C.B. v. Sonora School District, et al.
Plaintiff: C. B.
Defendant: Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair, City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh and Hal Prock
Case Number: 1:2009cv00285
Filed: February 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Sandra M Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER of USCA as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora (Request for Attorney's fees is GRANTED-No further action on C.B's Attorney's fees request)(Martin-Gill, S)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER CLOSING CASE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/08/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER of USCA as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora: The court granted plaintiff-appellee C.B.'s motion for attorneys fees (Dkt. 67-1) and supplemental motion for attorney's fees (Dkt. 76-1), and referred to the Appellate Commissioner the determination of the appropriate amount of fees. (Flores, E)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER of USCA as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora: Plaintiff-Appellee's motion for attorney's fees (Dkt. 67-1) and supplemental motion for attorney's fees (Dkt. 76-1) are GRANTED. (Flores, E)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER Regarding Disbursement of Funds signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/14/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER for Disbursement, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/3/15. (Verduzco, M)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 REPLY by C. B. re #255 Notice - Other. (Martin, John)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/1/2015; Plaintiff's reply to Defendants' #255 Notice of Partial Joinder shall be filed on or before 4/8/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE of PARTIAL JOINDER by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock re #254 Proposed Order. (Callahan, Cornelius)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 PROPOSED ORDER re Disbursement by C. B.. (Martin, John)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 AFFIDAVIT of Interest by C. B.. (Martin, John)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 AFFIDAVIT of Interest by C. B.. (Martin, John)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER of USCA as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora. Defendants' motion for leave to file a late opposition to plaintiffs motion for attorneys fees is GRANTED. (Marrujo, C)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER of USCA as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora: Appellants' motion for stay of mandate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 41(d)(2) is GRANTED. (Flores, E)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 249 OPINION of USCA as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora; AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART. (Flores, E)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER of USCA as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora: En banc oral argument will take place on Monday, March 17, 2014, at noon in San Francisco, California. (Flores, E)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER of USCA as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora: It is ordered that this case be reheard en banc pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 35(a) and Circuit Rule 35-3. (Flores, E)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER of USCA as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora. Appellants' unopposed motion for leave to file an oversized response to the petition for rehearing en banc is GRANTED. (Verduzco, M)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Pursuant to the pending Petition for Rehearing En Banc currently before the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/6/2013 before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder, is VACATED. The Initial Scheduling Conference will be reset upon resolution of the matter before the Ninth Circuit. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/3/2013. (Rooney, M)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER of USCA as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora. Appellants are directed to file a response to Appellee's petition for rehearing en banc filed on September 25, 2013. (Jessen, A)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Pursuant to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals' Opinion dated 9/12/2013, vacating, reversing, and remanding the matter to the District Court, an Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 11/6/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/20/2013. (Rooney, M)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 OPINION of USCA as to #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora. VACATED, REVERSED in part, and REMANDED. (Verduzco, M)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER DENYING Matthew Banks', guardian ad litem for plaintiff, petition for an order permitting him to withdraw $4,000.00 from plaintiff's blocked account, document #236 , for the purchase of a truck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 3/8/2013. (Rooney, M)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 DECLARATION of Matthew Banks re #238 Order. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL by C. B.. Attorney Heintel, Georgelle Christina added. (Heintel, Georgelle)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER Directing Supplemental Declaration (Doc. #236 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/13/2013. (Fahrney, E)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 LODGED: Proposed Order For Withdrawl Of Funds From Blocked Account, submitted by Matthew D. and Conner J. Banks. (Fahrney, E)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MOTION/Petition For Withdrawl Of Funds From Blocked Account, by Matthew D. and Conner J. Banks. (Fahrney, E)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 235 CERTIFICATE of RECORD transmitted to Ninth Circuit re #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora (Fahrney, E)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 234 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9-1-11, Jury Trial - Day 7 before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 12/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2012. (Hooven, K)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 233 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8-31-11, Jury Trial - Day 6 before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 12/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2012. (Hooven, K)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8-30-11, Jury Trial - Day 5 before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 12/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2012. (Hooven, K)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 231 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8-26-11, Jury Trial - Day 4 before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 12/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2012. (Hooven, K)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 230 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8-25-11, Jury Trial - Day 3 before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 12/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2012. (Hooven, K)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8-24-11, Jury Trial - Day 2 before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 12/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2012. (Hooven, K)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8-23-11, Jury Trial - Day 1 before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 12/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2012. (Hooven, K)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request for Court Approval of Bond and to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/18/2011. (Flores, E)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100016987 $542,385.36 fbo City of Sonora In lieu of Supersedeas Bond by CSJV Risk Management Authority on 11/21/2011. (Marrujo, C)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 226 PROPOSED ORDER re Granting Defendants' Request for Court Approval of Bond and to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal re #225 Notice - Other, by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Bean, Jeff)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE of Deposit of Funds in Lieu of Bond; Request for Court Approval of Bond and Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgment Pending Appeal by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. Attorney Bean, Jeff L. added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Agreement for Distribution of Funds Deposited in Lieu of Bond)(Bean, Jeff)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by C. B. re #195 Judgment. Defendant Mace McIntosh (Hopkins, Christine)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 223 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by C. B. re #195 Judgment. Defendant Hal Prock (Hopkins, Christine)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by C. B. re #195 Judgment. Defendant City of Sonora (Hopkins, Christine)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock (Wu, Stephanie)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 220 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by C. B. re #195 Judgment. Re: Defendant City of Sonora (Hopkins, Christine)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by C. B. re #195 Judgment. Re: Defendant Mace McIntosh (Hopkins, Christine)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by C. B. re #195 Judgment. Re: Defendant Harold Prock (Hopkins, Christine)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER DENYING defendants' Motion to Stay the Judgment, document #210 . The Court further DENIES defendants' request for a temporary stay and plaintiff's request for an enhanced superseadas bond; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/27/2011. (Rooney, M)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 COSTS TAXED in amount of $ 5633.29 against Defendants (Kusamura, W)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 215 REPLY by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock re #213 Opposition to Motion,. Attorney Wu, Stephanie Yee Jean added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Reply)(Wu, Stephanie)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 PROPOSED ORDER re Denial of Defendants' Motion for Stay re #210 MOTION to STAY re #202 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for to Hear Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgments Pending Appeal MOTION to STAY re #202 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for to Hear Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgments Pending Appeal, #213 Opposition to Motion, by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 OPPOSITION by C. B. to #210 MOTION to STAY re #202 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for to Hear Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgments Pending Appeal MOTION to STAY re #202 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for to Hear Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgments Pending Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration by Christine Hopkins and Exhibits 1 to 4 in Opposition to Motion to Stay)(Hopkins, Christine)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100016629 $455.00 fbo City of Sonora Mcintosh, Prock by Borton Petrini LLP on 10/17/2011.(text entry) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 USCA CASE NUMBER 11-17454 for #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora. (Lundstrom, T)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER on #202 Application to Shorten Time to Hear Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgment Pending Appeal, Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/13/2011. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay is due on or before 10/19/2011. Defendants' reply is due on or before 10/21/2011. A hearing will not be scheduled. As of October 21, 2011, the Court will take the matter under submission, and will thereafter issue its decision. All proceedings to enforce the Judgment are stayed until the Court issues a final order on the Motion for Stay. (Arellano, S.)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION for STAY of Proceedings to Enforce Judgments Pending Appeal and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Clerk's Note: Document extracted from docket entry [202-1] filed 10/12/2011). (Arellano, S.)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #201 Notice of Appeal served on USCA. (Lundstrom, T)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #201 Notice of Appeal filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora. Filed dates for Notice of Appeal *10/12/2011*, Complaint *2/12/2009* and Appealed Order / Judgment *9/30/2011*. Court Reporter: *Karen Hooven*. *Fee Status: Not Paid - Billed* *City of Sonora, Mcintosh and Prock* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information, #2 Bill for Appeal Fee) (Lundstrom, T)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 PROPOSED ORDER re Denial of Defendants Motion to Shorten Time and Setting Motion for Hearing re #206 Opposition to Motion by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 OPPOSITION by C. B. to #202 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for to Hear Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgments Pending Appeal. (Hopkins, Christine)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. New Case Number: 1:09-cv-0285-AWI-SMS. (Robles, S)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 PROPOSED ORDER re Application to Shorten Time to HEar Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgments Pending Appeal re #202 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for to Hear Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgments Pending Appeal by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Callahan, Cornelius)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 PROPOSED ORDER re Defendant's Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgments Pending Appeal by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Callahan, Cornelius)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for to Hear Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgments Pending Appeal by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Callahan, Cornelius)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE of APPEAL by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Representation)(Callahan, Cornelius)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by C. B. re #195 Judgment. Re: Defendant City of Sonora (Hopkins, Christine)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by C. B. re #195 Judgment. Re: Defendant Mace McIntosh (Hopkins, Christine)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT by C. B. re #195 Judgment. Re: Defendant Harold Prock (Hopkins, Christine)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, see #196 , signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 09/30/11. (Coffman, Lisa)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Re #176 Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 09/30/11. (Coffman, Lisa)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 JUDGMENT dated *09/01/11* in favor of Plaintiff against Defendants pursuant to order, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 09/30/11. (Coffman, Lisa)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' RULE 50 and RULE 59 Motions, see #193 , signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 09/30/11. (Coffman, Lisa)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM DECISION Re 675 676 677 Motions for Entry of Judgment, Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, and Requiring Retrial on Certain Issues, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 09/30/11. (Coffman, Lisa)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 SUPPLEMENT by C. B. re #176 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration and Exhibit F)(Hopkins, Christine)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 OPPOSITION by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock to #176 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Callahan, Cornelius)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 PROPOSED ORDER re Judgment by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 PROPOSED ORDER re Granting Attorneys Fees and Costs. (Hopkins, Christine)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 OPPOSITION by C. B. to #178 MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION. (Hopkins, Christine)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 PROPOSED ORDER re Denial of Defendants' Rule 50 and Rule 59 Motions re #177 MOTION for JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (Fed. R. Civ. P. 50), #178 MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION. (Hopkins, Christine)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 OPPOSITION by C. B. to #177 MOTION for JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (Fed. R. Civ. P. 50). (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Opposition to Rule 50 and Rule 59 Motions, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 3 In Opposition to Rule 50 and Rule 59 Motions, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 4 to 9 In Opposition to Rule 50 and Rule 59 Motions, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 10 to 13 In Opposition to Rule 50 and Rule 59 Motions)(Hopkins, Christine)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 EXHIBIT L-1 and L-2 re #177 MOTION for JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (Fed. R. Civ. P. 50) filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora, #178 MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L-2)(Callahan, Cornelius)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 EXHIBIT M re #177 MOTION for JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (Fed. R. Civ. P. 50) filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora, #178 MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora. (Callahan, Cornelius)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 EXHIBIT L re #177 MOTION for JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (Fed. R. Civ. P. 50) filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora, #178 MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora. (Callahan, Cornelius)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 EXHIBIT G re #177 MOTION for JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (Fed. R. Civ. P. 50) filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora, #178 MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J)(Callahan, Cornelius)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 EXHIBIT A re #177 MOTION for JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (Fed. R. Civ. P. 50) filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora, #178 MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F)(Callahan, Cornelius)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 DECLARATION of Cornelius J. Callahan in SUPPORT OF #177 MOTION for JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (Fed. R. Civ. P. 50), #178 MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION. (Callahan, Cornelius)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MOTION for NEW TRIAL of DEFENDANTS CITY OF SONORA, MACE MCINTOSH, and HAL PROCK FOR NEW TRIAL AND ALTERNATIVELY, REMITTITUR UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 59(a) AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Callahan, Cornelius)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MOTION for JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (Fed. R. Civ. P. 50) by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Callahan, Cornelius)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES by C. B.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Hopkins Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibits B to E to Hopkins Declaration)(Hopkins, Christine)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 BILL of COSTS SUBMITTED by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 JURY INSTRUCTIONS - GIVEN at Jury Trial(Kusamura, W)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Joy C. Rosenquist. (Rosenquist, Joy)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STATUS REPORT by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 JURY NOTES. (Flores, E)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 VERDICTS of TRIAL JURY. (Sant Agata, S)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 RECEIPT of EXHIBITS After Trial by C. B..(Sant Agata, S)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger: JURY TRIAL Day 7 completed on 9/1/2011.Outside the presents of the jury the parties and the Court continues to correct the verdict form. Jury is brought in the courtroom and is instructed on the corrections. Jury continues deliberations. Verdict is reached and read by the Court. Verdict is in favor od the plaintiff and against the defendants. Due to the verdict a Punitive Damages trial will begin. Closing Arguments were heard on punitive damages and jury was instructed. Jury deliberates. Verdict is reached on Punitive Damages and verdict was read by the Court. Offset filing due by 9/9/2011 by 4:00p.m. Plaintiffs Counsel C Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel C Callahan & J Rosenquist present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Kanre Hooven. (Kusamura, W)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger: JURY TRIAL Day 6 held on 8/31/2011. Jury in deliberations, Jury had a question, jury brought back into court and question was answered. Jury reaches a verdict. Verdict is read and court calls a sidebar. The Court advises jury that there is an Inconsistency in the verdict. Jury is instructed of the issues and is sent back to complete verdict. Out of the prescence of the jury counsel discover an error in the verdict form instructions. The Court releases jury for the evening and the Jury will return to complete deliberatons 9/1/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Plaintiffs Counsel C Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel C Callahan & J Rosenquist present. Court Reporter: Karen Hooven. (Kusamura, W)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger: JURY TRIAL Day 5 held on 8/30/2011. Plaintiff calls Ron Martinelli (sworn). Plaintiff and Defendants rest. Jury Instruction conference was held outside the presence of the jury. Objections were put on the record. Jury returned and was instructed on the law. Closing arguments were heard. Jury deliberates. Jury Trial to resume for deliberations 8/31/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Plaintiffs Counsel C Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel C Callahan & J Rosenquist present. Court Reporter: Karen Hooven. (Kusamura, W) Modified on 9/30/2011 (Kusamura, W).
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger: JURY TRIAL Day 4 held on 8/26/2011. Defendants called out of order Don Cameron and Dr. Jennifer Murton to testify(both were sworn). Plaintiff called Dr Herbert Schreier to testify (sworn). Jury Trial Day 5 will resume 8/30/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Plaintiffs Counsel C Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel C Callahan & J Rosenquist present. Court Reporter: Karen Hooven. (Kusamura, W)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger: INFORMAL JURY INSTRUCTION CONFERENCE held in chambers and off the record on 8/25/2011. Plaintiffs Counsel C Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel C Callahan & J Rosenquist present. (Kusamura, W)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger: JURY TRIAL Day 3 held on 8/25/2011. Plaintiff called Karen Sinclair and Mark Banks to testify (Both were sworn). Jury Trial Day 4 will resume 8/26/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Plaintiffs Counsel C Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel C Callahan & J Rosenquist present. Court Reporter: Karen Hooven. (Kusamura, W)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Oliver W. Wanger: JURY TRIAL Day 2 held on 8/24/2011. Harold Prock resumes the stand. Plaintiff calls Mace McIntosh, Conner Banks, Matt Banks & Amy Banks to testify (all were sworn). Jury Trial Day 3 will resume 8/25/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Plaintiffs Counsel C Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel Cornelius Callahan & Joy Rosenquist present. Court Reporter: Karen Hooven. (Kusamura, W)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Cornelius John Callahan re #159 Notice - Other. Your filing is entitled Notice of Substitution of Counsel, however, the actual document attached is a Substitution of Attorney - Proposed. Please re-file your document using the correct event. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Flores, E)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Oliver W. Wanger: JURY TRIAL Day 1 held on 8/23/2011. Jury is selected, Opening Statements were heard, Plaintiff called first witness Harold Lee Prock II (sworn). Jury Trial Day 2 will resume 8/24/2011 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Plaintiffs Counsel C Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel C Callahan & J Rosenquist present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven. (Kusamura, W)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 PROPOSED VERDICT submitted by Defendants City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock.(Callahan, Cornelius)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Hal Prock. (Callahan, Cornelius)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 PROPOSED VERDICT submitted by Plaintiff C. B..(Hopkins, Christine)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 EXHIBIT LIST , Amended by C. B..(Hopkins, Christine)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER DENYING #151 Motion to Continue Trial, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/18/2011. (Kusamura, W)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the recent change in the Jury Trial calendar, the Jury Trial currently set for start 8/26/2011 is ADVANCING to start 8/23/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Kusamura, W)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 JOINDER by Hal Prock in re #151 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for to Hear Motion to Continue Trial Date filed by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, City of Sonora. (Rosenquist, Joy)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 OPPOSITION by C. B. to #151 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for to Hear Motion to Continue Trial Date. (Hopkins, Christine)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion to Shorten Time re #151 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for to Hear Motion to Continue Trial Date by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Callahan, Cornelius)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for to Hear Motion to Continue Trial Date by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Callahan, Cornelius)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the pressing Court trial calendar the Jury Trial currently set for 8/23/2011 has been continued to 8/26/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Kusamura, W)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) As the Jury Trial in this case has been continued until 8/23/2011, trial exhibits shall be delivered to the Courtroom by 12:00PM on 8/19/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) Due to Counsel's availability and at their request and agreement, Jury Trial previously set for 7/12/2011 has been CONTINUED to 8/23/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) To accommodate this Court's current trial schedule and allow sufficient time for hearing, Jury Trial previously set for 7/6/2011 has been CONTINUED to 7/12/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 REPLY by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock re #128 Trial Brief. (Callahan, Cornelius)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER On #118 Motions In Limine Brought by Defendants City of Sonora, Chief of Police Mac McIntosh and Office Hal Prock, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/27/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 PROPOSED ORDER re Motions in Limine brought by Defendants by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Callahan, Cornelius)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Association of Co-Counsel for Hall Prock by Hal Prock. Attorney Rosenquist, Joy C. added. (Rosenquist, Joy)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 [DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR] NOTICE of Association of Co-Counsel for Hal Prock by Hal Prock. Attorney Goyette, Gary Guy added. (Goyette, Gary) Modified on 6/17/2011 (Benson, A.).
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #117 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/14/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 PROPOSED ORDER re #117 MOTION IN LIMINE To Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Prior Conduct by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/12/2011, before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. MOTIONS IN LIMINE HEARING filed by ECRO Otilia Figueroa, Phone number 559-499-5928 E-mail ofigueroa@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 6/27/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2011. (Figueroa, O)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Oliver W. Wanger: MOTION HEARING held on 5/12/2011. The Court ruled on Motions in Limine as noted on the record. Each party to prepare a proposed order consistent with the Courta ruling on their own motions. Plaintiffs Counsel Christine Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel Cornelius Callahan present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Figueroa, O)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 PROPOSED VERDICT submitted by Defendants City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock.(Callahan, Cornelius)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 PROPOSED VERDICT submitted by Plaintiff C. B..(Hopkins, Christine)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by C. B..(Hopkins, Christine)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by C. B..(Hopkins, Christine)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 WITNESS LIST by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock.(Callahan, Cornelius)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 EXHIBIT LIST (Joint Schedule and Summary) by C. B..(Hopkins, Christine)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 WITNESS LIST by C. B..(Hopkins, Christine)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) Due to the availability of the Court and to allow sufficient time for hearing, Motions In Limine Hearing previously set for 4/29/2011 has been CONTINUED to 5/12/2011 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 TRIAL BRIEF by Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, Sonora School District. Attorney Callahan, Cornelius John added. (Callahan, Cornelius)
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 TRIAL BRIEF by C. B..(Hopkins, Christine)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STATEMENT of Case by Plaintiff C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock.(Callahan, Cornelius)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE by C. B..(Hopkins, Christine)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Jury Trial currently set for 5/3/2011 to 7/6/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/20/2011. (Kusamura, W)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 RESPONSE by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock to #117 MOTION IN LIMINE To Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Prior Conduct. (Callahan, Cornelius)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 OPPOSITION by C. B. to #118 MOTION IN LIMINE 1 through 7. (Hopkins, Christine)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 OPPOSITION by C. B. to #118 MOTION IN LIMINE 1 through 7. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibits in Opposition to MIL 5)(Hopkins, Christine)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Request to Continue Trial Date by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuation of Trial Date by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION IN LIMINE 1 through 7 by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2011 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Attachments: #1 Motion in Limine to Bifurcate Liability and Compensatory Damages from the Punitive Damages Portions of Trial, #2 Proposed Order re: Motions in Limine)(Callahan, Cornelius)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION IN LIMINE To Exclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Prior Conduct by C. B.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2011 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hopkins, Christine)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/31/2011. (Kusamura, W)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Oliver W. Wanger: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held in chambers and off the record on 3/30/2011 - Court order to follow. MOTIONS IN LIMINE HEARING set for 4/22/2011 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Motions filing deadline set for 4/11/2011; responses due by 4/18/2011. Plaintiff's Counsel Christine Hopkins telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Cornelius Callahan telephonically present. (Rooney, M)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the Court's trial schedule the Pretrial Conference currently set for 3/21/2011 has been moved to 3/30/2011 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (All current deadlines will remain the same.) (Kusamura, W)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Plaintiff C. B..(Hopkins, Christine)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Denying in Part and Granting in Part defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/25/2011. (Kusamura, W)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order re #110 Order, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM DECISION Regarding Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment #84 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/11/2011. (Defendants motion for summary judgment on Plaintiffs claim for punitive damages against the City is GRANTED; The remainder of Defendants motion is DENIED; and Plaintiff shall lodge a form of order consistent with this opinion within five (5) days of electronic service of this decision.) (Gaumnitz, R)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/7/2011, before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING filed by ECRO Otilia Figueroa, Phone number 559-499-5928 E-mail ofigueroa@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 3/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2011. (Figueroa, O)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Oliver W. Wanger: MOTION HEARING held on 2/7/2011. Motion was argued and submitted. Written decision to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel C. Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel C Callahan present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Otilia Figueroa. (Kusamura, W)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 RESPONSE by C. B. to #104 Reply. (Hopkins, Christine)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STATEMENT of Evidence by Defendants City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock re #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RESPONSE by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock to #93 Opposition to Motion. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REPLY by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock re #93 Opposition to Motion. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 DECLARATION of Cornelius J. Callahan in SUPPORT OF #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REPLY by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock re #93 Opposition to Motion. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPLY by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock re #93 Opposition to Motion, #94 Statement, #98 Declaration, #97 Declaration, #96 Request for Judicial Notice, #95 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Reply, #2 Reply, #3 Reply, #4 Reply, #5 Reply, #6 Reply, #7 Reply, #8 Reply, #9 Reply, #10 Reply)(Callahan, Cornelius)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DECLARATION of Christine Hopkins in OPPOSITION TO #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hopkins Declaration Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit Hopkins Declaration Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit Hopkins Declaration Exhibit 5)(Hopkins, Christine)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 DECLARATION of Christine Hopkins in OPPOSITION TO #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hopkins Declaration Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Hopkins Declaration Exhibit 2)(Hopkins, Christine)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 DECLARATION of Matt Banks in OPPOSITION TO #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Hopkins, Christine)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 DECLARATION of Amy Banks in OPPOSITION TO #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Hopkins, Christine)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by C. B. in re #93 Opposition to Motion, #84 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Hopkins, Christine)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 DECLARATION of Ron Martinelli in OPPOSITION TO #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Hopkins, Christine)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STATEMENT of Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts by Plaintiff C. B. re #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Statement Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts Issues 5 to 7, #2 Statement Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts Issues 8 to 9)(Hopkins, Christine)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPPOSITION by C. B. to #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Statement Plaintiff's Seperate Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Hopkins, Christine)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STATEMENT of Evidence by Defendants City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock re #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C, #2 Exhibit D through F)(Callahan, Cornelius)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues by Defendants City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock re #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock in SUPPORT of #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DECLARATION of Cornelius J. Callahan in SUPPORT OF #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 DECLARATION of Hal Prock in SUPPORT OF #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 DECLARATION of Mace McIntosh in SUPPORT OF #84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock in re #84 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Callahan, Cornelius)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTES (Text Only Entry) for proceedings held before Judge Sandra M. Snyder: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 12/8/10. CASE NOT SETTLED. Confirmed for PTC 3/21/11 @ 11:00 before Judge Wanger (OWW), and Jury Trial 5/3/11 @ 9:00am before Judge Wanger (OWW), as previously set #79 . Plaintiff's Counsel Christine Hopkins present. Defendants' Counsel Cornelius Callahan present. Court Reporter/CD Number: N/A - in chambers; off record. (Robles, F.)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Callahan, Cornelius)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. (Callahan, Cornelius)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/7/2010. Discovery Cut-Off: 11/30/10; Non-Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 12/15/10; Non-Dispositive Motion Hearing Date: 1/21/11 9:00 Ctrm 7; Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 1/7/11; Dispositive Motion Hearing Date: 2/7/11 10:00 Ctrm 3; Settlement Conference set for 12/8/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder; Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger; Jury Trial set for 5/3/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Esteves, C)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Oliver W. Wanger: IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held off the record on 5/7/2010. Written order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel C. Hopkins telephonically present. Defendants Counsel C. Swanson telephonically present. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) A indicated in #72 Order, Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2010 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock.(Callahan, Cornelius)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 04/16/2010. Sonora School District and Karen Sinclair ONLY terminated from action. (Flores, E)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal by Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair. (Schachter, Alesa)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING the Rule12(b)(6) Motion, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/11/2010. (Kusamura, W)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order re #70 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings, by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Memorandum Decision DENYING Defendants' City of Sonora, Chief of Police Mace McIntosh and Officer Hal Prock's #58 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and for more Definite Statement signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/8/2010. ( Filing Deadline: 3/15/2010)(Figueroa, O)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Oliver W. Wanger: MOTION HEARING held on 3/8/2010. Motion was argued and submitted. Court Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel C Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel C Callahan present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Lopez. (Kusamura, W)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE to all Counsel: Please disregard Document #67 Judgment as it was docketed in error. The MOTION to DISMISS Hearing set for 3/8/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger will be heard.(Figueroa, O)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 **DOCKETED IN ERROR**JUDGMENT dated *3/4/2010* pursuant to order. (Figueroa, O)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING #64 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS as Modified and GRANTING #48 Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise with Defendants Sonora School District and Karen Sinclair signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/3/2010. (Figueroa, O)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #64 by Defendants Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair. (Schachter, Alesa)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise with Sonora School District #48 RECOMMENDING: The terms of the settlement, including costs and attorney's fees, be APPROVED by the district judge assigned to the action. Within ten (10) court days after being served with a copy, any party may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. Replies to the objections shall be served and filed within ten (10) court days (plus three days if served by mail) after service of the objections. Matter referred to Judge Wanger; Objections to F&R due within ten court days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/24/2010. (Timken, A)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock re #62 Opposition to Motion, #58 MOTION to DISMISS. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPPOSITION by C. B. to #58 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hopkins, Christine)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/22/2010: IN COURT HEARING held re Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise with Sonora School District (48). Matthew Banks, sworn & Voir Dire; Amy Banks also questions. Court request counsel provide the following: Banks name, address and account number - So Ordered. Plaintiffs Counsel Christine Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel Jason M. Sherman - Telephonic present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Herman, H)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order re #59 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #58 MOTION to DISMISS. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock in SUPPORT of #58 MOTION to DISMISS. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to DISMISS by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Callahan, Cornelius)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Not Used - refer to documents # 64 and #66 - STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Good Faith Settlement by Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair. (Schachter, Alesa)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry): In light of the Order Disqualifying Magistrate Judge #55 , Plaintiff's Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise with Sonora School District #48 is RESET from 1/8/10 @ 9:00am before Judge Beck (DLB) to 1/22/10 @ 9:30am before Judge Snyder (SMS). Plaintiff's request to excuse minor's appearance #53 is GRANTED; however, plaintiff's counsel and Guardian ad Litem (GAL) must personally appear; defense counsel may appear telephonically by calling chambers at (559) 499-5690. Signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/4/10. (Robles, F.)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DISQUALIFYING MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/23/2009. The new case number is: 1:09-cv-00285-OWW-SMS.(Bradley, A)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock, Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair by C. B..(Hopkins, Christine)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REQUEST for Judge Beck to Excuse Minor's Appearance by C. B. re #48 Petition filed by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER After Scheduling Conference Motion to Dismiss filing ddl 1/11/2010: Opposition filing ddl 1/25/2010; Reply filing ddl 2/1/2010; Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/11/2009. (Kusamura, W)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Oliver W. Wanger: TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held in chambers and off the record on 12/11/2009. Written order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel C. Hopkins appeared telephonically. Defendants Counsel J. Sherman and C. Callahan appeared telephonically. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JOINT STATUS REPORT by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STATEMENT of No Opposition by Defendants Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair. (Schachter, Alesa)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PETITION for Minor's Compromise by C. B.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hopkins, Christine)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER After Scheduling Conference, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/2/09: Further Scheduling Conference SET for 12/11/09 at 8:15, Ctrm 2.(Hellings, J)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Oliver W. Wanger: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held in chambers on 10/2/2009. Due to settlement negotiations, Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 12/11/2009 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Plaintiffs Counsel Telephonic appearances made by C. Hopkins. Defendants Counsel Telephonic appearances made by J. Sherman, A. Schachter, and C. Callahan. (Gaumnitz, R)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER AMENDING Memorandum Decision and Order re #44 NUNC PRO TUNC signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/24/2009. (Figueroa, O)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Memorandum and Decision and ORDER GRANTING IN PART with Leave to Amend, GRANTING IN PART Without Leave to Amend and DENYING IN PART Defendants' #8 #15 Motions to Dismiss and GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' #12 Motion to Strike signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/21/2009. ( Amended Complaint due by 10/22/2009)(Figueroa, O)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/30/2009, before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. MOTION TO STRIKE and MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING filed by ECRO Maribel Verduzco, Phone number: 559-499-5928, E-mail: mverduzco@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 9/3/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2009. (Verduzco, M)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the Motion to Dismiss ruling pending by the court the Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/7/2009 has been moved to 10/2/2009 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Kusamura, W)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER for a Protective Order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/31/2009. (Flores, E)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective of Confidential Documents by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Oliver W. Wanger: MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTIONS TO DISMISS HEARING held on 7/30/2009 - matter argued and submitted - court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel C. Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel C. Callahan and J. Sherman present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Rooney, M)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER continuing the hearing re motions to dismiss currently set for 7/9/2009 to 7/30/2009 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/6/2009. (Timken, A)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re 35 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings, by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** Due to the press of business, and to allow the Court to properly prepare for oral argument, the matters currently set for Hearing 7/2/2009 have been continued to 7/9/2009 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Timken, A)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STATEMENT of Recent Decision by U.S. Supreme Court by Defendants Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair. (Schachter, Alesa)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADVISING parties of judicial notice; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/24/2009. (Rooney, M)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** Due to the press of business, all matters currently set to be heard 6/29/2009 have been continued to 7/2/2009 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Timken, A)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** Due to the press of business, all matters currently set to be heard 4/20/2009 have been continued to 6/29/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/3/2009 has been continued to 8/7/2009 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Timken, A)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock to RESPONSE. (Callahan, Cornelius)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY by Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair to RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to STRIKE Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint. (Schachter, Alesa)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 EXHIBIT Federal Unpublished Cases in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Schachter, Alesa)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY by Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair to RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to DISMISS and Motion for a More Definite Statement. (Schachter, Alesa)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER re #25 Opposition to Motion by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPPOSITION by C. B.. to Sonora School District's 12(f) Motion (Hopkins, Christine)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECLARATION of Christine Hopkins in OPPOSITION TO #8 MOTION to DISMISS and Motion for a More Definite Statement, #15 MOTION to DISMISS of Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages Pursuant to FED.R. CIV.P.12(B)(6) MOTION to DISMISS of Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages Pursuant to FED.R. CIV.P.12(B)(6), #12 MOTION to STRIKE Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint. (Hopkins, Christine)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER re #22 Opposition to Motion by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPPOSITION by C. B.. to Sonora School District's 12(b)(6) Motion (Hopkins, Christine)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER re #20 Opposition to Motion by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPPOSITION by C. B.. to City of Sonora's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion (Hopkins, Christine)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Oliver W. Wanger: TELEPHONIC HEARING re Initial Disclosures held on 3/11/2009. The Court informs the parties they can prepare a stipulation and proposed order to extend time on initial disclosures, however, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will not be suspended. Plaintiffs Counsel C. Hopkins present. Defendants Counsel A. Schachter, C. Callahan present. Court Reporter/CD Number: K. Lopez. (Timken, A)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by C. B.. (Hopkins, Christine)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER re #15 MOTION to DISMISS of Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages Pursuant to FED.R. CIV.P.12(B)(6) MOTION to DISMISS of Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages Pursuant to FED.R. CIV.P.12(B)(6), #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Callahan, Cornelius)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock in SUPPORT of #15 MOTION to DISMISS of Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages Pursuant to FED.R. CIV.P.12(B)(6) MOTION to DISMISS of Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages Pursuant to FED.R. CIV.P.12(B)(6). (Callahan, Cornelius)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to DISMISS of Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages Pursuant to FED.R. CIV.P.12(B)(6) by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Callahan, Cornelius)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER re #12 MOTION to STRIKE Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint. (Schachter, Alesa)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair in SUPPORT of #12 MOTION to STRIKE Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint. (Schachter, Alesa)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to STRIKE Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint by Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Schachter, Alesa)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER re #8 MOTION to DISMISS and Motion for a More Definite Statement. Granting Motion for a More Definite Statement (Schachter, Alesa)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER re #8 MOTION to DISMISS and Motion for a More Definite Statement. Granting Motion to Dismiss (Schachter, Alesa)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair in SUPPORT of #8 MOTION to DISMISS and Motion for a More Definite Statement. Points & Authorities in Support of Motion (Schachter, Alesa)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS and Motion for a More Definite Statement by Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Schachter, Alesa)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair. of Scheduling Conference Order, Consent Forms & VDRP Forms (Schachter, Alesa)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2009 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms, #2 VDRP Forms) (Hellings, J)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JOINDER by City of Sonora, Mace McIntosh, Hal Prock in. Attorney Callahan, Cornelius John added. (Callahan, Cornelius)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair. (Schachter, Alesa)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of REMOVAL of Action Under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1441(b) (Federal Question) from Tuolumne Superior, case number CV 5433. by Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair.(Schachter, Alesa)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sonora School District, Karen Sinclair (Schachter, Alesa)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100006031 $350.00 fbo Sonora School District by Robert H. Johnson on 2/13/2009. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.B. v. Sonora School District, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. B.
Represented By: Georgelle Christina Heintel
Represented By: John F. Martin
Represented By: Christine Ann Hopkins
Represented By: Heather Lyn Holbrooks-Kuratek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonora School District
Represented By: Cornelius J. Callahan
Represented By: Jason M. Sherman
Represented By: Alesa M. Schachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Sinclair
Represented By: Jason M. Sherman
Represented By: Alesa M. Schachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sonora
Represented By: Cornelius J. Callahan
Represented By: Jeff L. Bean
Represented By: Stephanie Yee Jean Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mace McIntosh
Represented By: Cornelius J. Callahan
Represented By: Jeff L. Bean
Represented By: Stephanie Yee Jean Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal Prock
Represented By: Cornelius J. Callahan
Represented By: Jeff L. Bean
Represented By: Stephanie Yee Jean Wu
Represented By: Joy C Rosenquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?