Zuniga v. Jordan et al
Plaintiff: Larry Zuniga
Defendant: Chris Jordan, Kings County Board of Supervisors, Henderson, Gomes, Baily, Jones, Thayer, Hunter, Berke, Valdez, Delia, Ruiz, Gonzalez, Hernandez, Heritage, Torres, Mayor of Kings County and Kim
Case Number: 1:2009cv01208
Filed: July 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATED DISMISSAL and ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/3/13. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/29/13: The parties must submit dismissal papers no later than May 15, 2013; This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. (Hellings, J)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Advancing Telephonic Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/19/13. Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Gonzalez, R)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER SETTING Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/20/13: Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; Defense counsel shall make arrangements for a conference call and, once all parties are on the line, shall call the Court at (559) 499-5789.(Hellings, J)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DENYING Defendants' Pretrial Motions in Limine Without Prejudice 62 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/18/13: Motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Hellings, J)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/26/2013 regarding service of 80 MOTION to DISMISS. (Lundstrom, T)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant John Doe From Action, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/16/2012. (Marrujo, C)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance as MOOT 76 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/17/12. (Hellings, J)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 11/19/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/11/12. (Gonzalez, R)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Trailing Telephonic Scheduling Conference to September 10, 2012, at 3:00 P.M. in Courtroom 2 (AWI), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/31/12. (Gonzalez, R)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER RE: June 25, 2012 Motion In Limine Hearing (TELEPHONIC HEARING), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/20/2012. (Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 65 Motion to Vacate Trial and Amending Motion in Limine Date; Plaintiff's Motions in Limine Due by June 15, 2012 signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/12/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 61 63 Motion to Vacate Trial; Plaintiff's Motions In Limines Due by June 15, 2012 signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/31/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Vacating Pretrial Order and Trial Date of February 28, 2012, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 02/08/2012. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 3/19/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Flores, E)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PRETRIAL ORDER, Motions In Limine Deadline: February 13, 2012, Opposition To Motions In Limine Deadline: February 23, 2012, Motions In Limine Date: February 28, 2012, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2 (AWI), Trial Date: February 28, 2012, at 8:30 a.m. in C ourtroom 2 (AWI), ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Attendance Of Witnesses, Motion To Compel, Motion For Appointment Of Counsel, And Motion Not To Dismiss Doe Defendant (ECF No. 51 ), ORDER Dismissing Doe Defendant From Action (ECF Nos. [37 ]), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/1/2012. (Motion In Limine Hearing set for 2/28/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, Jury Trial set for 2/28/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, Motions filed by 2/13/2012, Opposition To Motions In Limine due by 2/23/2012) (Fahrney, E)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER CONTINUING Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing to January 30, 2012, and DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to Send Consent/Decline Form to Parties signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/13/2012. Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 1/30/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Sant Agata, S)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DISCHARGING 44 Order to Show Cause; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 45 Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/1/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/5/2011. Show Cause Response due by 12/23/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for a Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/28/11. (Verduzco, M)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Before United States Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison would be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/31/11. 20-Day deadline.(Verduzco, M)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why Defendant John Doe should not be Dismissed from Action; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/26/2011. Show Cause Response due by 8/29/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADDRESSING 34 Motion on Status and Disposition signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/30/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 31 Motion for a Subpoena Duces Tecum and 32 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/27/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 24 25 Motions and Modifying Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/11/2011. Discovery Cut-Off Date: 2/28/2011; Dispositive Motions Deadline: 5/9/2011.(Flores, E)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms. Service is appropriate for Berke, Torres, Chris Jordan, Henderson. Clerk to send plaintiff: 4 Summons, 4 USM-285 Forms, and 5 copies of the Complaint filed on 07/13/2009, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 01/28/2010. Case Management Deadline: 3/2/2010 (Martin, S)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants: (Gomes; Gonzalez; Heritage; Hernandez; Hunter; Jones; Kim; Kings County Board of Supervisors; Mayor of Kings County; Ruiz; Thayer; Valdez; Baily and Delia terminated)and Referring Matter Back to Magistrate Judge to Initiate Service of Process, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 01/26/2010. (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuniga v. Jordan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor of Kings County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?