Felix et al v. The State of California et al
Plaintiff: Robert Felix and Jack Phelps
Defendant: The State of California, Department of Developmental Services and Office of Protective Services
Case Number: 1:2013cv00561
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER on 56 Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal of Entire Case With Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/7/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Following Settlement Vacating Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/26/2015. (Kusamura, W)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE Fact Discovery Cut-Off. Non-expert fact discovery shall be continued three weeks. No other dates are affected. The new date and deadline shall be as follows: Non-Expert Discovery due by 3/13/2015. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/20/2015. (Timken, A)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re INFORMAL TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY DISPUTE CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/15/2015. (Timken, A)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER on 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Defendant's Motion to Compel Compliance With Subpeona Duces Tecum as to the City of Exeter / Exeter Police Department is GRANTED as modified with regard to the location of production. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/28/2014. (Timken, A)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE Trial and Pretrial Dates. Non-Expert Discovery due by 2/21/2015. Expert Disclosures due by 3/25/2015. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 4/9/2015. Expert Discovery Deadline: 5/18/2015. Non-Dispositive Moti on Filing Deadline: 6/17/2015. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 6/17/2015. Settlement Conference set for 3/25/2015, at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2015, at 02:00 P M in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Jury Trial set for 1/26/2016, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/18/2014. (Timken, A)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 28, 2014. (Munoz, I)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Stipulation for Protective Order and Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/15/2013. (Figueroa, O)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER re: Filing of Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint. Defendant may file an Amended Answer to the First Amended Complaint (FAC) on or before November 15, 2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/16/2013. (Timken, A)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER (Fed. R. Civ. P 16), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/16/2013. (Initial Disclosures: 10/15/2013, Expert Disclosure: 9/25/2014, Rebuttal Disclosures 10/9/2014, Non Expert Discovery: 8/21/2014, Expert Discovery: 11/18/ 2014, Non-Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 12/31/2014, Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 12/31/2014, Settlement Conference set for 9/25/2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2015, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, and Jury Trial (10-15 Days) set for 6/23/2015, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.) (Gaumnitz, R)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER On Defendant's Motion To Dismiss And Motion To Strike (Doc. 11 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/12/2013. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felix et al v. The State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Felix
Represented By: Dean B. Gordon
Represented By: Kevin M. Schwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Phelps
Represented By: Dean B. Gordon
Represented By: Kevin M. Schwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Developmental Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Protective Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?