (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kassem v. Chertoff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nageeb Kassem
Represented By: Bruce Duane Leichty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Kassem
Represented By: Bruce Duane Leichty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chertoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Alcantar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald LeFevre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Mukasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polly Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?