Demerson v. Woodford et al
Plaintiff: Edward Demerson
Defendant: Jeanne S. Woodford, L. Polk, J. Ahlin, D. A. Cuevas, L. Cartogena, N. Grannis, Darrell G. Adams, Kent Clark, V. Black, C. Munoz, B. Phillips, E. Campos, M. H. Clausing, Bardonnex, Amaro, Gregory, Hillard, E. McCant and Alva
Case Number: 1:2008cv00144
Filed: January 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER CONSTRUING Filings as Motion to Reopen Time to Appeal and GRANTING Motion 186 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/20/2014. cc: Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (Marrujo, C)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Gregory, With Prejudice 183 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/7/14. (Hellings, J)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Vacating Hearing And Trial Dates, DISMISSING Action With Prejudice For Failure To Comply With The Scheduling Order, And Directing Clerk Of Court To Enter Judgment (Docs. 173 , 174 , and 176 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/25/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Action should not be Dismissed, with Prejudice, for Failure to File Pretrial Statement; Seven-Day Deadline signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/12/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER GRANTING Defendants Munoz, Cartagena, and Hilliard's 147 Motion for Summary Judgment on Eighth Amendment Medical Care Claim and REFERRING Matter back to Magistrate Judge signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/17/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff To SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed For Failure To Prosecute (Doc. 165 ), Ten-Day Deadline, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/23/2013. Show Cause Response due by 5/3/2013. (Fahrney, E)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Granting Third Extension Of Time To File Opposition (Doc. 164 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/4/2013. (Opposition due by 4/8/2013)(Fahrney, E)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Denying 149 Plaintiff's Motion for a Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/6/12. (Verduzco, M)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Striking Status Report (Doc. 151 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/3/2012. (Fahrney, E)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DENYING 150 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/30/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER STRIKING Untimely Reply And Status Report (Docs. 144 and 145 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/27/2012. (Fahrney, E)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DENYING 135 Motion for Reconsideration of Screening Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/18/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 132 Request for leave to depose Plaintiff via Video-conference signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/10/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER DENYING Motion for Default Judgment, Without Prejudice, and DENYING Motion for Ruling as Moot 119 , 129 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/13/12. (Hellings, J)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER ADOPTING 116 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DENYING Defendants' 100 Motion to Dismiss, and Requiring Defendants to File an Answer Within Thirty Days, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/29/2011. (Marrujo, C)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/2/2011 discharging 91 Order to Show Cause; granting 101 , 107 Motions for entry of default against Defendant Gregory and directing Clerk to serve courtesy copy of order on SATF Litigation Office and CDCR Legal Affairs. (Lundstrom, T)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Denying Motion (Docs. 92 and 93 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/15/2011. (Fahrney, E)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Requiring Defendants Gregory and Hillard to SHOW CAUSE Within Thirty Days Why Default Should Not Be Entered Against Them re 85 & 86 ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Serve Courtesy Copy on Litigation Office at CSATF and on CDCR Legal Affairs, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/7/2011. Show Cause Response due by 7/11/2011. (Marrujo, C)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER, and Motion to Dismiss and Motion For Summary Judgment Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/15/2010. (Marrujo, C)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING 72 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER DENYING Motions to Compel 69 , 70 & 71 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/19/2010. (Marrujo, C)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER STRIKING 58 STATUS REPORT FILED BY PLAINTIFF, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/23/2010. (Martin, S)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDERED THAT this action proceed on Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, filed June 24, 2009, against Defendants Phillips, Campos, Amaro, Clausing,Bardonnex, Sgt. Munoz, and Lt. Cartagina for using excessive physicalforce against Plaintiff and agains t Sgt. Munoz, Lt. Cartagina, NurseGregory, and Psyche Tech G. Hillard for deliberate indifference toPlaintiffs serious medical needs; ORDERED THAT Defendants Director Jeanne S. Woodford; Inmate Appeals Branch Chief N. Grannis; Warden Darrell G. Adams ; Associate Wardens Ken Clark, L. Polk, and J. Ahlin; Captain D. A. Cueval; and Lieutenants V. Black, and Alva be DISMISSED from this action based on Plaintiffs failure to state any claims upon which relief may be granted against them; ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's multiple notices document no.(s) 41, 44-48 and 50-57 are STRICKEN, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/21/2010. (Martin, S)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER STRIKING 40 Notice filed by Edward Demerson; Requiring Plaintiff to File Third Amended Complaint within Thirty Days or Second Amended Complaint will be Deemed the Operative Pleading, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/15/2009. (Amended Complaint due by 1/18/2010) (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demerson v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Demerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne S. Woodford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. A. Cuevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Cartogena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Campos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. H. Clausing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bardonnex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. McCant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?