McCoy v. Holguin et al
Plaintiff: LaKeith L. McCoy
Defendant: A. Holguin, C. Casillas, D. King, V. Moore, J. Gonzales, A. Martinez, S. Lomas, O. Delgado, E. Barron, Montanez, Mayfield, Moreno, C. Martinez, G. Arellano, Kilmer, Santa Maria, Holland, Hollis Bennett and DeLuna
Case Number: 1:2015cv00768
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 197 Motion to Stay and Construed Rule 56(d) Motion; ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Response signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 10/27/2022. Response Deadline: 12/28/2022. (Sant Agata, S)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Directing Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's [197 Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 10/07/2022. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER DENYING 189 Plaitniff's Motion to Stay signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 9/2/2022. (Lawrence, A)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Granting Defendants' 176 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER Denying without Prejudice Motion to Set Trial Date signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 06/30/2022. Filing Deadline: 9/7/2022.(Flores, E)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Redact Previously-Filed Document. ORDER directing Clerk to Redact, Restrict Access, or otherwise Seal Document 34-3, Page 74 179 signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 6/28/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER DENYING 170 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 11/23/2021. (Maldonado, C)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 166 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 11/10/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/11/2021. Settlement Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Jessen, A)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING 161 Motion to Withdraw as Pro Bono Counsel, DENYING Plaintiff's 162 Motion to Appoint New Counsel, and Referring Case to ADR Coordinator to Schedule Settlement Conference, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/25/2021. (Marrujo, C)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER ADOPTING 146 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DENYING 145 Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/17/2021.(Martin-Gill, S)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for the Limited Purpose of Trial and Trial Setting Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 4/22/2021. Attorney Jack Duran, Jr. for LaKeith L. McCoy added. (Rivera, O)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 144 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 04/13/2021. (Copy of this order forwarded to Sujean Park Castelhano) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to deny Plaintiff's Motion for emergency injunctive relief 145 and directing Clerk to serve Order on Litigation Coordinator signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 4/9/2021. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due within 30-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for Teleconference on January 15, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. and for a Zoom Settlement Conference on January 22, 2021 at 2:00 p.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 12/30/2020.(Flores, E)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER (1) SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, (2) REQUIRING PERSONAL ATTENDANCE BY CERTAIN INDIVIDUALS, (3) REQUIRING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT MEETING CERTAIN PARAMETERS, AND (4) SCHEDULING PRE-CONFERENCE TELEPHONIC DISCUSSION, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 11/25/2020(Dunbar-Kari, K)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 119 Motion for a Continuance of the Trial Conference and Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/3/2019. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Jury Trial set for 5/27/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING 113 Defendants' Motion for a Continuance of the Trial Date signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 11/5/2019. Jury Trial RESET for 5/19/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Jessen, A)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 91 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and GRANTING IN PART Defendants' 75 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/24/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER ADOPTING 93 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND DISMISSING NONCOGNIZABLE CLAIM, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/19/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to 15 Dismiss Non-Cognizable Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/22/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 3/12/2018. (Flores, E)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 78 Motion for Extension of Time; denying without prejudice 86 , 87 Motions to Compel; staying merits-based discovery pending resolution of Defendants' 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to grant in part Defendants' 75 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT for failure to exhaust administrative remedies signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/18/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER adopting 77 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 72 Motion to Stay signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/14/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER (1) GRANTING 64 Plaintiff's Unopposed Second Motion to Amend Discovery and Scheduling Order; (2) DENYING 65 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Discovery (Renewed); (3) GRANTING 66 In Part Plaintiff's Motio n for Order to Compel (Renewal); (4) DENYING 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Propound Additional Interrogatories; (5) DENYING 69 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to First Request for Production of Documents; and (6) DENYING 74 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/12/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice; and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendants' Motion to Stay 72 - 73 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/18/17: 14-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER (1) Amending Discovery and Scheduling Order; and (2) Denying Without Prejudice 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/12/2017. Discovery due by 6/30/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/15/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ADOPTING 56 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER GRANTING 44 Defendants' Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status; ORDER REVOKING PLAINTIFF'S IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS; and Order Directing Plaintiff to Pay the $400.00 Filing Fee in Full Within Fourteen (14) Days signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 59 Motion for Clarification signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 45 Request for Judicial Notice; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status and Direct Plaintiff to Pay Filing Fee in Full re 44 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/6/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER (1) GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; (2) GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Stay; and (3) DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Discovery Motions 40 , 49 , 50 , 53 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/6/17: Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion to revoke is due February 20, 2017. (Hellings, J)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 33 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 41 Plaintiff's Application for Modification of Discovery and Scheduling Order; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 42 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/23/17. Discovery due by 2/17/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/19/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER UNSEALING Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/8/15. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Holguin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaKeith L. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Holguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Casillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Maria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollis Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeLuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?