Hernandez v. Yates et al
Plaintiff: Tony Hernandez
Defendant: James Yates, M. Martinez, Legal Law Librarian, Martinez, California Dept. of Corrections, IDT Mental Health Committee and CDC Custody Committe
Case Number: 1:2010cv01064
Filed: June 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DISMISSING Action, with prejudice, pursuant to Parties' 102 Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/26/16. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/1/2016. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Telephonic Motions in Limine Hearing set for 2/8/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Jury Trial set for 2/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Lundstrom, T)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/30/2016. (Timken, A)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to transport inmate Anthony Hernandez for Settlement Conference set for 9/22/2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 7 before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/30/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DIRECTING Defendant to File a Response to Plaintiff's 85 Motion Requesting a Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/2/16. (Marrujo, C)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying 80 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/27/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ADOPTING 75 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING Defendant's 66 Motion for Summary Judgment ; Court will Issue a Seperate Scheduling Order Setting this case for Trial, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/25/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendant's 66 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/8/2016. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING 62 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Denying 49 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/16/2016. (Flores, E)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 63 Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/2015. (Deadline : 01/14/2016) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's 49 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/4/15. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Adopting Findings And Recommendations, Granting Summary Judgment In Favor Of Defendant On Plaintiff's March 12, 2010 Claim Of Excessive Force (ECF Nos. 50 , 58 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/22/2015. IT IS HEREB Y ORDERED that: The Findings and Recommendations, filed on September 4, 2015, is adopted in full. Defendants motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendant on Plaintiffs excessive force claim arising on March 12, 2010, and this action shall proceed on Plaintiffs separate claim of excessive force arising on May 3, 2011. Within thirty (30) days from the date of service of this order, Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs pending motion for summary judgment, filed April 22, 2015 (ECF No. 49.)(Fahrney, E)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Relating To Exhaustion Of The Administrative Remedies (ECF No. 50 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/4/2015. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 10/8/2015.(Fahrney, E)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Defendants' Request to Stay Obligation to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/14/15. (Gonzalez, R)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Denying As Premature Plaintiff's Motion To Expedite Trial Setting Procedures And Directing Clerk Of Court To Send Plaintiff The Order Re Consent Or Request For Reassignment Form (ECF No. 48 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/8/2015. (Fahrney, E)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING 42 Findings and Recommendations, DENYING Defendants; Motion to Strike Surreply, DENYING Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, DENYING Motion for Severance, and DIRECTING Defendants to File Further Response to Complaint Within Thirty Days, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/31/2014. (Marrujo, C)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings re 32 , 34 & 41 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/12/14, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days.(Marrujo, C)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants from Action signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/21/2014. M. Martinez Terminated from Action. (Flores, E)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants from Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/20/13. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 9 Motion to enter evidence signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/2/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Yates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Law Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDT Mental Health Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDC Custody Committe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?