June 3, 2021 |
Filing
106
ORDER Giving Full Effect to Stipulation to Dismiss Case, with Prejudice, under Rule 41 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 06/03/2021. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
|
May 28, 2021 |
Filing
104
ORDER FOLLOWING Settlement; VACATING Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/27/2021. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
|
May 6, 2021 |
Filing
101
ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference and 99 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/05/2021. (Maldonado, C)
|
May 3, 2021 |
Filing
99
ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Produce Inmate Saladin Rushdan aka Robert Stanley Woods, CDCR #B-38236 via Telephonic Conference on May 28, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/01/2021. (Maldonado, C)
|
March 22, 2021 |
Filing
98
ORDER Setting Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/19/2021. Settlement Conference set for 5/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Jessen, A)
|
September 8, 2020 |
Filing
85
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 79 Motion for Reimbursement of Funds, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/5/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
August 21, 2020 |
Filing
84
ORDER for Defendant to File and Serve, Within Thirty Days, an Answer to the Second Amended Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading Under Rule 12, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/21/2020. (Marrujo, C)
|
August 18, 2020 |
Filing
82
ORDER ADOPTING 73 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DENYING 65 Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment; and ORDER GRANTING 67 Defendant Casa's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/18/2020. (Jessen, A)
|
June 25, 2020 |
Filing
77
ORDER DENYING 75 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/25/2020. (Rivera, O)
|
June 1, 2020 |
Filing
73
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending, that Defendant Casa's 67 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default be Granted, and Plaintiff's 65 Request for Default Judgment be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 06/01/2020. Referred to Judge Unassigned; Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days. (Flores, E)
|
May 20, 2020 |
Filing
72
ORDER GRANTING Defendant Casas' 71 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Unauthorized Surreply; ORDER Striking 70 Surreply signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/20/2020. (Flores, E)
|
April 3, 2020 |
Filing
64
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request for Court to Find Defendant Casas in Contempt of Court; ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Request for Court to Grant his Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendant Casas signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/03/2020. (Flores, E)
|
March 27, 2020 |
Filing
62
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Casas; ORDER DENYING 58 Motion for Default Judgment, without Prejudice; ORDER Directing Clerk to Enter Default Against Defendant Casas signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/27/2020. (Flores, E)
|
January 8, 2020 |
Filing
57
ORDER Requiring Defendant Casas to SHOW CAUSE Within Thirty (30) Days Why Default Should Not Be Entered Against Him and ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Serve Courtesy Copy of This Order on Defendant Casas at Address Below signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/8/2020. 30-day deadline. (Jessen, A)
|
December 3, 2019 |
Filing
55
ORDER REQUIRING Defendant Casas to SHOW CAUSE within Thirty Days Why Default should not be Entered Against him; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Serve Courtesy Copy of this Order on Defendant Casas at Address Below signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/2/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
|
June 24, 2019 |
Filing
49
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 48 Request for Assistance with Service signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/21/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
|
April 12, 2019 |
Filing
47
ORDER in Response to Plaintiff's Notice 46 ; ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause and GRANTING Plaintiff an Extension of Time 45 ; ORDER for Clerk to Re-Serve Plaintiff With Order Issued on October 26, 2018, and its Attachments 36 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/12/2019: 90-Day Deadline for Plaintiff to Serve Process on Defendant Casas. (Hellings, J)
|
March 12, 2019 |
Filing
45
ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed for His Failure to Effect Service Upon Defendant Casas 36 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/12/2019: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
|
October 22, 2018 |
Filing
35
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 29 ; ORDER for This Case to Proceed Only Against Defendant Casas for Use of Excessive Force, and Dismissing All Other Claims and Defendants for Violation of Rule 18, Without Prejudice to Filing New Cases, and for Failure to State a Claim 28 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/19/2018: Defendants D. Davey, C/O Roque, C/O Geston, Sergeant Solis, Sergeant Arnett, Lieutenant T. Marsh, and C/O Geston are dismissed from this action for violation of Rule 18; This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including initiation of service of process. (Hellings, J)
|
August 27, 2018 |
Filing
30
NOTICE to Plaintiff of His Right to File Objections to the Findings and Recommendations Issued on August 22, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/26/18. Fourteen Day Deadline for Plaintiff to File Objections. (Marrujo, C)
|
August 22, 2018 |
Filing
29
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That This Case Proceed Only Against Defendant Casas for Use of Excessive Force, and That All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed for Violation of Rule 18, Without Prejudice to Plaintiff to File New Cases, and for Failure to State a Claim 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/21/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
|
August 14, 2017 |
Filing
22
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 10 Motion of Correction signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/13/2017. (Flores, E)
|
January 20, 2017 |
Filing
18
ORDER Dismissing Action, without Prejudice, for Failure to Comply with Court Order to Pay Filing Fee re 12 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/20/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
|
December 1, 2016 |
Filing
12
ORDER Revoking Plaintiff In Forma Pauperis Status Under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); ORDER Vacating August 2, 2016 Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing CDCR to Deduct Funds for the Filing Fee 6 ; ORDER for P laintiff to Submit $321.47 Balance Owed for Filing Fee Within Thirty Days OR Case Will Be Dismissed; ORDER for Clerk to Serve This Order on the CDCR and the Court's Financial Department, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/1/16. (Hellings, J)
|
July 11, 2016 |
Filing
4
ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:16-cv-1502 KJN) to Fresno (1:16-cv-988 DLB) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/11/16. (Dillon, M)
|