Jones v. Jimenez et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Jones
Defendant: Jimenez, Gonzalez, Stainer, Tate and Lee
Case Number: 1:2014cv02045
Filed: December 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER DENYING 149 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/22/2020. (Jessen, A)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER DENYING 139 Motion to Obtain and Introduce Polygraph Examination signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/10/19. (Marrujo, C)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for an Extension of Time to File Objections to the Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/15/19. Seven Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 129 Response to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/27/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendants' 105 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/13/2019. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 3/11/2019.(Flores, E)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Notice Filed on January 2, 2019 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/04/2019. (Flores, E)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 112 Motion for Reconsideration, DENYING Request for Free Copy of Deposition transcript and GRANTING Plaintiff thirty additional days to file an opposition, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/26/2018. (Martin-Gill, S) (30-Day Deadline)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER 110 DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Further Discovery and Granting Request for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/24/18. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Denying 103 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/12/18. (Gonzalez, R)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 100 Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/19/2018. (Martin-Gill, S) (Deadline: 08/03/2018)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 94 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order and Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/30/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting Defendants' 96 Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/12/2018. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/25/2018.(Flores, E)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 91 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/15/18. (Gonzalez, R)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting Requests to Extend the Discovery Deadline to March 12, 2018 re 87 , 89 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/31/18. (Gonzalez, R)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Plaintiff's 86 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/10/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Extend the Time to Serve Supplemental Responses to Defendants' Discovery Requests, DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's Motion to Postpone Deposition and GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Extend the Deadl ine for Filing an Exhaustion-Based Motion for Summary Judgment 82 , 83 , 84 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/21/2017: 1. Plaintiffs motion to postpone the taking of his deposition is denied as moot;2. Plaintiffs request to depose Defendants' is denied; and 3. Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to serve supplemental responses to Defendants' discovery requests is granted and such responses shall be served on or before January 5, 2018;4. The deadline to file an exhaustion-based motion for summary judgment is extended to February 23, 2018. (Hellings, J)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 80 Request to Extend the Deadline to File an Exhaustion Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request for Copy of Case Law signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/26/2017. (Flores, E)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DISCHARGING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Jeremy Jones, CDCR# T-42054, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/18/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 71 Request to Vacate Deadline for Filing of Exhaustion-Related Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/29/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT Inmate Jeremy Jones, CDCR# T-42054 on September 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. at California State Prison, Corcoran, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/17/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference on September 18, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/28/2017. Settlement Conference set for 9/18/2017 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.(Flores, E)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Directing Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's 57 Third Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/16/17. 21-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendants' 36 Motion to Dismiss be Granted in Part and Denied in Part signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/09/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 2/13/2017.(Flores, E)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference on June 24, 2016 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/26/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Addressing Plaintiff's Notice to the Court and Directing Plaintiff to File a Second Amended Complaint within Thirty Days from the Date of Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/16. 30-Day Deadline for Second Amended Complaint. (Verduzco, M)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Original First Amended Complaint to be Returned to Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/22/2015. (Marrujo, C)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Fourth 15 Motion to Extend the Time to File an Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/07/2015. Amended Complaint due by 7/24/2015.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Jimenez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?