Thompson v. Meyer-Zlokovich et al
Plaintiff: Andrew B. Thompson
Defendant: D. Meyer-Zlokovich, M. Moreno, C. Morrow and A. Rocha
Case Number: 1:2014cv01521
Filed: September 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Obey the Court's Order of August 21, 2015 re 2 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/28/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/21/2015. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/6/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Rocha's 13 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/06/2015. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Finding Cognizable Claims Stated and Requiring Responsive Pleading/Answer From Defendants Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/27/2014. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Meyer-Zlokovich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew B. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Meyer-Zlokovich
Represented By: Erin Rebecca Doering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Moreno
Represented By: Erin Rebecca Doering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Morrow
Represented By: Erin Rebecca Doering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Rocha
Represented By: Erin Rebecca Doering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?