Green v. Sherman, et al.
Plaintiff: Cedric Eugene Green
Defendant: Stuart Sherman, J. Perez, Ramos, J. Zamora, Ms. Franklin, Cunning, Ybarra and J. Jasso
Case Number: 1:2015cv01548
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that Inmate Cedric Eugene Green, CDCR #F-38011 is no Longer Needed as a Participant in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/23/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Cedric Eugene Green, CDCR# F-38011 for Settlement Conference on March 23, 2018 at 9:00 a.m., at Corcoran State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/22/2018. (Flores, E)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING 49 Motion for Clarification ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 54 Motion to Declare Exhaustion of Remedies; ORDER STRIKING 53 Reply to Defendant Franklin's answer to the complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/31/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference on March 23, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/23/2018. (Settlement Conference set for 3/23/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone at CSP-Corcoran) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 42 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONSfor Action to Proceed on First Amendment Claim Against Defendant Franklin and to Dismiss all other claims and defendants; Defendant Franklin shall respond to the second amended complaint within twenty-one days of the date of this order, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/7/17. (21-Day Deadline) Ramos terminated. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 36 Motion Objecting to Any Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/30/17. (Gonzalez, R)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff proceed on his First Amendment Claim for Money Damages against Defendant Franklin in her individual capacity; All other claims asserted inthe second amended complaint and all other named defend ants be dismissed with prejudice re 40 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Cedric Eugene Green ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/25/2017. Objections to F&R due by 11/13/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER (1) DENYING 29 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as Moot; (2) Directing Clerk of Court to File Plaintiff's Lodged First Amended Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc; (3) GRANTING 33 Defendants' Request to Screen the First Amended Complaint; and (4) DISMISSING First Amended Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/1/2017. Second Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/24/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Clarification signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/23/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS (1) For Service of Cognizable Claims Against Defendants Franklin and Ramos; And (2) To Dismiss All Other Claims and Defendants With Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/23/16. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Sherman, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Eugene Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?