Rodriguez v. Palmero
Plaintiff: Charlie Rodriguez
Defendant: Palmero
Case Number: 1:2014cv01742
Filed: November 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be DISMISSED based on Plaintiff's failure to state a cognizable claim under section 1983 re 16 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Charlie Rodriguez ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/17/17. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 9 ; DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO REOPEN ACTION AND RE-SERVE PLAINTIFF WITH ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT 8 AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/20/2015. (Amended Complaint due by 12/24/2015). Case reopened. (Lundstrom, T)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, for failure to state a claim signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/27/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/12/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Palmero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?