Sierra v. McGuiness et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Alan Sierra
Defendant: McGuiness, Clark, Wang, Sanchez, German, Sena, Steubner, Frescura and Dorkens
Case Number: 1:2009cv01514
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Dismissing Action, Without Prejudice, For Failure to Pay Filing Fee; ORDER for Clerk to Close Case, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/12/2011. CASE CLOSED (Gonzalez, R)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Revoking In Forma Pauperis Status; ORDER Vacating 4 Order Granting Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER Vacating Order Directing CDC to Collect Filing Fee Payments for this Action; ORDER Vacating 10 Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to Amend; ORDER for Plaintiff to Pay $350.00 Filing Fee in Full within Thirty Days signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/03/2011. Filing Fee Due by 4/5/2011. (Flores, E)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Disregarding Motions For Attorney General To Conduct Investigations (Docs. 24 , 25 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/31/2011. (Fahrney, E)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Disregarding Motion (Doc. 27 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/27/2011. (Fahrney, E)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/22/2010 denying 21 Motion for leave to file supplemental complaint; directing clerk to return 29 Lodged supplemental complaint to Plaintiff and granting 30 Motion for Extension of time to file amended complaint. (Amended Complaint due by 8/26/2010). (Lundstrom, T)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Striking Notice And Denying Motion (Docs. 11 and 12 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/18/2010. (Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra v. McGuiness et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Alan Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGuiness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steubner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frescura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?