Sullivan v. Biter et.al.

Plaintiff: Michael J. Sullivan
Defendant: M. D. Biter, Sherry Lopez, Chen, Patel and Marchiano
Case Number: 1:2012cv01662
Filed: October 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING 138 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER VACATING the November 26, 2018 Order 153 and Judgment 156 ; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 118 Defendants' Motion to Compel; ORDER GRANTING 119 & 123 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and ORDER RECALLING 152 Subpoena Issued to Dr. Marchiano on November 15, 2018 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/27/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER DENYING 129 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/10/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendant, Marchiano be dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/5/2018. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R's due within 21-days. (Lundstrom, T)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER overruling Defendants' 117 Objections to Discovery Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/6/2018. (Case Management Deadline: 2/20/2018).(Lundstrom, T)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DISCOVERY ORDER Following Initial Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/12/2017. (Jessen, A)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/4/2017 re-setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for 12/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Lundstrom, T)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 87 , VACATING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 88 , SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, AND REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANTS WITH HIS INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND FILE A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/1/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Filing Deadline: 9/5/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Case for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/15/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 6/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/1/2017. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/15/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING 80 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DISCHARGING 71 Order to Show Cause; ORDER For Clerk to Send Plaintiff Copy of Service Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/18/16. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/3/16. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ADOPTING 60 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; and ORDER for this Case to Proceed Only Against Defendants Chen, Patel and Marchiano for Deliberate Indifference to Plaintiff's Medical Needs, and Dismissing All Other Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/29/2016. (Jessen, A)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's 66 Objections for Lack of Signature; ORDER Granting Plaintiff Twenty Days to File Objections Bearing his Signature signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/13/2016. (Flores, E)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That This Action Proceed Only Against Defendants Chen, Patel, and Marchiano for Deliberate Indifference to Plaintiff's Medical Needs, and All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/16/16. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING 49 Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/18/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/14/14. (Verduzco, M)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Austin from Participation in this Case, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/6/14. (Verduzco, M)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Docs. 26 , 29 ) be DENIED re 28 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/20/2013. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying Motion For Court Hearing (Doc. 24 ), ORDER Informing Plaintiff That He Has Leave To Amend The Complaint Once As A Matter Of Course, Thirty Day Deadline To File First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/7/2013. (First Amended Complaint due by 3/11/2013)(Fahrney, E)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Accordingly, this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. See 28 U.S. C. § 1406(a).The Clerk shall terminate any pending motions and transfer the entire file to theEastern District of California. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/5/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from cand on 10/10/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Biter et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. D. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marchiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?