A.M. v. Fresno Unified School District
Plaintiff: A.M.
Defendant: Fresno Unified School District
Case Number: 1:2016cv00725
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/31/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Authorizing Compromise of Minor's Claim and of Attorneys' Fees and Costs signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/23/2018. (Flores, E)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 8, 2017. (ECF No. 34) (Munoz, I)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order striking request for punitive damages, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/26/2017. (Rosales, O)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER to EXTNED Time to File Dispositive Motions. The dispositive motion filing cutoff date is extended from September 18, 2017 to September 22, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/19/2017. (Timken, A)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/18/2017. (Timken, A)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER to EXTEND DEADLINE ON EXPERT DISCLOSURES, 27 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/11/2017. (Timken, A)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING Parties' Request to Continue Schuduling dates; Settlement Conference currently set for 5/16/2017 is moved to 9/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, Pretrial Conference currently set fo r 8/23/2017 is moved to 12/20/2017 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, Jury Trial currently set for 10/17/2017 is moved to set for 2/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/11/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/27/2017. (Timken, A)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Joint Stipulation RE Withdrawal of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Responsive Pleading by Defendant signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/24/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT FRESNO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO CONTINUE THE DATE OF THE JOINT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 3, 2016. 9 MOTION to DISMISS currently set for 8/23/2016 has been CONTINUED to 9/20/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/30/2016 has been CONTINUED to 10/20/2016 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Munoz, I)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 5 Application of Sheena Mixon for appointment as Guardian Ad Litem for A.M., a minor. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/31/2016. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.M. v. Fresno Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.
Represented By: Louis V. Kosnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Unified School District
Represented By: Mart Benjamin Oller, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?