Steven Williams v. Sampson et al

Plaintiff: Steven Williams
Defendant: K. Sampson, W.J. Sullivan, D. Cronse, N. Grannis, D. Zanchi, M. Carrasco, L.L. Schulties, F. Gonzalez and Slanker
Case Number: 1:2009cv00551
Filed: March 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/15/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting Defendants' 34 Motion to Strike and Striking Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/31/2011. (Flores, E)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies 19 ; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denying Defendant's Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant and Requiring Security 18 signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 10/28/2010. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 12/1/2010. (Verduzco, M)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS And Dismissing Certain Claims And Defendants (Doc. 12 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/26/2010. (Scrivner, E)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this 1 Action Proceed against Defendant D. Zanchi for Retaliation and Defendants K. Sampson, W.J. Sullivan, D. Crounse. N. Grannis, M. Carrasco, L.L. Schulties, F. Gonzales, Slanker, Peterson, and 7 Un known Officers are Dismissed from this Action for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief may be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/14/2009. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 1/7/2010. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Williams v. Sampson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Cronse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Zanchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.L. Schulties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slanker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?