Ransom v. Secretary of Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al.
Plaintiff: Bryan E. Ransom
Defendant: Secretary of Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Adams, S. Wortman and V. Neri
Case Number: 1:2010cv01423
Filed: August 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 23 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/14/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Motion To Reconsider (ECF No. 17 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/10/2010. (Fahrney, E)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FINDING First Amended Complaint Fails to Meet Imminent Danger Exception and Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims Without Prejudice to Refiling Contemporaneous With $350.00 Filing Fee, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/9/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 9 Motion to alter or amend Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/9/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Relief of Order Pursuant to FRCP Rule 60(b)(1) and (6) due to Court Error signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/26/2010. (Flores, E)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff In Forma Pauperis Status and Requiring Plaintiff to Pay $350.00 Filing Fee in Full Or Dismissal Will Occur, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/11/2010. ( Filing Fee Deadline: 9/15/2010.) (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ransom v. Secretary of Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan E. Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Wortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Neri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?