Harbridge v. Yates et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Harbridge
Defendant: James A. Yates, Rod Hickman, R. H. Trimble, W. R. Williams, J. L. Brown, D. Reeves, Munoz, Singleton, C. Nesbit, D. Stout, L. Lubken, D. Hernandez, R. Villareal, L. Wood, Stephenson, Ramirez, Bertagna, Torrez and Collier
Case Number: 1:2010cv00473
Filed: March 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER denying 203 Motion for New Trial signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/30/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 JUDGMENT dated *5/5/2017* in favor of defendants and against plaintiff according to the jury verdict returned in open court on 5/4/2017, CASE CLOSED, Civil Case Terminated. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER and RECEIPT for Trial Exhibits, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/4/2017. (Defense counsel shall retain possession and keep safe all exhibits until final judgment and all appeals are exhausted or the time for filing an appeal has passed.) (Gaumnitz, R)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER Requiring Production of Plaintiff for Trial on May 4, 2017, at 8:30a.m., signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/3/17. (Marrujo, C)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Requiring Production of Plaintiff for Trial on May 3, 2017, at 8:30a.m., signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/2/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 170 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Incarcerated Witness, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/17. (Marrujo, C)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/10/2017. (Flores, E)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Christopher Harbridge, CDC #K-61356, Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/30/17. (Marrujo, C)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 146 Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/30/17. (Marrujo, C)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER that Inmate Christopher Harbridge is no Longer Needed as a Participant in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/5/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT Plaintiff, Christopher Harbridge for a Settlement Conference set for 12/5/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/26/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/18/16. (Marrujo, C)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to File a Statement Whether a Settlement Conference Would be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/30/16. 15-Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 103 , 122 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/26/16: This matter is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Hellings, J)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 103 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART re 22 Second Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/11/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Reopen Discovery (Doc. 117 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/2015. (Fahrney, E)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Adopting Findings And Recommendation And Dismissing Defendants Ferro, Benyamin, And Dishman Pursuant To Rule 4(M) (Docs. 80 , 90 , 93 , 94 , 99 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/9/2015. (Fahrney, E)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing a Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/11/2015. 21-day deadline. (Jessen, A)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Defendants Ferro, Benyamin, and Dishman Pursuant to Rule 4(m), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/21/2015, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due by 5/26/2015. (Marrujo, C)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendants Ferro, Benyamin, and Dishman should not be Dismissed Pursuant to Rule 4(M); Show Cause Response due in thirty days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/9/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING 84 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Compel signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/2/2014. (Jessen, A)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant W.R. Williams signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/27/2014. W. R. Williams terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Make Proper Subtitution for Defendant W. R. Williams and Provide Address for Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/20/2014. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing a Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/9/14. (Hellings, J)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER-Notice And Warning Of Requirements For Opposing Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (Doc. 48 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/9/2013. (Fahrney, E)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting in Part 46 Defendants' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Concerning Deadline to File Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, for a Fourteen-Day Extension to File a Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/16/13. Deadline: October 7, 2013. (Gonzalez, R)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISCHARGING 31 Order to Show Cause Dated February 22, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/7/2013. (Marrujo, C)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action should not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Adopting 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Certain Claims signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/20/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Vacating Dismissal Of Second Amended Complaint Without Prejudice (Doc. 25 , 26 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/26/2012. The Court hereby ORDERS: The order issued April 3, 2011 (Doc. 25 ) is VACATED. The Court will re-screen the Second Amended Complaint in due course. Based thereon, the motion for reconsideration (Doc. 26 ) is MOOT. (Fahrney, E)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER discharging 21 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/21/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute this Action and for Failure to Obey the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/19/12. (Verduzco, M)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Reassignment; and ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Notify Court of Willingness to Proceed on Cognizable Claims or File a Second Amended Complaint, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/24/2012. Second Amended Complaint or Notice due within twenty (20) days. (Jessen, A)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/01/2011. Amended Complaint due by 3/25/2011. (Flores, E)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Motion For Correction(Doc. 12 ), ORDER Denying Motion for Enlargement Of Time (Doc. 13 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/27/2011. (Fahrney, E)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/14/2011 denying 6 Motion pursuant to 60(B)(1) and ORDER DISMISSING Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. (Amended Complaint due by 2/17/2011). (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Form).(Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harbridge v. Yates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Harbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. H. Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Nesbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Lubken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Villareal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertagna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?