Bell v. St. Claire et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Bell
Defendant: Jack St. Claire, Georgia Thomatos and Forster
Case Number: 1:2013cv01594
Filed: October 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SECOND SCREENING ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim under Section 1983 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/08/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 24 Second Motion for Stay and REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/25/2014. (Marrujo, C)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING 22 Motion for Stay and GRANTING Thirty-Day Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/8/2014. Thirty Day Deadline to File Amended Complaint. (Marrujo, C)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Striking Unsigned Motion (Doc. 20 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/1/2014. (Fahrney, E)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Directing Clerk's Office To Provide Plaintiff Copy Of Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal And Striking Unsigned Notice (Doc. 18 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/24/2014. (Fahrney, E)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING AS UNNECESSARY 12 Motion to Amend Complaint; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to File Attached Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/12/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:13-cv-2039 CKD PC) to Fresno (1:13-cv-1594 SKO PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/3/2013. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. St. Claire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack St. Claire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Thomatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?