Klahn v. Wasco State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Klahn, Sr.
Defendant: Wasco State Prison, John N. Katavich, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, R. Seitz, K. Gonzalez, F. Feliciano, R. L. Briggs and Ravazal
Case Number: 1:2016cv00342
Filed: March 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER on Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice, Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/5/19. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER to the Plaintiff and Defense Counsel to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Their Failure to Comply With the Court's Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/26/2019. Show Cause Response due by 3/21/2019. (Jessen, A)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, 1/7/2019 at 10AM in Fresno, Courtroom 6 before Judge Jeremy D. Peterson, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/13/2018. (Dunbar-Kari, K)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/17/2018. Settlement Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Jessen, A)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER STRIKING 31 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Answer signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/7/2018. (Jessen, A)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER requiring parties to notify court whether a Settlement Conference would be beneficial signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/18/2018. 14-Day Deadline. (Lundstrom, T)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RENAMING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING 19 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/17/2018. (Jessen, A)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Directing Clerk to Assign a District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action Proceed on Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment Claim Against Dr. Seitz and to Dismiss All Other Claims and Defendants re 17 Second Amended Co mplaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/15/2018. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is 1:16-cv-00342-DAD-JLT (PC). Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER reassigning action from Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/30/2018. New Case Number: 1:16-cv-00342-JLT-(PC).(Lundstrom, T)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying Motion for Reconsideration re 10 , 11 , 13 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/1/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/14/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klahn v. Wasco State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Klahn, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasco State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Katavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Feliciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravazal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?