October 30, 2013 |
Filing
160
Notice and ORDER Revoking In Forma Pauperis Status re 159 USCA Order, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/29/13. (Gonzalez, R)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
153
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Nondispositive Pretrial Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for a First Enlargement of Time to Complete and File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 151 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/27/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
August 12, 2013 |
Filing
150
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, re 147 , 148 , 149 ; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS (1) Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief; (2) Denying Plaintiff' ;s Motion for Appropriate Sanctions to be Imposed Against Defendants and/or Defendants' Counsel; and (3) Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, re 128 , 143 . 147 , 148 , 149 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/12/13. Referred to Judge Ishii. THirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
|
January 14, 2013 |
Filing
144
ORDER Denying Objections by Plaintiff to the Magistrate Judge's Nondispositive Pretrial Order Denying Rule 56(d) Motion 142 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/12/13. Opposition Due Within Forty-Five Days. (Gonzalez, R)
|
November 30, 2012 |
Filing
141
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Summary Judgment 140 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/30/12. Opposition Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
|
November 27, 2012 |
Filing
139
ORDER Denying 138 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order and Order Granting 137 Plaintiff's Motion for New Deadline 137 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/26/12. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
|
October 29, 2012 |
Filing
135
ORDER GRANTING In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Adverse Orders of Magistrate Judges (Docs 125 , 126 & 131 ) ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 132 Motion to Stay Summary Judgment, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/26/2012. (Marrujo, C)
|
September 26, 2012 |
Filing
130
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Modification Of The Scheduling Order (ECF No. 127 ), ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion For A Protective Order, Staying Discovery, And Requiring Plaintiff To File An Opposition Or A Rule 56(d) Motion Within Thirty Days (ECF No. 129 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/25/2012. (Fahrney, E)
|
August 3, 2012 |
Filing
123
ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 109 and Denying Defendants' Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's in Forma Pauperis Status 96 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/3/12. (Verduzco, M)
|
July 16, 2012 |
Filing
117
ORDER Striking Defendant's Motion for Protective Order and Exhibit A 101 , 102 ; ORDER Granting 103 Defendants' Amended Motion for a Protective Order and Lifting Stay of Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/13/12. (Verduzco, M)
|
June 15, 2012 |
Filing
111
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request and TERMINATING Attorneys Riches and Hendrickson from Service List signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/15/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
|
June 13, 2012 |
Filing
109
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denying 96 Defendants' Motion to Revoke Planitiff's in Forma Pauperis Status, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/13/12. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections due within thirty days. (Verduzco, M)
|
May 25, 2012 |
Filing
104
ORDER GRANTING 103 Motion to Stay Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/25/2012. (14 Day Deadline to file Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition) (Martin-Gill, S)
|
March 6, 2012 |
Filing
94
ORDER Striking Duplicate Scheduling Order 93 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/6/12. (Gonzalez, R)
|
December 21, 2011 |
Filing
86
ORDER Directing Defendants Koenig, Pate, Otto, Backlumd, Roberson, Clay, Gibb, Hannah, Semsen, Lyons, and Esquer to File Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/20/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
November 23, 2011 |
Filing
83
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 79 Motion for Permission to Appeal Dismissal of Supplemental Complaint In Forma Pauperis; ORDER DENYING 81 Motion to Appoint Counsel; ORDER DISREGARDING Plaintiff's Affidavit and Certified Trust Account Statement signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/22/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
November 8, 2011 |
Filing
77
ORDER DISMISSING 71 Plainitiff's Supplemental Complaint, without leave to amend; ORDERED to proceed on the claims found to be cognizable in the Third Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/08/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
October 4, 2011 |
Filing
72
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 69 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/3/2011. (Marrujo, C)
|
August 26, 2011 |
Filing
66
ORDER Striking Duplicate Motion 65 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/26/11. (Gonzalez, R)
|
August 24, 2011 |
Filing
63
ORDER Denying 62 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/24/11. Plaintiff is required to comply with August 8, 2011 60 Order Within Thirty-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
|
August 8, 2011 |
Filing
60
ORDER Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants re 37 ; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 42 and Motion for Magistrate Judge to Promptly Acknowledge and Comprehensively Remedy Ongoing and Threatened Personal Injury [5 0]; ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint 58 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/8/11. Frank X. Chavez, Nola Grannis, California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation and Matthew Cate terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
|
July 27, 2011 |
Filing
59
ORDER GRANTING 56 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Knapp signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/26/2011. Attorney Maurice M. Javier terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
|
May 6, 2011 |
Filing
52
ORDER Granting 47 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Knapp, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/5/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
April 18, 2011 |
Filing
51
ORDER Appointing Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/16/2011. Attorney Maurice M. Javier for Eric Charles Rodney Knapp added. (Gonzalez, R)
|
February 14, 2011 |
Filing
46
ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/11/11: Amy K. Guerra is APPOINTED as limited purpose counsel; Motion for TRO due forty-five (45) days from the date of service of this order; Amended Complaint due sixty (60) days from the da te of service of this order; Ms. Guerra's appointment will terminate when the Defendants file an answer to Plaintiff's complaint; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this order upon Amy K. Guerra at the Law Office of Amy K. Guerra, 2014 Tulare Street, Suite 310, Fresno, CA 93721. (Hellings, J)
|
October 26, 2010 |
Filing
40
ORDER DENYING 38 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/25/2010. (Marrujo, C)
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing
34
ORDER DENYING 28 Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/15/2010. (Bradley, A)
|
May 1, 2009 |
Filing
18
ORDER Denying 6 7 Motions for Injunctive Relief and a Temporary Restraining order signed by Magistrate Judge William M. Wunderlich on 5/1/2009. (Esteves, C)
|