Ratcliff v. Akanno, et al.
Plaintiff: William Ratcliff
Defendant: J. Akanno, M. Spaeth, OGun Omolade, A. Rangel and A. Manasrah
Case Number: 1:2016cv00584
Filed: April 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants Manasrah, Ogun, Rangel and Spaeth's 54 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/17/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 9/20/2018. (Flores, E)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant J. Akanno's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/15/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 9/20/2018. (Flores, E)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING 51 Plaintiff's Motion to Extract Testimony of Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/2/2018. (Jessen, A)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to comply with the Court's 9/27/2017 Order and respond to Defendants' Discovery Requests re 49 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/17/2017. (Filing Deadline: 11/20/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Regarding Defendants' 42 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/27/2017. Thirty Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Entry of Default as to Defendant Dr. Akanno, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/21/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER EXTENDING 26 Discovery and Scheduling Order Issued May 18, 2017, to Defendant J. Akanno signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/7/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING 40 Plaintiff's Motion in Opposition to Declaration Filed by Deputy Attorney General, Catherine Woodbridge signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/10/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DIRECTING Defendant Dr. Akanno to File a Response to the Complaint Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/8/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default 37 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/7/17. (Hellings, J)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 35 Motion for Copies of Inmate Appeals and DISCHARGING 33 Order to Show Cause, Issued July 24, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/1/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER as to Why Entry of Default Should Not Be Entered as to Defendant Akanno 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/21/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Extending Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant Ogun Omolade re 26 , 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/9/17. (Gonzalez, R)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Ogun Omolade Should Not be Dismissed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/17. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/29/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel Without Prejudice 3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/26/16. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratcliff v. Akanno, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ratcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Akanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Spaeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OGun Omolade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Manasrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?