Marrero et al v. Zaragoza et al
Plaintiff: Edwin Marrero, Van A. Rose and John Nowlin
Defendant: Cortez, Logthrop, Cobb, J. Zaragoza, D. Smith, Gant, Garge, J. Se Se, George and James N. Cross
Case Number: 1:2010cv00509
Filed: March 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Case for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Order 54 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/16/13. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections, If Any, Due in Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 49 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/4/2013. (Fahrney, E)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 50 Request for Copies; ORDER DENYING 51 Motion for leave to amend, without prejudice; ORDER for Clerk to send Plaintiff a copy of his docket sheet, a copy of the Court's order of November 30, 2012 44 and a 1983 complaint form, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/1/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Denying 47 Motion as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/09/2013. (Flores, E)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Vacating 41 Findings and Recommendations of October 25, 2012; Order Directing Clerk to File Plaintiff's 34 First Amended Complaint Which was Lodged on October 29, 2012, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/30/12. (Gonzalez, R)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/25/2012 recommending dismissal of action. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 11/29/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 22 Request for Copies, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/8/2011. (Marrujo, C)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Adopting 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/3/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 3 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction be DENIED re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/23/2010. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 1/31/2011. (Jessen, A)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion to Proceed IFP; Clerk is Directed to serve a copy of order and Plaintiff's IFP application on the Warden of the USP Hazelton, via U.S. Postal Service; Clerk is Directed to servce a copy of order on USDC Fresno Financial Department, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/23/2010. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marrero et al v. Zaragoza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortez
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logthrop
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Zaragoza
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Smith
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gant
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garge
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Se Se
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James N. Cross
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van A. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?