Hamilton v. Hart et al
Plaintiff: Dennis L. Hamilton
Defendant: John Hart, C. Prouty, R. Phillips, Ron J. Quillo, D. Castro, LLamas, Scott, Durden, Perez and Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2010cv00272
Filed: February 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/26/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE and ORDER that Inmate Witness Is No Longer Needed as a Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/17. (Gonzalez, R)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ADOPTING 107 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DISMISSING Doe Defendant signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/10/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/18/2017 recommending dismissal of Doe Defendant re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 2/24/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER regarding Settlement Conference set for 10/24/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; Personal Appearance by Plaintiff and Defense Counsel is required signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/13/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DENYING 89 & 94 Plaintiff's Requests for Issuance of Subpoena signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/9/2017. (Jessen, A)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING 97 Request to Clarify Discovery Order and Amending Order After Hearing re Discovery Issues signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/23/2016. (Jessen, A)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER After Hearing re: Discovery Issues, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/10/16. (Marrujo, C)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Opening Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/14/16. (Marrujo, C)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Telephonic Status Conference Before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/23/2016. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/4/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Jessen, A)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADOPTING 75 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; DENYING 41 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ORDERING DEFENDANTS TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/18/2016. (Filing Deadline: 9/21/2016). (Lundstrom, T)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the issue of Failure to Exhaust, filed on April 29, 2014, be DENIED; Plaintiff be deemed to have satisfied his exhaustion requirement; Plaintiff's claim be permitted to proceed on the merits re 41 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/21/2016. Objections to F&R due by 4/25/2016 (Martin-Gill, S)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE and ORDER that Inmate Witness is no Longer Needed as Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/26/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Dennis L. Hamilton, CDC K-64159, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/18/15. Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/26/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean.(Verduzco, M)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SCHEDULING ORDER Following Status Conference Held on December 14, 2015; ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/16/15. Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/26/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean.(Verduzco, M)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Telephonic Status Conference Before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/1/2015. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/14/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Jessen, A)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER Directing Clerk to Reopen Case; and ORDER Granting Plaintiff Thirty (30) Days to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/23/2015. CASE REOPENED. (Jessen, A)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RESPONDING to Plaintiff's 52 Request; ORDER for Clerk to Send Docket Sheet to Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/26/15. (Marrujo, C)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/5/2014 recommending that case be dismissed re 1 . Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 12/8/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to 41 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/9/2014. (Jessen, A)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING Unenumerated Rule 12(b) Motions, Without Prejudice, on Procedural Grounds and REQUIRING Defendants to File Responsive Pleading OR Motion Within Thirty Days (Docs. 26 , 28 , 37 ); ORDER VACATING 38 Order Issued on March 25, 2014 Which Required Plaintiff to File Opposition Or Statement of Opposition, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/11/2014. (Marrujo, C)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant Prouty's Motion to Dismiss within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/25/14. (Verduzco, M)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RESCINDING 13 Order to Show Cause Issued on May 10, 2012, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/21/2013. (Jessen, A)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/10/2012. Show Cause Response due by 6/12/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Hart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Prouty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron J. Quillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLamas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis L. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?