McCoy v. Soto
Petitioner: Anthony McCoy
Respondent: John Soto
Case Number: 1:2015cv01578
Filed: October 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending Denial of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/19/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT 28 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 13 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/20/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Regarding 33 Petitioner's Motion Requesting Copies signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/18/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 29 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Findings and Recommendation signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/12/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Grant Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 , 13 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/29/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/23/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing on Equitable Tolling and VACATING June 8, 2016 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/26/16: Thirty Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Grant Respondent's 13 MOTION to DISMISS, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/7/16. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?