November 16, 2016 |
Filing
190
ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/15/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing
188
ORDER DIRECTING Parties to File Dispositive Documents within Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/7/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
|
May 24, 2016 |
Filing
184
ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT; VACATING Dates and DIRECTING Parties to File Dispositive Documents within Thirty Days of Payment of Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/24/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
|
May 23, 2016 |
Filing
182
ORDER VACATING 180 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Directing the Production of Plaintiff for Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/23/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing
180
ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Valentine Underwood, CDCR #K-84486, on May 23, 2016 at 11:00a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/28/16. (Gonzalez, R)
|
April 1, 2016 |
Filing
174
ORDER Setting Telephonic Scheduling Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/1/16. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 4/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.)(Verduzco, M)
|
February 16, 2016 |
Filing
173
ORDER DENYING as Moot Plaintiff's 170 Motion to Proceed IFP on Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/16/16. (Marrujo, C)
|
November 24, 2015 |
Filing
166
SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/24/15. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 6/8/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; Jury Trial set for 8/30/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Marrujo, C)
|
November 16, 2015 |
Filing
165
ORDER Denying 163 Motion to File Second Notice of Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/2015. (Flores, E)
|
August 24, 2015 |
Filing
161
ORDER Denying 160 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/24/2015. (Flores, E)
|
July 10, 2015 |
Filing
155
ORDER RE Plaintiff's 154 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/09/2015. (Flores, E)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
153
ORDER re Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 122 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/26/15. (Verduzco, M)
|
October 19, 2012 |
Filing
143
ORDER DENYING as Moot Plaintiff's 142 Request to Submit Three Affidavits in Support of Amended Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/19/2012. (Marrujo, C)
|
August 27, 2012 |
Filing
137
AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/24/2012. (Flores, E)
|
June 11, 2012 |
Filing
132
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 129 Motion to Submit Three Affidavits in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER for Clerk to File Three Affidavits as Plaintiff's Exhibits in Support of his Opposition signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 06/08/2012. (Flores, E)
|
March 7, 2012 |
Filing
124
ORDER Granting in part Plaintiff's 108 Motion to Compel; ORDER for Defendants Northcutt, Truitt, and Trujillo to Respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatory No. 9 within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/06/2012. Discovery due by 4/24/2012. (Flores, E)
|
December 9, 2011 |
Filing
121
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 116 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER Dismissing Defendant Fambrough from this Action Pursuant to Rule 41, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/08/2011. (Flores, E)
|
November 9, 2011 |
Filing
117
ORDER for Defendants Northcutt, Martin, Caviness, Trujillo, Fambrough, and Truitt to Respond to Plaintiff's 116 Motion to Dismiss within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/08/2011. Response due by 12/12/2012.(Flores, E)
|
October 5, 2011 |
Filing
114
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/5/2011 granting 113 Motion for leave to depose Plaintiff by video conference. (Lundstrom, T)
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing
112
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/20/2011 denying as moot 110 Motion and ordering defendant, Northcutt to respond to interrogatories by 10/21/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
|
July 18, 2011 |
Filing
107
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 100 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Lantz from this Action Pursuant to Rule 41 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/15/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
June 23, 2011 |
Filing
104
ORDER DENYING 103 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/23/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
June 15, 2011 |
Filing
101
ORDER for Defendants Northcutt, Martin, Caviness, Trujillo, Truitt and Fambrough to Respond to Plaintiff's 100 Motion to Dismiss within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 06/14/2011. Responses due by 7/18/2011.(Flores, E)
|
May 23, 2011 |
Filing
96
ORDER DENYING Motion for Substitution of Attorney, WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Renewal of the Motion Within Thirty Days 82 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/23/11: Plaintiff's failure to file a motion for substitution in compliance with Rule 25(a)(1) pursuant to this order shall result in the dismissal of Defendant Seth Lantz from this action. (Hellings, J)
|
April 1, 2011 |
Filing
88
ORDER Regarding Findings and Recommendations 79 ; ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 54 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/31/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
February 10, 2011 |
Filing
86
ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 76 ; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunction 48 , 52 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/9/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
January 12, 2011 |
Filing
79
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' 54 Motion to Dismiss be Granted and this Action be Dismissed in its Entirety without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/11/2011. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 2/14/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
December 17, 2010 |
Filing
76
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/17/10: Recommending that Plaintiff's motions for preliminary injunction, filed on April 21, 2010, and July 6, 2010, be DENIED for lack of jurisdiction; Plaintiff's MOTIONS 48 , 52 & Complaint 1 REFERRED to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 1/21/2011. (Hellings, J)
|
December 15, 2010 |
Filing
74
ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Surreply 64 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/15/10: Plaintiff's Surreply, filed October 8, 2010, is STRICKEN from the Court's record. (Hellings, J)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing
66
ORDER DENYING 65 Application to Proceed IFP; ORDER VACATING IN PART Court's 59 Order of September 16, 2010; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Assistance by the United States Marshal for Service of Process; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Provide Information to Enable Service of Process Upon Defendants Caviness and Martin; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/21/2010. Response due by 11/29/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 7, 2010 |
Filing
57
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 53 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Out of Time; ORDER DEEMING Defendants' 54 Motion to Dismiss Timely Filed signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/3/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
April 5, 2010 |
Filing
46
ORDER DENYING 43 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/5/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 21, 2009 |
Filing
31
ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/21/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 25, 2009 |
Filing
28
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Reconsideration of the Denial of his Request for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint, with Prejudice; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 23 Motion Seeking Reconsideration by a District Judge signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/25/2009. (Figueroa, O)
|
August 21, 2009 |
Filing
24
ORDER denying 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/21/2009. (Lundstrom, T)
|