August 16, 2021 |
Filing
149
ORDER Giving Full Effect to Stipulation to Dismiss Case, with Prejudice, Under Rule 41; ORDER for Clerk to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/16/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Maldonado, C)
|
July 22, 2021 |
Filing
147
ORDER Following Settlement Conference Vacating Dates; Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents within Thirty Days; and Discharging Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/22/2021. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
|
June 8, 2021 |
Filing
142
ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/7/2021. (Rivera, O)
|
May 27, 2021 |
Filing
141
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/27/2021. Zoom Settlement Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Maldonado, C)
|
January 22, 2021 |
Filing
136
ORDER for Plaintiff and Defendants to File Status Reports within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/22/2021. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
|
January 28, 2019 |
Filing
133
ORDER Granting Defendants' 131 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; ORDER Staying Deadlines for Discovery and for Filing Dispositive Motions; ORDER Requiring Parties to Inform the Court of Status of this Case, as Instructed by this Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/25/2019. (Flores, E)
|
December 26, 2018 |
Filing
132
ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel, or in the Alternative, for Imposition of Sanctions 129 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/21/2018. (Hellings, J)
|
November 6, 2018 |
Filing
128
ORDER VACATING 115 Order Requiring Parties to Inform Court of Status of Plaintiff's Criminal Trial Every Three Months; ORDER LIFTING STAY of Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/6/2018. New Discovery Deadline: 1/29/2019; New Dispositive Motions Filing Deadline: 3/29/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
|
November 5, 2018 |
Filing
127
ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference set for November 6, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/2/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 31, 2018 |
Filing
126
ORDER REGARDING Settlement Conference Scheduled for November 6, 2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/31/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 14, 2018 |
Filing
122
ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for Stewart Manago, Booking #1712370145 on November 6, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. from his place of confinement via video conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/13/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
May 1, 2018 |
Filing
118
ORDER in Response to Defendants' Request for Clarification 117 ; ORDER STAYING Deadlines for Completion of Discovery and Filing of Dispositive Motions Pending Resolution of Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/1/2018: Discovery deadline: STAYED; Dispositive motions deadline: STAYED. (Hellings, J)
|
April 24, 2018 |
Filing
116
ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 109 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/24/2018: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
|
April 23, 2018 |
Filing
115
ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court in Writing of Status of Plaintiff's Criminal Trial, Every Three Months (Resolves ECF No. 112 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/23/2018: First notice due no later than July 31, 2018. (Hellings, J)
|
March 23, 2018 |
Filing
110
ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Would Be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/23/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
|
February 16, 2018 |
Filing
108
ORDER GRANTING Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; ORDER EXTENDING Discovery Deadline and Deadline to File Dispositive Motions for All Parties, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/16/2018: New Discovery Deadline 5/29/2018, New Dispositive Motions Deadline 7/29/2018.(Hellings, J)
|
February 14, 2018 |
Filing
107
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 106 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/13/2018. (Hellings, J)
|
January 23, 2018 |
Filing
105
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Compel 87 ; ORDER for Plaintiff to Make Further Responses to All of Defendants' Individual Interrogatories, Set One; ORDER for Plaintiff to Produce Documents Requested in Defendants' Request for Production of Documents, Set One; ORDER for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Payment of Expenses, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/23/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
|
December 12, 2017 |
Filing
102
ORDER GRANTING 99 Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference and Lift Stay; ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference and Lifting Stay of Proceedings; ORDER REOPENING Discovery and Setting New Deadlines for Discovery and the Filing of Dispositive Motions,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/11/17. (Discovery due by 2/28/2018, Dispositive Motions filed by 4/30/2018) (Martin-Gill, S)
|
September 25, 2017 |
Filing
98
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request for Stay 97 ; ORDER STAYING All Proceedings in This Action Pending January 18, 2018, Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/25/17. (Hellings, J)
|
September 19, 2017 |
Filing
96
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/19/17. Settlement Conference set for 1/18/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Gonzalez, R)
|
September 6, 2017 |
Filing
95
ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's First 61 Motion to Compel; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Second 67 Motion to Compel; ORDER DENYING Plantiff's Third 68 Motion to Compel; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Fourth 73 Motion to Compel ; ORDER for Defendants to Produce Redacted Documents in Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production Set Three, No. 1, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/6/17. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
|
August 17, 2017 |
Filing
91
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why case should not be dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/17/17. Show Cause Response due 14-Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S)
|
July 28, 2017 |
Filing
89
ORDER GRANTING Motions to Modify Scheduling Order 86 , 88 ; ORDER EXTENDING Discovery Deadline and Deadline to File Dispositive Motions for All Parties, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/28/17: New Discovery Deadline 10/6/2017; New Dispositive Motions Deadline 12/6/2017. (Hellings, J)
|
May 22, 2017 |
Filing
85
ORDER Granting 75 Motion for Protective Order; ORDER Granting 76 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; ORDER Extending Deadlines for all Parties signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/19/2017. (Flores, E)
|
May 9, 2017 |
Filing
82
ORDER GRANTING 77 Motion to Redact Exhibits; ORDER for Defendants to Re-Submit Exhibits B, C, and D, With the Appropriate Redactions as Discussed in This Order Within Twenty-One (21) Days; and ORDER for Clerk to Seal Exhibits C, D, and E, Showing on the Docket as ECF No. 75-2, Pages 11-22 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/8/2017. (Jessen, A)
|
December 9, 2016 |
Filing
70
ORDER Granting Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order; ORDER Extending Discovery Deadline and Deadline to File Dispositive Motions for all Parties, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/8/16. New Discovery Due by 3/7/2017. New Dispositive Motions Deadline: 5/6/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
|
November 17, 2016 |
Filing
60
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 59 Second Request for Extension of Time to Serve Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Request for Production of Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/16/16. Deadline: December 19, 2016. (Marrujo, C)
|
September 23, 2016 |
Filing
57
ORDER DENYING Request for Application of Non-Prisoner Provisions in Local Rules 55 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/23/16. (Hellings, J)
|
August 25, 2016 |
Filing
50
ORDER ADOPTING 42 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 40 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/25/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
July 13, 2016 |
Filing
43
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Seal without prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 07/13/16. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
July 6, 2016 |
Filing
39
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 38 Motion for assistance in contacting witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/6/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing
37
ORDER ADOPTING 21 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/06/2016. (Flores, E)
|
May 23, 2016 |
Filing
32
ORDER granting in part 28 Motion for Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/23/2016. (Filing Deadline: Objections due by 6/16/2016). (Lundstrom, T)
|
May 20, 2016 |
Filing
30
ORDER denying 23 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/20/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing
25
ORDER denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/17/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
|
May 11, 2016 |
Filing
22
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint states a cognizable claim against Defendants Davey, Sexton, Vander Poel, Maxfield, Valdez, Acevedo and Razo for retaliation in violation of the First Amendment, a nd it shall go forward on this basis. It does not state any other claims and the remaining claims are dismissed for failure to state a claim. re 13 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Stewart Manago ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 05/11/2016. Objections to F&R due by 6/6/2016 (Martin-Gill, S)
|
May 4, 2016 |
Filing
19
ORDER denying 17 Motion for Special Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/4/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
|
April 20, 2016 |
Filing
14
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 12 Second Motion for Reconsideration as Moot, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/20/16. (Marrujo, C)
|
March 29, 2016 |
Filing
6
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis And Dismissing Action Without Prejudice Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) (Doc.No. 2 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/29/2016. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
|