Anderson v. Kimbrell, et al.
Plaintiff: Dion Anderson
Defendant: M. Kimbrell, A. Gultierez and T. Jones
Case Number: 1:2013cv00378
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding Dismissal of Second Amended Complaint 27 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/22/15. Referred to Judge Ishii; 21-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendation 29 and Denying Motion to Enter Default 28 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/15/14. (Verduzco, M)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Default be Denied 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/17/14. Referred to Judge Ishii; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Amend the Complaint and directing Clerk of Court to file 21 Lodged Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/25/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Kimbrell, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dion Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Kimbrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Gultierez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?