Polk v. Pittman et al
Plaintiff: Susan Mae Polk
Defendant: Pittman, Keith, Mason, Gerber, Cogan, Williams, Miller, Brown, Anderson and Radcliffe
Case Number: 1:2011cv00728
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 125 Motion for documents to comprise the excerpts of record on appeal and directing Clerk of Court to mail copies of excerpts of record on appeal to Plaintiff by 12/4/2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Regarding In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Denying 117 Motion for Relief from Judgment Under Rule 60, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/5/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Motion to Supplement Complaint; Dismissal of the Action With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With Rule 8 and 18 and Failure to Comply With Court Orders 98 , 108 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/8/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Overruling Objections to Motion and Order Denying Intervenor's Motion 105 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/27/16. (Hellings, J)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Denying Proposed Intervenors' 96 Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs with Newly Discovered Evidence under Fed.R.Civ.P.24(a) and (b), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/4/16. (Verduzco, M)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 87 Motion to Join Claims and Defendants under FRCP Rule 18(a), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/29/15. (Verduzco, M)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DENYING 93 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Order Finding Plaintiff's Objections Untimely signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/6/2015. (Jessen, A)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's FIRST 84 Motion for Extension of Time to File Fourth Amended Complaint; ORDER DENYING 88 Motion to Stay AS MOOT; ORDER GRANTING SECOND 90 Motion for Extension of Time to File Fourth Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/1/2015. (FOURTH Amended Complaint due by 5/29/2015) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Objections To Screening Order Dismissing Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 85 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/31/2015. (Fahrney, E)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RE: Objections to Magistrate's 5-13-13 Order Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Request to File Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 74 Regarding Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction 66 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/25/13. (Verduzco, M)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order and/or a Preliminary Injunction 66 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/15/13. Referred to Judge Ishii; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Request for Stay and/or Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint 52 ; ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Request to File Motion for Reconsideration 53 ; ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Request for an Extension to File Third Amended Complaint 63 ; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to File Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint 65 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/13/13. (Verduzco, M)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying Request For Copy Of Court Docket To Prepare Designation Of Record For Appeal (ECF No. 55 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/22/2013. (Fahrney, E)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice and Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Stay this Action 49 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/13/12. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS And Dismissing Certain Claims And Defendants (ECF Nos. 35 , 37 ), ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Fourth And Fifth Motions To Extend Time To File Objections To Findings And Recommendations (ECF No. 45 , 46 )), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/19/2012. (Fahrney, E)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying 29 Plaintiff's Objections Construed as a Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/3/12. (Verduzco, M)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants 33 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/18/12. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections due within thirty days. (Verduzco, M)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Striking Second Amended Complaint 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/28/11. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. Pittman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Mae Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radcliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?