Van Buren v. Willard et al
Plaintiff: Irvin Van Buren
Defendant: J. D. Willard, E. Wilson, N. Emerson, R. Cummings, Alva, A. Chan, M. Lopez, J. Perez, J. Riveo, R. Scharffenberg, M.D., J. Jackson and Clement Ogbuehi
Case Number: 1:2013cv01273
Filed: August 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion To Modify Discovery And Scheduling Order (Document 67 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/27/2015. (Fahrney, E)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/22/2015, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion to Strike Surreply 51 ; ORDER REQUIRING Defendant to Respond to Surreply, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/27/15: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendant's Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order 59 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/20/15: Dispositive Motion deadline EXTENDED to June 1, 2015. (Hellings, J)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 52 Motion to Compel without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/11/15. (Verduzco, M)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 REQUEST to Take Plaintiff's Deposition by Videoconference signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/19/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/8/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 32 Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/2/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/17/2014 re 27 Motion for Extension of time to file inital disclosures. (Lundstrom, T)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Document# 23 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/23/2014. (Fahrney, E)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 06/06/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 11 Motion for Injunctive Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/3/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Buren v. Willard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvin Van Buren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Riveo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Scharffenberg, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement Ogbuehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?