Martin v. Sysco Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Martin and John Martin
Defendant: Sysco Corporation and SYSCO Central California, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00990
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed #66 Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement and Awarding Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Incentive Award, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/17/2019. CLOSED CASE (Martin-Gill, S)
December 3, 2019 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Jamie Serb, Esq.: Re:Cost. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proof of Service)(Serb, Jamie)
December 3, 2019 Filing 68 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 12/3/2019. #66 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement argued, submitted and taken under submission. Written order will issue. Plaintiff's Counsel Jamie Serb telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel Nicholas Poper telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Rachael Lundy. (Thorp, J)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER: (TIME CHANGE ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/26/2019; #66 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement on calendar 12/3/2019, WILL BE HEARD at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The parties are encouraged to appear telephonically and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236) at the time of the hearing. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand-held cell phone is required. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing, if you have not already done so, you must email Courtroom Deputy Jami Thorp, at JThorp@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically. (Thorp, J)
November 5, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement by John Martin. Attorney Serb, Jamie Kathryn added. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Mara, #2 Declaration of Nathalie Hernandez, #3 Declaration of John Martin, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof Of Service)(Serb, Jamie)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/22/2019. The hearing for final approval of the proposed settlement is set for December 3, 2019 at 9:30 a.m., with the motion for final approval of the class action settlement to be filed twenty-eight days in advance of the hearing, in accordance with Local Rule 230. (Thorp, J)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed #61 Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/18/19. (Marrujo, C)
July 2, 2019 Filing 63 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 7/2/2019. #61 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement taken under submission. Written order will issue. Plaintiff's Counsel Jill Vecchi telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel Sabrina Shadi telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Peggy Crawford. (Thorp, J)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/27/2019; the parties are encouraged to appear telephonically for the #61 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement on calendar 7/2/2019, and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236) at 9:30am. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand-held cell phone is required. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing, if you have not already done so, you must email Courtroom Deputy Jami Thorp, at JThorp@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically. (Apodaca, P)
May 24, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by John Martin. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Mara, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1 to Mara Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Crawford, Matthew)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: All pending motions, deadlines, and dates in this action are VACATED; and the parties shall file a motion for preliminary approval of class settlement within forty-five (45) days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/09/2019. (Hernandez, M)
April 8, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by John Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proof Of Service)(Crawford, Matthew)
March 21, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by David Thomas Mara. (Attachments: #1 Proof Of Service)(Mara, David)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Deadline to complete Non Expert Discovery 5/1/2019, Dispositive Motions filed by 6/6/2019, Deadline to Exchange Expert Disclosure 6/6/2019, Deadline to Supplement Expert Disclosure 6/27/2019, Deadline to Complete Expert Discovery 7/22/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, Jury Trial set for 10/16/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/27/2019. (Hernandez, M)
February 27, 2019 Filing 56 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Trial Date and All Related Deadlines by SYSCO Central California, Inc., Sysco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shadi, Sabrina)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF PARTIES. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the May 10, 2018 scheduling order is amended as follows: April 1, 2019 - Deadline to complete non-expert discovery; May 7, 2019 - Deadline to submit dispositive motions; May 7, 2019 - Deadline to exchange expert disclosures; May 28, 2019 - Deadline to supplement expert disclosures; June 20, 2019 - Deadline to complete expert discovery; July 2, 2019 - Joint Pre-trial Conference Statement due; July 8, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Pre-trial Conference; September 4, 2019 at 1 p.m. Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/08/2018. (Gonzales, V)
November 7, 2018 Filing 54 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance Of Trial Date And All Related Deadlines by John Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Crawford, Matthew)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting #52 Stipulation for Class Notice, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/29/2018. (The proposed class notice (Doc. No. 52-1) is approved. Defendant shall provide class members' identifying information to ILYM Group, Inc. within ten (10) business days of the date of service of this order. ILYM Group shall send the notices within five (5) calendar days thereafter.)(Gaumnitz, R)
May 25, 2018 Filing 52 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Approval of Notice of Pendency of Class Action and Ordering Notice to be Sent to All Class Members by John Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Crawford, Matthew)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Extending Deadline to Submit Class Notice, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/21/2018. (The previously set deadline to file a joint proposed class notice is extended to 5/25/2018.) (Gaumnitz, R)
May 18, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE RE Status of Proposed Notice of Pendency of Class Action by John Martin. (Crawford, Matthew)
May 11, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE RE Status of Proposed Notice of Pendency of Class Action by SYSCO Central California, Inc., Sysco Corporation. (Shadi, Sabrina)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING ORDER: Non Expert Discovery 12/1/2018; Expert Disclosure 11/20/2018; Supplemental Expert Disclosure 12/10/2018; Expert Discovery 1/2/2019; Dispositive Motions filed by 1/7/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Jury Trial (10 Days) set for 5/7/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/9/2018. (Hernandez, M)
May 8, 2018 Filing 47 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/8/2018. The Court to issue a Scheduling Conference Order. NOTE: "SAB Chambers Procedures" emailed to the parties. Plaintiffs Counsel Matthew Crawford by telephone. Defendants Counsel Sabrina Shadi by telephone. Court Reporter/CD Number: In chambers and off the record. (Hernandez, M)
May 1, 2018 Filing 46 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by John Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Crawford, Matthew)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Setting Phase Two Scheduling Conference for May 8, 2018 and Directing Parties to File a Joint Status Report Seven Days Prior, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/20/2018. It is hereby ordered that: (1) A scheduling conference is set for May 8, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9; (2) The parties shall file a joint scheduling report seven (7) days prior to the conference date; and (3) The parties may appear telephonically at the scheduling conference by contacting Courtroom Deputy Mamie Hernandez to obtain the teleconference number and passcode. (Valdez, E)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting in Part #37 Motion for Class Certification, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/19/2018. (This matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further scheduling and other proceedings consistent with this order.) (Gaumnitz, R)
April 3, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gwendolyne Nicole Ousdahl on behalf of John Martin. Attorney Ousdahl, Gwendolyne Nicole added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - Appearance of Counsel)(Ousdahl, Gwendolyne)
February 6, 2018 Filing 42 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 2/6/2018. #37 Motion for Class Certification argued and submitted, a written order will issue. Plaintiff's Counsel David Mara telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel Sabrina Shadi and Nicholas Poper personally present. Court Reporter: Karen Hooven. (Gaumnitz, R)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER: (TIME CHANGE ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/1/2018; the #37 motion to certify class on calendar 2/6/2018, WILL BE HEARD at 9:45 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The parties are encouraged to appear telephonically and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236) at the time of the hearing. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand held cell phone is required. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing you must email Courtroom Deputy Renee Gaumnitz, at RGaumnitz@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 29, 2018 Filing 40 REPLY by John Martin to RESPONSE to #37 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS . (Attachments: #1 Response to Defendant's Evidentiary Objections, #2 Proof of Service)(Crawford, Matthew)
January 15, 2018 Filing 39 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by SYSCO Central California, Inc., Sysco Corporation in re #38 Opposition to Motion. (Shadi, Sabrina)
January 15, 2018 Filing 38 OPPOSITION by SYSCO Central California, Inc., Sysco Corporation to #37 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS . (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections, #2 Declaration of Trohn Josserand, #3 Declaration of Sabrina L. Shadi)(Shadi, Sabrina)
December 18, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS by John Martin. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of William Turley, #3 Declaration of John Martin, #4 Declaration of Kevin Taylor, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Proof of Service)(Crawford, Matthew)
December 15, 2017 Filing 36 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 12/15/2017; CASE NOT SETTLED. Plaintiff's Counsel Jill Vecchi and Plaintiff John Martin present. Defendants' Counsel Sabrina Shadi and Nicholas Poper and Pete Zahos (client representative) present. (Rooney, M)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/28/2017. (Rooney, M)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) At the request of the parties, the Court sets a Settlement Conference for 12/15/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. A separate order regarding settlement procedures will be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/28/2017. (Hernandez, M)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel further Responses from Defendant, Sysco Central California, Inc. and Motion to Compel Responses from Defendant, Sysco Corporation for failure to comply with Rule 251 #28 , #29 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline to complete mediation is continued to December 18, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/3/2017. (Hernandez, M)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING ON THE MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SYSCO CORPORATIONS RESPONSES (ECF No. 29) TO NOVEMBER 22, 2017, AT 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to compel Sysco Corporation to produce documents and responses to Plaintiffs interrogatories and requests for production of documents (ECF No. 29) shall be continued from November 15, 2017, to November 22, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned in Courtroom 9. The parties shall file a joint statement for both motions to compel (ECF Nos. 28 & 29) on or before November 15, 2017, which complies with the procedures outlined in this order, including the requirement to meet and confer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/2/2017. (Hernandez, M)
November 2, 2017 Filing 30 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Deadline to Complete Mediation by December 18, 2017 by SYSCO Central California, Inc., Sysco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shadi, Sabrina)
November 1, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION to COMPEL DEFENDANT SYSCO CORPORATIONS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO) AND PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET TWO) by John Martin. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Proof Of Service)(Crawford, Matthew)
November 1, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION to COMPEL DEFENDANT SYSCO CENTRAL CALIFORNIA, INC.S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) by John Martin. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Proof Of Service)(Crawford, Matthew)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Partially Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and ORDER Vacating Hearing on October 11, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/9/2017. It is hereby ordered that: (1) Plaintiff's motion to compel is PARTIALLY GRANTED: Defendant shall provide responses to interrogatory 1 for 20 percent of the non-exempt truck workers, industrial truck workers, industrial truck drivers, industrial vehicle drivers, and industrial workers at each of Defendant's facilities in California. A Belaire-West opt-out notice shall be sent to affected individuals before any information is disclosed; Defendant shall provide responses to interrogatories 2, 3, and 4 for all of Defendant's facilities in California for non-exempt truck workers, industrial truck workers, industrial truck drivers, industrial vehicle drivers, and industrial workers; (2) Responses to interrogatories 2, 3, and 4 shall be produced within thirty (30) days of the date of this order unless leave of Court is granted for an extension of time based upon good cause; (3) Responses to interrogatory 1 shall be produced within fifteen (15) days of the deadline to return the Belaire-West notices; and (4) The hearing on the motion to compel set for October 11, 2017, is VACATED. (Valdez, E)
October 4, 2017 Filing 26 STATEMENT of Discovery Disagreement by Plaintiff John Martin re #17 MOTION to COMPEL PLAINTIFF JOHN MARTIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SYSCO CENTRAL CALIFORNIA, INC.S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof Of Service)(Crawford, Matthew)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL TO OCTOBER 11, 2017. THE COURT RESETS THE MOTION HEARING as to MOTION to COMPEL from 10/4/2017 to 10/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/28/2017. (Hernandez, M)
September 27, 2017 Filing 24 STIPULATION re #17 MOTION to COMPEL PLAINTIFF JOHN MARTIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SYSCO CENTRAL CALIFORNIA, INC.S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) to Continue Hearing Date by SYSCO Central California, Inc., Sysco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shadi, Sabrina)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RESOLVING #21 Motion to Continue previously signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Hernandez, M)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE SECOND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE DEADLINES TO COMPLETE CLASS CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY AND TO FILE A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the September 20, 2016 scheduling order and July 20, 2017 order are AMENDED as follows: Class certification discovery shall be completed by December 18, 2017; Plaintiff shall file a motion for class certification on or before December 18, 2017; Defendants opposition to Plaintiffs motion for class certification shall be filed on or before January 15, 2018; Plaintiffs reply in support of his motion for class certification shall be filed on or before January 29, 2018; and All other dates and aspects of the September 20, 2016 scheduling order and July 20, 2017 order shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/20/2017. (Hernandez, M)
September 19, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION to CONTINUE THE DEADLINE TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY AND TO FILE A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by John Martin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Crawford, #2 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Crawford, Matthew)
September 19, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nicholas D. Poper on behalf of SYSCO Central California, Inc., Sysco Corporation. Attorney Poper, Nicholas D. added. (Poper, Nicholas)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Stipulated Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/19/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 15, 2017 Filing 18 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective order by John Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Crawford, Matthew)
September 12, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to COMPEL PLAINTIFF JOHN MARTIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SYSCO CENTRAL CALIFORNIA, INC.S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) by John Martin. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Crawford, Matthew)
July 24, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Matthew Evan Crawford on behalf of John Martin. Attorney Crawford, Matthew Evan added. (Crawford, Matthew)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE DEADLINE TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY, TO COMPLETE MEDIATION, AND TO FILE A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. The deadline for the parties to attend private mediation is continued to November 2, 2017; Class certification discovery shall be completed by November 2, 2017;Plaintiff shall file a motion for class certification on or before November 2, 2017; Defendants opposition to Plaintiffs motion for class certification shall be filed on or before November 30, 2017; Plaintiff reply in support of his motion for class certification shall be filed on or before December 14, 2017; and The September 20, 2017 scheduling order remains in effect in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/2017. (Hernandez, M)
July 18, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to CONTINUE the Deadline to Complete Discovery, to Complete Mediation, and to File a Motion for Class Certification by John Martin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jill Vecchi, Esq. in Support of Motion)(Vecchi, Jill)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES. The parties shall complete private mediation by August 4, 2017; and All other dates and aspects of the September 20, 2016 scheduling order shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/14/2017. (Hernandez, M)
April 13, 2017 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Continue Deadline to Complete Mediation re #8 Scheduling Order, by SYSCO Central California, Inc., Sysco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diamond M. Hicks, #2 Exhibit A to Diamond Hicks' Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Diamond)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Jeffrey C. Bils' #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/1/17. Attorney Jeffrey C. Bils terminated. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 31, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Jeffrey C. Bils as counsel by SYSCO Central California, Inc., Sysco Corporation. (Rosenthal, Margaret)
January 11, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jessica Renee Corrales on behalf of John Martin. Attorney Corrales, Jessica Renee added. (Corrales, Jessica)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Class Certification Deadlines: Motion filing 8/4/2017; Opposition due 9/1/2017; Reply due 9/15/2017; Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosure due 10/4/2016; Discovery for Certification 8/4/2017; Private Mediation Deadline by 4/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/20/2016. (Hernandez, M)
September 20, 2016 Filing 7 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: Initial Scheduling Conference and Motion for Class Certification addressed on 9/20/2016. The Court to issue a written order. (NOTE: The parties were emailed "SAB Chambers Procedures") Plaintiffs Counsel Jill Vecchi by telephone. Defendants Counsel Sabrina Shadi by telephone. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO O Rosales. (Hernandez, M)
September 14, 2016 Filing 6 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by SYSCO Central California, Inc., Sysco Corporation. (Hicks, Diamond)
August 2, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Diamond M. Hicks on behalf of SYSCO Central California, Inc., Sysco Corporation. Attorney Hicks, Diamond M. added. (Hicks, Diamond)
July 25, 2016 Filing 4 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vecchi, Jill)
July 12, 2016 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by SYSCO Central California, Inc., Sysco Corporation. (Bils, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2016 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
July 11, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus County Superior Court, case number 9000052 by John Martin. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6556455) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Party with Financial Interest)(Bils, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Sysco Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Martin
Represented By: Jill Marie Vecchi
Represented By: William Turley
Represented By: Jamie Kathryn Serb
Represented By: David Thomas Mara
Represented By: Jessica Renee Corrales
Represented By: Matthew Evan Crawford
Represented By: Gwendolyne Nicole Trenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Bils
Represented By: Sabrina Layne Shadi
Represented By: Nicholas D. Poper
Represented By: Diamond M. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYSCO Central California, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Bils
Represented By: Sabrina Layne Shadi
Represented By: Nicholas D. Poper
Represented By: Diamond M. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?