Solorzano v. Frauenheim, et al.
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Solorzano
Defendant: S. Frauenheim, Walker, R. Walker, J. Guerra, A. Florez, R. Rojas, J. Chokatos and P.A. Fortune
Case Number: 1:2016cv00314
Filed: March 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action for Failure to Identify and Serve a Summons and Complaint on Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/24/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 20 Motion for a Rule 45 Subpoena, without Prejudice; ORDER Granting Plaintiff an Extension of Time to File a Motion to Substitute Doe Defendant(s) or a Renewed Motion for a Rule 45 Subpoena signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/28/2017. (Flores, E)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Defendants and Claims for the Failure to State a Cognizable Claim signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/7/2017. P.A. Fortune, S. Frauenheim, J. Guerra, R. Rojas, Walker, R. Walker, J. Chokatos and A. Florez terminated. (Jessen, A)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File a Motion to Substitute the Doe Defendant(s) OR File a Request for a Rule 45 Subpoena, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/17: 45-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint; ORDER Denying 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/22/17. Thirty Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solorzano v. Frauenheim, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Solorzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Frauenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Florez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Chokatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A. Fortune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?