Purtue v. Kearnes et al
Plaintiff: Michael Purtue
Defendant: B. Kearnes, G. Eberle, S. Rizer, Meyers, M. Brown, T. Langhardt, K. Holland, Sanders, L. Lundy, D. Magallances, R. Mello, M. Worrell, B. A. Wilson and Lopez
Case Number: 1:2015cv00551
Filed: April 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Adopting 41 Findings and Recommendations and Denying 37 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/17. (Gonzalez, R)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/28/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS regarding Plaintiff's Motion that Defendants failed to protect him re 64 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/5/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 5/11/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 38 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust the Administrative Remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/20/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 4/24/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/10/2017. (Jessen, A)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION REGARDING OFFICIAL MISCONDUCT 58 AS DUPLICATIVE OF MOTION FILED FEBRUARY 17, 2017, DENIED ON FEBRUARY 22, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/28/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 52 Motion regarding Officials misconduct signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/21/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DISREGARDING AS MOOT 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Obtain Documents From the Court signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/7/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Filed December 21, 2016, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/24/17. Twenty One Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION, and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 20 , 22 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/6/17. (Hellings, J)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/4/2017 recommending that 37 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION be denied. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 2/6/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/16/2016 recommending that 30 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be denied. Referred to Judge Dale A Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 1/20/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Copies of Inmate Appeals, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/5/16. (Marrujo, C)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SECOND ORDER directing service by U.S. Marshal on Defendant D. Magallance re 18 , 23 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 20 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction be DENIED re 8 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/9/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant D. Magallance Should Not be Dismissed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(M), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/24/2016. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISCHARGING 13 Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not be Dismissed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(M), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/18/16. (Marrujo, C)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendants J. Chavez, Meyers and S. Rizer Should Not Be Dismissed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(M), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/26/16. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purtue v. Kearnes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Purtue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Kearnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Eberle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Rizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Langhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Magallances
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Mello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Worrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?