White v. Patel et al
Plaintiff: Jerome White
Defendant: Patel, Thompson and Chen
Case Number: 1:2011cv00047
Filed: January 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING 63 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/24/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That This Case Be Dismissed, Without Prejudice, For Plaintiff's Failure To Prosecute, Objections, If Any, Due Within Twenty (20) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/13/2014. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 10/8/2014.(Fahrney, E)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request For Settlement Conference (Doc. 47 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/17/2014. (Fahrney, E)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REQUIRING Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Request for Settlement Conference, Within Thirty Days 47 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/9/14. (Hellings, J)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 44 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/24/14. (Hellings, J)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Requiring Defendants' Chen and Patel to File Answer to Complaint Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/21/14. (Gonzalez, R)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING 34 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DENYING Defendant Chen and Patel's 26 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER REFERRING Case Back to Magistrate Judge for Further Proceedings, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/18/2014. (Marrujo, C)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending That Defendants Chen and Patel's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Be Denied 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/13/13: Objections, If Any, Due Within Thirty Days. (Hellings, J)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel and/or Motion for Stay 22 ; ORDER DENYING Request for Teleconference; ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss; DEADLINE for Plaintiff to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss NOVEMBER 4, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/15/13. (Hellings, J)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying 20 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/30/13. (Gonzalez, R)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 5 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/20/11: Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED, without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?