Warner v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Earl Warner
Defendant: Matthew L. Cate, A. Walker, D. McGaha, R. Prokop, R. Spradling and W. Fellows
Case Number: 1:2012cv01146
Filed: July 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER STRIKING 173 Request for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER Following Settlement; VACATING Dates; and DIRECTING Parties to File Dispositive Documents Within Ninety Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/16/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/02/2017. Telephonic Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 9/20/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng; Jury Trial set for 9/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng.(Flores, E)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Earl Warner, CDCR# E-32637, for Settlement Conference on August 16, 2017 at 11:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/01/2017. (Flores, E)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Earl Warner, CDCR# E-32637, for Settlement Conference on August 18, 2017 at 10:15 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 07/28/2017. (Flores, E)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's First 154 Motion for the Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses; ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's Second 181 Motion for the Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 07/25/2017. (Flores, E)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 139 Request for the Appointment of an Expert Witness signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 06/22/2017. (Flores, E)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER on Defendants' 127 Request for Clarification signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/01/2017. (Flores, E)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Vacating Prior Scheduling Orders; ORDER Granting Defendants' 155 Motion to Continue Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/01/2017. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 7/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. Jury Trial set for 9/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng.(Flores, E)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 143 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/20/17. Appointed Bryan J Wilson,Daniel Clayton Hubin,Teresa Angela MacLean for Earl Warner (Martin-Gill, S)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Regarding Discovery of Confidential Materials, Seven (7) Day Deadline for Defendants' Production of Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/18/17. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER DENYING 117 Motion for Mediation AS MOOT, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/15/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 150 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/5/2017. (Hellings, J)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action should not be Dismissed with Prejudice for Failure to Obey a Court Order; Show Cause Response due in Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/16/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 126 Motion to Compel Defendants to Answer Interrogatories and Produce Documents; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 137 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/11/2016. (Case Management Deadline: 14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/21/2016. (Flores, E)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Vacating and Resetting Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/04/2016. Settlement Conference set for 11/9/2016 at 10:30 AM at Richard J. Donovan Correctinal Facility (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Flores, E)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 09/16/2016. Settlement Conference set for 11/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Flores, E)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER ADOPTING 116 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER DENYING 99 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and ORDER DENYING 108 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Proceedings signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/15/2016. (Jessen, A)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's Request to Stay Proceedings to Reopen Discovery; to Deny Defendants' 99 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/16/2016. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 9/2/2016. (Flores, E)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 98 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 90 Motion to Compel Discovery signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/07/2016. (Flores, E)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 99 ; NOTICE and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/15/16: Twenty-One (21) Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Adopting 95 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION; CASE to Remain OPEN signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/19/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Compel (ECF No. 90 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/27/2016. (Fahrney, E)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING EXHAUSTION OF ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/29/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 1/15/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 93 Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/23/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DENYING 79 Motion for Subpoenas and 78 Motion for Reconsideration as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/21/2015. (Marrujo, C)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: 1) Vacating Writ Of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum To Transport Plaintiff On August 14, 2015 (ECF No. 67 ), 2) Issuing Writ Of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum To Transport Plaintiff On September 4, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/10/2015. ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/4/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng.) (Fahrney, E)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING 70 Motion for Order Compelling Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/5/2015. (Marrujo, C)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING 69 Motion for Defendants' Witness to Testify by Videoconference, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/4/2015. (Marrujo, C)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Earl Warner, CDCR #E-32637, for a Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/14/2015 at 10:00 AM signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 06/09/2015. (Flores, E)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Adopting 59 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to DENY Defendants' 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; Case to Remain Open signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/9/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying 62 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 06/05/2015. (Flores, E)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendants' 41 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/18/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 6/8/2015. (Flores, E)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents 55 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/20/15. (Verduzco, M)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING 52 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's 46 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/03/2015. (Flores, E)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS To Deny Motion For Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 46 ), Fourteen (14) Day Objection Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/6/2015. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 2/25/2015. (Fahrney, E)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 44 Motion for an Order Compelling Uninhibited Access to the Court, and (2) Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; Clerk of Court to Fax Copy of this Order and ECF Doc 44 to Litigation Coordinator at California Health Care Facility, Stockton signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/05/2014. (Flores, E)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER (1) Disregarding Unenumerated Rule 12(b) 20 Motion, (2) Disregarding 29 Motion to Strike Surreply to Unenumerated Rule 12(b) Motion, (3) Requiring Defendants to File Responsive Pleading or Motion within Forty-Five Days, and (4) Denying Request for Stay of Discovery and Scheduling signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/30/2014. Response due by 7/21/2014. (Flores, E)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Discharging Order To Show Cause (ECF No. 9 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/10/2013. (Fahrney, E)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not be Dismissed With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/18/2013. Show Cause Response Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew L. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Prokop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Spradling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Fellows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?