Sorrells v. United States Marshals Service et al

Plaintiff: Shannon Sorrells
Defendant: United States Marshals Service, Chorrizon Healthcare, Rounds, Margaret Mimms, Eldridge, Newhill, Michael Aed, Blanton Austin, Horton and Anderson
Case Number: 1:2016cv00081
Filed: January 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED, Without Prejudice, Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute and 69 , 70 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED AS MOOT re 20 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/25/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Adopting 66 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/24/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 58 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings be DENIED re 20 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/2/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER adopting 56 Findings and Recommendations and denying 52 Motion for Summary Judgment for failure to exhaust the administrative remedies signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/22/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING 61 Substitution of Attorney for Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/3/2018. Attorneys Pamela Chung and Matthew M. Grigg for Horton and Melhoff added. (Jessen, A)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for failure to exhaust the administrative remedies be DENIED re 52 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/13/17. Objections to F&R due by 12/18/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Re-Setting Deadline to File Exhaustion Motion and Extending all other Deadlines set forth in the Court's 42 Order, dated March 14, 2017 to Defendant Horton as well as Defendant Melhoff; ORDERED that the deadline for both Defendants to file Exhaustion Motion be extended to July 14, 2017 and all other deadlines set forth in the Court's March 14, 2017, remain in full force and effect, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/25/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Requiring Defendant Horton to Show Cause why Expense of Personal Service should not be taxed against him, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/24/2017. Show Cause Response due (15-Day Deadline). (Martin-Gill, S)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with a court 34 Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/18/2017. Show Cause Response due within 20 days. (Lundstrom, T)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING 31 Findings and Recommendations, DIRECTING Service as to Defendants Horton and Melhoff, and DISMISSING All Other Claims and Defendants, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/22/16. (Marrujo, C)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING 23 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING 21 Motion, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/13/2016. (Marrujo, C)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That 20 First Amended Prisoner Complaint is Appropriate for Service Against Defendants' Captain Horton and Melhoff and Dismissing All Other Claims and Defendants From the Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/8/16. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 13 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING 11 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Court Ordered Medical Treatment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/28/2016. (Jessen, A)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 21 Plaintiff's Motion for a Court Order to Receive Medical Treatment be DENIED re 20 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/18/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Add and Correct Names of Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending Denial of Plaintiff's Motion for Medical Treatment 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/12/16: 30-Day Objection Deadline; Matter referred to Judge Drozd. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorrells v. United States Marshals Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshals Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chorrizon Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mimms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Aed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanton Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?