Martinez v. Davey et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Martinez
Defendant: D. Davey and Solano County Jail
Case Number: 1:2016cv00084
Filed: January 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING 52 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel and 53 Motion to Join Case AS MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2018. (Jessen, A)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/20/17. (Gonzalez, R)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute 42 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/4/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISCHARGING 35 Order to Show Cause Why this Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/5/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why this Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/07/2016. (Flores, E)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/27/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/19/16. Show Cause Response (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Adopting 24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION and DENYING Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Compel Officials to Process Appeals Properly and 602 Appeal Timelines signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/26/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/6/16. (Gonzalez, R)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of 1 Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Obey a Court Order; Fourteen (14) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/16/2016. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 6/3/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Davey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solano County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?