Quiroga v. Graves et al

Plaintiff: Monico J. Quiroga
Defendant: Graves, Fuentes, Gauze and Madera
Case Number: 1:2016cv00234
Filed: February 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend be denied and Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be granted 62 , 72 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/20/2019. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADDRESSING Plaintiff's Objection and Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; Twenty One Day Deadline for Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/7/19. (Marrujo, C)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ADOPTING 61 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/1/19. (Marrujo, C)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for preliminary injunctive relief be denied 60 . Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/22/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISREGARDING Plaintiff's 53 Request to Attorney General, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/14/19. (Marrujo, C)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Adopting 47 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/18/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this 45 Case Proceed Against Defendant Fuentes for Violation of Due Process, and that all other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim; Objections, if any, Due in Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/15/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Adopting 42 Findings and Recommendations and Denying Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/6/18. (Gonzalez, R)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/30/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING 38 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/16/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/9/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery 6 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/5/16. (Hellings, J)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/24/16. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiroga v. Graves et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monico J. Quiroga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gauze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?