Reno Rios v. Gipson et al

Plaintiff: Reno Rios
Defendant: Connie Gipson, T. Campbell, A.V. Johnson, W. Brodie, S. Pina, M. Cuevas, D. Goree, J.C. Garcia, J. Ortega, A. Mayo, A. Pasillas and J. Hiracheta
Case Number: 1:2014cv00520
Filed: April 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 90 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2019. Settlement Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants Gipson, Mayo, Pina, Ortega and Garcia to File Responsive Pleading,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/2/2019. ( Responses due 21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Adopting 45 Findings and Recommendations Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 39 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/30/19. A.V. Johnson (Lieutenant), M. Cuevas (Sergeant) and J. Hiracheta (Correctional Officer) Terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 39 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/11/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Clarifying May 9, 2018 Order, and Finding Service of Second Amended Complaint Appropriate for Certain Claims and Defendants; ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Amend Service Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/27/2018. (Jessen, A)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE for failure to submit completed copies of service documents signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/12/2018. Show Cause Response due by 7/16/2018.(Lundstrom, T)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING 27 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/4/2018. Defendants Goree, Pasillas, Brodie and Campbell terminated. (Jessen, A)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a District Judge - CASE ASSIGNED to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. New Case No. 1:14-cv-00520 LJO BAM (PC); FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/17/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 8 Motion to screen the complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/30/2016. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reno Rios v. Gipson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reno Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.V. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Brodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Pina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Cuevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Goree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Pasillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hiracheta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?