Tubach v. Guzman et al
Plaintiff: Isabel Tubach
Defendant: M. Guzman, Cancino and Long
Case Number: 1:2013cv00020
Filed: January 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, without Prejudice, for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 09/26/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why this Action should not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Obey a Court Order; Show Cause Response due within Twelve (12) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/13/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Submit More Definite Statement of Facts, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/8/13. Response Due Within Thirty (30) Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Requiring Plainitff to Submit More Definite Statement of Facts, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/5/13. Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tubach v. Guzman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cancino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Tubach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?