Watkins v. Muniz, et al.
Petitioner: Eric Mark Watkins
Respondent: W. L. Muniz and Kamala D. Harris
Case Number: 1:2016cv00749
Filed: May 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/8/17. Attorney Carolyn D. Phillips terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SCHEDULING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/5/2017. (Filing Deadline: 7/31/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Amend Caption signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/24/2017. (Flores, E)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Respondent's motion for a more definite statement and granting Petitioner 90 days to amend the petition signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/6/2016. (Filing Deadline: 1/9/2017).(Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Muniz, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Mark Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W. L. Muniz
Represented By: Maria G. Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kamala D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?