April 27, 2016 |
Filing
96
ACTION has been DISMISSED with Prejudice; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to CLOSE the CASE signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 15, 2015 |
Filing
90
ORDER Re Meet and Confer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on 10/15/2015. (Knudson, G)
|
August 6, 2015 |
Filing
89
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference Before Magistrate Judge Vadas on October 29, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. at the United States Federal Courthouse at 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on 8/6/2015. (Masterson, G)
|
July 31, 2015 |
Filing
88
STIPULATION and ORDER REFERRING Matter to a Settlement Conference and VACATING Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas for a Settlement Conference to take place in San Fr ancisco, California, on or before October 30, 2015. A representative with full and unlimited authority to negotiate and enter into a binding settlement on the defendants behalf shall attend in person. Those in attendance must be prepared to discus s the claims, defenses and damages. The failure of any counsel, party or authorized person subject to this order to appear in person may result in the imposition of sanctions. The parties are ordered to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas to confirm whether Plaintiffs appearance in person is required or appearance by telephone will be permitted. The parties are directed to provide confidential settlement conference statements to the Honorable Nandor J. Vadas, U.S. District Court-Northern District of California, 3140 Boeing Avenue, McKinleyville, CA 95519 or via email at NJVpo@cand.uscourts.gov, so that they arrive no later than ten calendar days prior to the settlement conference. The current case deadlines set forth in the Amended Discovery and Scheduling Order are vacated; and within ten days of the settlement conference, if the case does not settle, the parties shall file a joint proposal to reset the remainder of the case deadlines. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/30/2015. (Timken, A)
|
July 2, 2015 |
Filing
86
ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Administratively Redesignate Case as a Regular Civil Action signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/2/2015. (Jessen, A)
|
June 1, 2015 |
Filing
84
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Defendants Trisha and Adair Should Not Be Dismissed from this Action Pursuant to Rule 4(M), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/1/15. Thirty-Day Show Cause Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
|
May 29, 2015 |
Filing
82
ORDER Adopting 81 Findings and Recommendations and Denying 66 Motion for Judgment on Pleadings, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/29/15. (Gonzalez, R)
|
April 22, 2015 |
Filing
81
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 66 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/22/15: Thirty-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing
80
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING 69 Defendants' Motion to Modify 59 Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/11/2015. All pending dates in the Discovery and Scheduling Order are VACATED and all discovery is STAYED. (Jessen, A)
|
January 30, 2015 |
Filing
77
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment Of Counsel Without Prejudice(Document 74 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/30/2015. (Fahrney, E)
|
January 28, 2015 |
Filing
75
ORDER DISREGARDING 73 Order Requiring Clarification from Plaintiff's Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/28/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
January 27, 2015 |
Filing
73
ORDER Requiring Clarification from Plaintiff's Counsel re 72 Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 01/27/2015. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
|
January 16, 2015 |
Filing
71
ORDER Granting Defendants' 69 Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/16/15. (Verduzco, M)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing
68
ORDER Granting Parties' Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule re 67 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/5/14. (Gonzalez, R)
|
October 29, 2014 |
Filing
65
ORDER DENYING 60 Plaintiff's Motion for 56(D) Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/29/2014. (Jessen, A)
|
July 24, 2014 |
Filing
55
ORDER Vacating Judgment (Document 36 ), ORDER Requiring Defendants To File A Response To First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/24/2014. (Fahrney, E)
|
July 7, 2014 |
Filing
50
ORDER DENYING 49 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/7/2014. (Jessen, A)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
41
ORDER FINDING that Plaintiff is Entitled to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on 37 Appeal Filed July 15, 2011; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Serve Copy of Order on Ninth Circuit signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 7/26/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
May 23, 2011 |
Filing
28
ORDER DENYING 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 5/23/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
February 17, 2011 |
Filing
20
CORRECTION TO ORDER 19 DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants and Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate; ORDERED that the date of filing of the first amended complaint in the above mentioned order, shall be corrected to January 19, 2011, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 02/17/2011. (Martin, S)
|
December 9, 2010 |
Filing
14
ORDER DISMISSING 1 Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, for Failure to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 12/9/2010. Amended Complaint due by 1/13/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
|