McDonald v. Yates et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy McDonald
Defendant: J A Yates, Igbinosa, Clark, Cano, Roberts and - Rodrigues
Case Number: 1:2009cv00730
Filed: April 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/1/2013 denying 196 Motion for Trial Transcripts at Government expense. (Lundstrom, T)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 JUDGMENT in a Civil Action. (Verduzco, M)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE and ORDER that Plaintiff Jimmy McDonald, D-85597, is No Longer Needed as a Witness in these Proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/18/13. (Verduzco, M)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Requiring the Production of Plaintiff for Trial on September 18, 2013, at 8:00 A.M., signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/17/13. (Verduzco, M)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Striking Defendants' List Of Evidentiary Objections (Doc. 172 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/12/2013. (Fahrney, E)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/27/13. Jury Trial: September 17, 2013 at 8:30a.m. in Courtroom 7 (SKO). (Gonzalez, R)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER addressing 151 Reply signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/23/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to transport Inmate, Chance T. Harden for trial schedule on September 17, 2013 at 8:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/21/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Denying 143 Motion to Reopen Discovery and Continue Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/14/13. (Gonzalez, R)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER DENYING 118 Rule 35 Motion for Medical Examination or for Production of X-Rays, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/1/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Denying 137 Motion for Appointment of Counsel for Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/5/13. (Verduzco, M)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Produce Plaintiff Jimmy McDonald via Videoconference from HDSP, for a Court Appearance June 12, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/23/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER SETTING Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing and Jury Trial Dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/22/2013. (Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 7/31/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; Jury Trial set for 9/17/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto.)(Marrujo, C)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER VACATING Trial Confirmation Hearing and Trial Dates Before Judge O'Neill and Setting Telephonic Trial Setting Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/8/13: Telephonic Trial Setting Conference set for 5/22/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; Defendants' counsel to set up the conference call, arrange for Plaintiff's participation, and initiate the call to (559) 499-5790. (Hellings, J)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER & WRIIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Jimmy McDonald CDC #D-85597 for Settlement Conference Hearing on June 12, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/2/13. (Gonzalez, R)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Denying 114 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena to Produce Central File and for Appointment of Arbitrator or Interpreter, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/25/13. (Verduzco, M)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Referring Case to Settlement Week Program and Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/22/13. Settlement Conference set for 6/12/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone. (Verduzco, M)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Denying 111 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/20/13. (Gonzalez, R)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Disregarding Non-Responsive Objection (Doc. 108 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/28/2013. (Fahrney, E)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Adopting 100 Findings and Recommendations, DENYING Defendants' 76 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Referring Matter to Magistrate Judge to Set for Trial, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/22/13. (Gonzalez, R)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING 98 Motion for Reconsideration, with prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/21/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Denying 97 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/14/12. (Gonzalez, R)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendants' 76 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/12/12. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Twenty-Day Objection Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 88 Amended Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/11/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Adopting 81 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING Plaintiff's 62 66 67 Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, with Prejudice signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/11/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Denying Motion As Moot (Doc. 85 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/20/2012. (Fahrney, E)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Striking 82 Opposition Requiring Plaintiff to File Amended Opposition within thirty days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/13/12. (Verduzco, M)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/11/12. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 30-Day Objection Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/9/12. (Verduzco, M)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING 54 Motion to Appoint Counsel WITHOUT PREJUDICE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/21/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Amending Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/27/12. Discovery Deadline: 04/23/2012; Pretrial Dispositive Motion Deadline: 07/02/2012. (Verduzco, M)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Extending Application of Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendants Clark and Rodriguez re 28 Order, 48 Answer to Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint; ORDER Requiring Parties to File Status Reports Within Thirty Days If Amendments to the Scheduling Order Are Necessary, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/6/12. (Gonzalez, R)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 46 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction be Denied for Lack of Jurisdiction; Thirty Day Objection Period signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/26/2012. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 2/28/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying 40 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/2/11. (Verduzco, M)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Adopting 30 Findings and Recommendations and Denying 25 Motion for Transfer to Medical Facility for Lack of Jurisdiction; ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Courtesy Serve Receiver's Office With this Order and Documents 25 and 30, and Requesting that Receiver's Office Review Plaintiff's Allegations, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/11/11. (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION That Plaintiff's 25 MOTION for Transfer to Medical Facility be Denied for Lack of Jurisdiction, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/8/11. Thirty -Day Objection Period. Referred to Judge Wanger. (Gonzalez, R)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Provide Further Identifying Information for Defendants Clark and Rodriguez or SHOW CAUSE Why They Should Not Be Dismissed 23 , 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/7/2011. (Gonzalez, R)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/20/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Parties, and REFERRING Matter back to Magistrate Judge to Initiate Service of Process Proceedings signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/2/2011. Igbinosa and J A Yates terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Discharging Order To Show Cause, Granting Plaintiff Final Thirty-Day Extension Of Time To File Amended Complaint, And Disregarding Request For Status As Moot (Docs. 12 , 13 , 14 ), ORDER Directing Clerk's Office To Send Complaint Form And Copy Of Screening Order Filed October 14, 2009, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/8/2010. (Amended Complaint due by 1/11/2010) (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form)(Fahrney, E)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why case should not be dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/5/2010. Show Cause Response due by 8/24/2010. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Yates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J A Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igbinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?